Randles v. Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Adrian Scott Randles
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company Doing business as Mr. Cooper and Mr. Cooper Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00177
Filed: February 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: No District Court Judge
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
2 Judge: Kirk E Sherriff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2024 Filing 23 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC for attorney Allison J. Schoenthal to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11451251) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stoll, Laura)
April 5, 2024 Filing 22 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC for attorney W. Kyle Tayman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11451234) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stoll, Laura)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Kirk E. Sherriff on 4/04/2024: (Text Only Entry), The hearing on Defendants' #15 Motion to Change Venue is RESET to April 17, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before District Judge Kirk E. Sherriff. The parties shall comply with the Court's Standing Order in Civil Cases. (Gonzales, V)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR BRIEFING TO BE HELD IN ABEYANCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/2/2024. (Kusamura, W)
April 2, 2024 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Briefing to be Held in Abeyance by Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Stoll, Laura)
March 27, 2024 Filing 18 OPPOSITION by Adrian Scott Randles to #15 Motion to Change Venue,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Peluso, Patrick)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/14/2024. (Kusamura, W)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of District Judge Kirk E. Sherriff to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from No District Court Judge (NODJ) to District Judge Kirk E. Sherriff for all further proceedings. All dates currently set in this reassigned action shall remain pending subject to further order of the court. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (Rivera, O)
March 13, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to CHANGE VENUE by Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before No District Court Judge. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Stoll, Laura)
March 12, 2024 Filing 14 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Oppose re #1 Complaint, #9 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS by Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Stoll, Laura)
March 12, 2024 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Stoll, Laura)
March 12, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Laura A. Stoll on behalf of Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Attorney Stoll, Laura A. added. (Stoll, Laura)
February 29, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Adrian Scott Randles re 10 Minute Order,,, #9 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS . (Peluso, Patrick)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/28/2024: (Text Only Entry) Before the Court is Plaintiff's motion for class certification, filed February 27, 2024. (Doc. #9 .) The motion contains a certificate of service indicating that the motion "was served upon counsel of record by filing such papers via the Court's ECF system." (Id. at #4 .) There is currently no "counsel of record" for Defendants, however, as they have not made an appearance in this case and their responsive pleadings are not due until April 8, 2024. (See Docs. #5 & #6 .) Accordingly, service of the motion utilizing the "Court's ECF system" is ineffective. By no later than March 1, 2024, Plaintiff shall file a proof of service indicating service of the motion on counsel for Defendants in accordance with the appropriate Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5; E.D. Cal. L.R. 135. (Kusamura, W)
February 27, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS by Adrian Scott Randles. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A - Firm Resume)(Peluso, Patrick)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Application for Pro Hac Vicesigned by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 02/16/2024. Added attorney Patrick H. Peluso, PHV for Adrian Scott Randles. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Flores, E)
February 15, 2024 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Adrian Scott Randles for attorney Patrick H. Peluso to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11350472) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Davis, Rebecca)
February 12, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC on 2/7/2024, Answer due 4/8/2024 (Davis, Rebecca)
February 12, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Mr. Cooper Group, Inc. on 2/7/2024, Answer due 4/8/2024 (Davis, Rebecca)
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2024 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Order Reassigning NODJ, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Rebecca L. Davis* *Lozeau Drury LLP* *1939 Harrison St., Suite 150* *Oakland, CA 94612*. (Lundstrom, T)
February 7, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Adrian Scott Randles (Davis, Rebecca)
February 7, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC by Adrian Scott Randles. Attorney Davis, Rebecca L. added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11334511) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randles v. Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Scott Randles
Represented By: Rebecca L. Davis
Represented By: Patrick H. Peluso, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company Doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Laura A. Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cooper Group, Inc.
Represented By: Laura A. Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?