(HC) Hernandez-Velasquez v. Warden, F.C.I. Mendota
Petitioner: Jeison Hernandez-Velasquez
Respondent: Warden, F.C.I. Mendota
Case Number: 1:2024cv00130
Filed: January 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by Warden, F.C.I. Mendota. Attorney Rodriguez, Michelle added. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Rodriguez, Michelle)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Marrujo, C)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONDENT to File a Response, SETTING Briefing Schedule and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to serve documents signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/31/2024. (Lundstrom, T)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response served on Jeison Hernandez-Velasquez. (Lundstrom, T)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Jeison Hernandez-Velasquez re: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/29/2024. (Rivera, O)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Rivera, O)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jeison Hernandez-Velasquez. (Rivera, O)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Warden, F.C.I. Mendota by Jeison Hernandez-Velasquez. (Rivera, O)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Jeison Hernandez-Velasquez. (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Hernandez-Velasquez v. Warden, F.C.I. Mendota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeison Hernandez-Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, F.C.I. Mendota
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Represented By: Michelle Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?