Center Point LLC v. California High-Speed Rail Authority
Plaintiff: Center Point LLC
Defendant: California High-Speed Rail Authority and Ian Choudri
Case Number: 1:2024cv01600
Filed: December 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2025 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER TO VACATE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ALL ASSOCIATED DEADLINES by Ian Choudri. (Struhar, Matthew)
February 26, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Struhar on behalf of Ian Choudri. (Struhar, Matthew)
February 26, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Struhar on behalf of Ian Choudri. Attorney Struhar, Matthew Thomas added. (Struhar, Matthew)
February 4, 2025 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Center Point LLC. (Christofferson, Jay)
January 16, 2025 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ian Choudri* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jay A. Christofferson* *Wanger Jones Helsley PC* *265 E. River Park Circle, Suite 310* *Fresno, CA 93720*. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
January 15, 2025 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ian Choudri, Ian Choudri, in his official capacity as Chief Executive Officer of the California High-Speed Rail Authority by Center Point LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(Christofferson, Jay)
January 3, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California High-Speed Rail Authority served on 1/2/2025, answer due 1/23/2025. (Christofferson, Jay)
December 30, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Flores, E)
December 30, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California High-Speed Rail Authority* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jay A. Christofferson* *Wanger Jones Helsley PC* *265 E. River Park Circle, Suite 310* *Fresno, CA 93720*. (Flores, E)
December 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Civil Penalties, Declaratory, and Injunctive Relief Based on Violations of the Clean Water Act against California High-Speed Rail Authority by Center Point LLC. Attorney Christofferson, Jay A. added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Christofferson, Jay)
December 30, 2024 RECEIPT number ACAEDC-11948412 for the filing fee in the amount of $405.00 paid on 12/30/2024 by Jay A. Christofferson. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center Point LLC v. California High-Speed Rail Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California High-Speed Rail Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Choudri
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Struhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center Point LLC
Represented By: Jay A. Christofferson
Represented By: Nicolas R. Cardella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?