(PC) Alexander v. Aranda, et al.
Plaintiff: Julian J. Alexander
Defendant: Aranda, Ortega and Guerro
Case Number: 1:2024cv00212
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Christopher D Baker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Aranda, Guerro, Ortega* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Julian J. Alexander, AM-7350, PRO SE* *CALIFORNIA MEN'S COLONY, EAST* *Highway 1, P.O. Box 8101* *San Luis Obispo, CA 93409-8101*. (Lundstrom, T)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 3/26/2024 FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING E-SERVICE on the following defendant(s): *Lieutenant Aranda*, *Sergeant Ortega*,*Sergeant Guerro*. Operative Complaint, Summons, Notice of E-Service Waiver and this Order served via email on CDCR. (Attachments: #1 CDCR Notice of Waiver) (Lundstrom, T)
March 26, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate, served on Julian J. Alexander. (Lundstrom, T)
March 4, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 2/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Trust Account Statement) (Lundstrom, T)
February 22, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Julian J. Alexander. (Lundstrom, T)
February 20, 2024 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Julian J. Alexander. (Lundstrom, T)
February 16, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Julian J. Alexander, CDCR No. AM-7350 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Lundstrom, T)
February 16, 2024 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 3/21/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
February 16, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Julian J. Alexander. (Lundstrom, T)
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Aranda, Guerro, Ortega by Julian J. Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lundstrom, T)
February 16, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Julian J. Alexander. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Alexander v. Aranda, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian J. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guerro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?