(SS) Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Oralia Lopez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2024cv00342
Filed: March 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Christopher D Baker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin, Justin)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Justin Lane Martin, GOVT for Commissioner of Social Security (Martin, Justin)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #6 Summons, #1 Social Security Complaint, #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #7 Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider served on Commissioner of Social Security. (Lawrence, A)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 7/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Lawrence, A)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Lawrence, A)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 & #4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 3/28/2024. (Lawrence, A)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Oralia Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file Long Form IFP Application #2 , 14-Day Filing Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 3/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Long Form IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Oralia Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Oralia Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oralia Lopez
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?