February 14, 2024 |
Filing
464
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/14/2024 GRANTING petitioner's 455 request to seal and DENYING respondent's 463 request for modification of this court's 3/31/2022 order. The portion of the reply brief identified by petitioner, i.e., his discussion of Claim E, is SEALED and is accessible only to the parties until further order of the court.(Yin, K)
|
March 31, 2022 |
Filing
462
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/31/2022 DENYING petitioner's 456 motion for a settlement conference is DENIED. (Yin, K)
|
December 2, 2020 |
Filing
446
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/2/2020 GRANTING 424 Request to Seal; GRANTING 445 Request to Seal; and ORDERING the documents identified in both requests to seal are ordered sealed and accessible only to the parties until further order of the court. (Henshaw, R)
|
November 17, 2020 |
Filing
444
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 11/16/2020 ORDERING Respondent to submit a new request to seal in accordance with Local Rule 141, setting forth the legal arguments and case law that justify sealing, within 14 days of this order's entry. (Henshaw, R)
|
July 11, 2019 |
Filing
430
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/10/2019 GRANTING 429 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent's responsive pleading is due on or before 11/12/2019. (Henshaw, R)
|
August 18, 2017 |
Filing
418
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/17/2017 GRANTING 417 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner to file Brief on the Merits and Motion for Evidentiary Hearing on or before 10/29/2017. (Henshaw, R)
|
December 17, 2015 |
Filing
404
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/17/15 ORDERING that Petitioners November 17, 2015 motion to Apply FRCP 56 to these proceedings and for partial summary judgment, construed as a request to modify the October 6, 2015 schedulin g order, is DENIED. Pursuant to the scheduling order, petitioner shall file a brief on all claims for relief by October 6, 2016. Although petitioners counsel is free to do so if they wish, the points and authorities filed by petitioner in support o f his motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 397 ) need not be redrafted but will be considered and addressed by the court along with the arguments contained in petitioners brief on all other claims for relief. Respondents opposition shall incorporate his response to petitioners motion for partial summary judgment.(Dillon, M)
|
December 2, 2015 |
Filing
400
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/2/2015 ORDERING that the hearing currently scheduled for 12/16/2015 at 10:00 a.m. will address scheduling issues only and will not address the issues raised by petitioner's 11/17/2015 motion for partial summary judgment. (Yin, K)
|
October 6, 2015 |
Filing
396
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/06/15 ordering this court's order dated 03/31/15 384 that petitioner shall file a motion for evidentiary hearing by 10/06/15 is vacated. Petitioner shall submit a brief on all claims f or relief. In doing so petitioner either will set forth that: there is no genuine dispute as to any material fact on the claim and that petitioner is entitled to judgment as a matter of law; and/or 2) factual discovery is required on a claim and/or t hat an evidentiary hearing is required to present evidence and/or resolve disputes as to material facts on the claim. Respondent's brief shall set forth all reasons why petitioner is not entitled to judgment as a matter of law, and/or identify any and all genuine disputes as to any material fact, and shall include all reasons why respondent contends that petitioner is not permitted to undertake discovery on any fact and/or be entitled to an evidentiary hearing on any issue: Petitioner 9;s brief shall be filed 1 year from the date of this order. Respondent's brief shall be filed 1 year after petitioner's brief is filed. The foregoing stipulation is without prejudice to petitioner seeking relief from the conviction at any time. (Plummer, M)
|
March 30, 2015 |
Filing
381
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/30/15 GRANTING petitioner's joint motion for substitution and appointment of counsel. David A. Senior, Esq., McBreen & Senior, 1900 Avenue of the Stars, 11th Fl., Los Angeles, Californ ia 90067, is hereby appointed as co-counsel for Petitioner in substitution for Gail R. Weinheimer. In addition to serving this order upon counsel, the Clerk is directed to serve it upon Kurt Heiser, CJA Administrator, Office of the Federal Defender for the Eastern District of California. (cc Kurt Heiser)(Dillon, M)
|
October 15, 2014 |
Filing
376
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/14/14 ORDERING that Petitioner will file a motion for evidentiary hearing by April 6, 2015. Respondent will file a response to the motion for evidentiary hearing on October 5, 2015. A further Status/Scheduling conference is set for May 6, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 8.(Dillon, M)
|
August 4, 2014 |
Filing
371
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/04/14 ordering ( Status Conference continued to 10/1/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan.) (Plummer, M)
|
March 31, 2014 |
Filing
366
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/31/14 ordering the 04/30/14 deadline for completion of depositions of Van Oss, Wingo and Colbert is continued to 07/15/14. The depositions shall be completed by that date. ( A further Status/Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan.) (Plummer, M)
|
October 24, 2013 |
Filing
362
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/24/13 ORDERING that a Status/Scheduling conference is set for November 20, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 8; Prior to the November 20, 2013 conference, the parties shall meet and confer and shall be prepared to discuss a proposed schedule for this case, including a schedule for filing remaining pleadings and/or litigating any procedural issues, filing any supplemental briefing, motions for evidentiary hearing, and the merits of petitioners claims.(Dillon, M)
|
May 17, 2011 |
Filing
359
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/17/11 ordering Joan Fisher of the Capital Habeas Unit of the Office of the Federal Defender is appointed to represent petitioner. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Joseph Schlesinger, Supervising Attoreny, Office of the Federal Defender. (cc: Joseph Schlesinger, Federal Defender) (Plummer, M)
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing
357
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/02/10 ORDERING that the 356 Motion to File Declaration Under seal is GRANTED. (Benson, A.)
|