(SS) Rogers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Matthew Michael Rogers
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2024cv00118
Filed: January 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Vieira, Christopher)
February 9, 2024 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Christopher Vieira for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Social Security Admin- SS E-Service and US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service terminated (Vieira, Christopher)
February 7, 2024 Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: served on AUSA and Commissioner of Social Security. (Maldonado, C)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 5/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *2440 Tulare St.* *Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Maldonado, C)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directing Clerk to Issue New Case Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/07/2024. (Maldonado, C)
January 26, 2024 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Flores, E)
January 25, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Matthew Michael Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
January 25, 2024 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Matthew Michael Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Rogers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Michael Rogers
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Christopher Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?