Smith v. Cordoza
Plaintiff: Candace Smith
Defendant: Alexa Cordoza
Case Number: 1:2024cv00200
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: No District Court Judge
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
2 Judge: Kirk E Sherriff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/8/2024. Thirty Day Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Amended REGULAR Civil Complaint Form)(Marrujo, C)
April 8, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Candace Smith. (Marrujo, C)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of District Judge Kirk E. Sherriff to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from No District Court Judge (NODJ) to District Judge Kirk E. Sherriff for all further proceedings. All dates currently set in this reassigned action shall remain pending subject to further order of the court. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (Gonzalez, R)
March 14, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order Reassigning Newly Appointed District Judge, served on Candace Smith. (Gonzalez, R)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/19/2024. (Lundstrom, T)
February 20, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Candace Smith. (Lundstrom, T)
February 15, 2024 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Marrujo, C)
February 14, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Candace Smith. (Marrujo, C)
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexa Cordoza by Candace Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Cordoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexa Cordoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?