(PC) Bennett v. Parales et al
Plaintiff: Mario Bennett
Defendant: Parales and Warden
Case Number: 1:2024cv00591
Filed: May 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ENTRY ONLY TERMINATING #17 Motion to Proceed IFP as it was previously granted by ECF #8 on 05/20/2024 by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Marrujo, C)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 18 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Mario Bennett. (Marrujo, C)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Mario Bennett. (Marrujo, C)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LODGED SECOND AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Mario Bennett. (Marrujo, C)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Marrujo, C)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Mule Creek State Prison, P.O. Box 409020, Ione, CA 95640 by Mario Bennett. (No changes made.) (Marrujo, C)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mario Bennett. (Rivera, O)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:24-cv-00591-JLT-BAM (PC). (Rivera, O)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Mule Creek State Prison, P.O. Box 409020, Ione, CA 95640 by Mario Bennett. (Rivera, O)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 12 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Mario Bennett. (Rivera, O)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Mario Bennett. (Flores, E)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Flores, E)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Mario Bennett. (Flores, E)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Mario Bennett. (Flores, E)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Mario Bennett, CDCR No. V-23447 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Maldonado, C)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 6/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Yin, K)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:24-cv-1367 DMC PC) to Fresno (1:24-cv-0591 BAM PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/16/2024. (Yin, K)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Transfer Order served on Mario Bennett. (Yin, K)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/13/2024*. Consent or Decline due by 6/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Kyono, V)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Mario Bennett. (Kyono, V)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Mario Bennett. (Kyono, V)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Parales, Warden by Mario Bennett.(Kyono, V)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bennett v. Parales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?