Estate of Ezekiel Rivera, et al. v. Kern County Sheriff's Department, et al.
Plaintiff: Estate of Ezekiel Rivera, Soluna Lora and E. R.
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff's Department, Kern County, Deputy Swords, Deputy Chavez and Sheriff Donny Youngblood
Case Number: 1:2024cv00176
Filed: February 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Christopher D Baker
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Petition for Appointment of Guardian ad Litem of Minor E.R., signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 2/12/2024. (Hall, S)
February 9, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM by E. R.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Contreras, Christian)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR E.R. signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on February 9, 2024. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff E.R.'s petition to appoint Josephina Villareal as guardian ad litem (Doc. #3 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Vue, Yee)
February 7, 2024 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2024 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Attachments: #1 CDB Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
February 7, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Deputy Chavez, Sheriff Donny Youngblood* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christian Contreras* *Law Offices of Christian Contreras, PLC* *360 E. 2nd St., Suite 800* *Los Angeles, CA 90012*. (Rivera, O)
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Deputy Swords, Kern County, Kern County Sheriff's Department* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christian Contreras* *Law Offices of Christian Contreras, PLC* *360 E. 2nd St., Suite 800* *Los Angeles, CA 90012*. (Rivera, O)
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Estate of Ezekiel Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Contreras, Christian)
February 7, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Estate of Ezekiel Rivera (Contreras, Christian)
February 7, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Estate of Ezekiel Rivera. Attorney Contreras, Christian added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11334404) (Contreras, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Ezekiel Rivera, et al. v. Kern County Sheriff's Department, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Ezekiel Rivera
Represented By: Edwin Stuart Salguero
Represented By: Humberto Manuel Guizar
Represented By: Christian Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soluna Lora
Represented By: Christian Contreras
Represented By: Edwin Stuart Salguero
Represented By: Humberto Manuel Guizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. R.
Represented By: Christian Contreras
Represented By: Edwin Stuart Salguero
Represented By: Humberto Manuel Guizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Swords
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Donny Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?