Valdivia, et al v. Schwarzenegger, et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Cervantes, Steven G Williams, Alfred Yancy, Hossie Welch, Jerry Valdivia, Nghia Buckius, Mario Carillo, Phillip Castillo, George Cortes, Francis Culotta, David Dixon, Karl Horne, Scott Iroff, Walter - Jones, Mustafa Khalil, Raymond Latimore, Andre Lyons, Claude McDaniel, Nathan Morris, Edward Navarro, Steven O'Donohue, Ogwuobu Ojoir, Willie Patton, James - Robinson, Troy Scurry, Mark St John, Gregory Strong, Alfred Taylor, Christopher Thomas, Jimmy Watson, Curtis Williams, John Hamre, Jeffrey H Malone, Russell P. Hall and Daren Jean Miller
Defendant: Michael Connolly, Marisela Montes, James W Nielsen, Carol J Bentley, Thomas J Giaquinto, John W Gillis, Manuel C Guaderrama, Ron E Koenig, Arthur F Van Court, Quintin L Villanueva, Cal A Terhune, Edward McNair, California Attorneys Administrative Law Judges and Hearing Officers in State Employment and Arnold Schwarzenegger
Amicus: California Attorneys for Criminal Justice, San Diego Criminal Defense Bar Association and Criminal Defense Lawyers Club of San Diego
Special_master: Chase Riveland, Virginia Morrison and Nancy Campbell
Case Number: 2:1994cv00671
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1868 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/7/2014 ORDERING that the court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to return all funds remaining in the special account, plus interest, to defendants. The Clerk shall make the check payable to "California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation" and send it to California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Attn: Jaime Corvera, Associate Director (A). (cc: Financial) (Zignago, K.)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1865 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/4/13 ORDERING that it is CONFIRMED that $72,500 plus interest accruing at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1961 is due and collectable as of 45 days from the date of entry of this order. (Manzer, C)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1863 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/20/2013 DECERTIFYING the plaintiff class as certified by 76 Order; TERMINATING 1034 Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunctive Relief; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1859 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/10/2013 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part plaintiffs' 1849 Motion for Reconsideration of 7/3/2013 1845 Order. (Marciel, M)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1856 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/20/13 VACATING hearing on 1849 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION. (Meuleman, A)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1846 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/3/13 GRANTING 1837 , 1813 , 1832 and 1793 Requests to Seal. Counsel is directed to send approved sealed documents to ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov.(Dillon, M)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1845 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/2/2013 ORDERING The court FINDS that this case is MOOT. ACCORDINGLY the court DECLINES to adopt the Thirteenth Report of the Special Master on the Status of Conditions of the Remedial Order 1783 A fort hcoming order will address the parties' outstanding requests to seal documents. The parties and the Special Master are DIRECTED to file final motions, if any, for fees and costs within twenty eight 28 days of the date of entry of this order. Upon resolution of these motions, the court will decertify the class and dismiss this case. (Reader, L)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1840 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/12/2013 ORDERING 1831 that $327,447.81 plus interest accruing at the rate provided by 28:1961 is due and collectable as of 45 days from the date of entry of this Order. (Reader, L)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1823 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/6/13: Within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this order, the parties are DIRECTED to file brief. The Special Master is DIRECTED to stay filing the Fourteenth Report on the Status of Conditions of the Remedial Order, pending further order of the court. (Kaminski, H)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1818 STIPULATION and ORDER re UNDISPUTED ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/29/13: IT IS CONFIRMED that $382,955.81 plus interest accruing at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1961 is due and collectable as of forty-five days from the date of entry of this Order. (Kaminski, H)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1797 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/4/13 ORDERING that the parties shall have until 2/28/13 to respond to objections to the Special Master's Thirteenth Report. (Manzer, C)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1795 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/29/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's APPLICATION to exceed page limit 1792 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs may submit Objections not to exceed sixty (60) pages. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1785 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/2/2013 GRANTING 1784 Stipulation and Proposed Order; Special Master's Thirteenth Report shall be final unless a party files written objections with the Court no later than 1/25/2013. (Waggoner, D)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1783 THIRTEENTH REPORT of the Special Master on status of conditions of Remedial Order (Marciel, M)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1782 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/17/12 ORDERING that Within thirty (30) days of the issuance of this order defendants shall deposit with the Clerk of the Court a sixth interim payment of costs in the amount of $500,000.00 which amount shall be invested in the interest-bearing account previously opened for this action; and The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of this court.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1767 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/1712 ORDERING that the Thirteenth Report of the Special Master shall be filed with the Court on or before 11/15/2012. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1763 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/27/2012 ORDERING 1762 The parties agree to settle the plaintiffs' Fourth Quarter of 2012 fees and costs for $472,004.03 of Attorneys' fees and costs. IT IS CONFIRMED that $472,004.03 plus interest accruing at the rate provided by 28:1961 is due and collectable as of 45 days from the date of entry of this Order. (Reader, L)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1761 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/21/2012. Court is ADOPTING its Findings and Recommendations in full. The substantial compliance finding applies to all locations except Richard J. Donovan Correctional Facility and California Institution for Men, they remain subject to monitoring this requirement. Defendants SHALL report status of these requirements to all parties every 6 months beginning on 7/8/2012. (Marciel, M)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1759 STIPULATION and ORDER CONFIRMING UNDISPUTED ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS FOR FOURTH QUARTER, 2011 signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/7/12. The parties agree that $609,125.55 of fees and costs incurred during the Fourth Quarter of 2011 are undisputed. WHEREFORE, IT IS CONFIRMED that $609,125.55 plus interest accruing at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1961 is due and collectable as of forty-five days from the date of entry of this Order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1756 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/20/2012 ADOPTING recommendations of the 1750 Twelfth Report. (Marciel, M)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1750 TWELFTH REPORT of Special Master on Status of Conditions of Remedial Order (Marciel, M)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1738 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/23/12; Defendant's Motion to Enforce Penal Code § 3044 and to Modify the Permanent Injunction, ECF No. 1680, is DENIED, except that Injunction 11(b)(iv)and 23 are modified to reflect that defen dants shall provide a revocation hearing no later than the 45th calendar day after the placement of the parole hold. Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce the Injunction, ECF No. 1684, is GRANTED, except that the injunction is modified as stated above. (Matson, R)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1736 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/10/2012, Confirming undisputed attorneys' fees and costs for third quarter 2011. WHEREFORE, IT IS CONFIRMED 1734 that $593,156.74 plus interest accruing at the rate provided by 28:1961 is due and collectable as of forty-five days from the date of entry of this Order. 1087 (Reader, L)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1733 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/22/2011 ORDERING that the court finds that plaintiff's 1716 motion to reconsider the magistrate judge's order is DENIED as MOOT. It follows from the joint statement that the magistrate judge's order denying plaintiffs motion to compel informal interviews of county jail staff is also moot, and is vacated.(Duong, D)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1731 JOINT STATEMENT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Special Master Chase Riveland on 12/19/2011 RECOMMENDING that all remaining deadlines and hearings scheduled for this matter be vacated. (Michel, G)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1728 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/2/2011 CONTINUING Motion Hearing as to 1716 Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's 1708 Order until 12/19/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Michel, G)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1725 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/16/2011 ORDERING 1724 Pursuant to this agreement, Defendants are ORDERED to pay the principal amounts for the undisputed hours (the difference between the principal amounts at 2008 rates previously paid and the 2011 rates now owing), plus interest; and that the amounts set forth above are due and collectable as of 45 days from the date of entry of this Order.(Reader, L)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1723 MEMORANDUM of DECISION signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/9/2011. There is neither language in Rule 45 itself, nor authority in the case law, that gives this Court jurisdiction to compel an unwilling non-party to subject personnel to informal interviews with partys expert pursuant to subpoenaed inspection of premises or operations. (Marciel, M)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1717 STIPULATION and ORDER 1715 confirming undisputed attorneys' fees and costs signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/28/2011. An amount of $449,337.57 is due and collectible as of 45 days from date of this Order's entry. (Marciel, M)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1708 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/13/11 DENYING 1698 and 1700 Motions to Compel. Plaintiffs experts are free to engage in informal discussions with the CDCR state representative present during the inspections. (Meuleman, A)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1705 ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/11/11; Motion Hearing as to Pltfs' 1700 Motion to Compel is RESET for 10/13/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Manzer, C)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1693 ORDER granting 1649 Motion to Compel signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/13/11. (Kaminski, H)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1691 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/7/2011 ORDERING that Pltf's 1687 Request to Seal Document is tentatively GRANTED. The court will revisit whether these documents should be permanently sealed at a later time. (Zignago, K.)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1677 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/4/11 ORDERING that plaintiffs' undisputed fees and costs of $513,591.92, plus interest, are due and collectable as of forty-five days from the date of entry of this Order. Daily interest runs from April 29, 2011, at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1961. (Becknal, R)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1674 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/11/2011 ORDERING that the hearing re 1649 Motion to Compel 2010 Rates currently set for 7/18/2011 is VACATED. The court will delay decision on the pending motion until a decision is issued on th e matter in Armstrong. When a decision on the matter is issued in Armstrong, Pltfs SHALL re-notice the motion to compel fees for hearing in this court. If no decision is issued before 8/31/2011, Pltfs SHALL re-notice the motion to compel fees for hearing in this court. (Zignago, K.)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1671 STIPULATION and ORDER 1670 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/28/11; IT IS CONFIRMED that $20,199.00 plus interest is due and collectable as of 45 days from the date of the entry of this Order.(Matson, R)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1664 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/13/2011 ORDERING 1647 The court has considered the report and ADOPTS the Special Master's F & R's in full; Further, the court HEREBY FINDS that dfts have demonstrated substantial compl iance with the following requirements: pltfs' counsel has access to the information reasonably necessary to monitor compliance; and Deputy Commissioners shall not have authority to increase the Return to Custody Assessment at the Probable Cause Hearing; these requirements will therefore no longer be a primary focus of pltfs' or the Special Master's monitoring unless they are inextricably linked with review of the hearing process, the remedial sanctions obligations of the Permanent Injunction, or arise in the course of investigating an individual parolee's situation; these items will remain in this status unless and until it comes to the parties' or the Special Master's attention that there has been a significant decline in compliance; to allow for such attention, dfts SHALL report the status of these requirements to all parties every 6 months, beginning on 1/8/2012. (Reader, L)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1646 ORDER CONFIRMING UNDISPUTED ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS for the 4th Quarter of 2010, signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/20/2011 ORDERING 1645 that plaintiffs' undisputed fees and costs of $456,836.48, plus interest, are due and collectable as of 45 days from the date of entry of this Order. Daily interest runs from 3/2/2011 at the rate provided by 28:1961. (Reader, L) Modified on 4/20/2011 (Reader, L).
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1643 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/17/2011 ORDERING that Dfts shall file a Motion to Enforce Penal Code § 3044 and to Modify the Permanent Injunction by 8/31/2011. Pltfs shall file a Motion to Enforce the Injunction by 8/31/20 11. Opposition briefs to those motions shall be filed by 10/3/2011. Reply briefs may be filed by 10/18/2011. The motions shall be heard on 11/4/2011 at 10:00 a.m.. Parties may request discovery for the purpose of opposing the other party's motio n by 9/14/2011. Nothing in this Order or prior Orders regarding the procedures and scheduling for the motions on remand regarding Proposition 9 shall be construed as limiting the Pltfs' to monitor compliance with the Permanent Injunction in this case, as set forth in 25 of the Injunction. (Zignago, K.)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1637 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/9/11 ORDERING that within thirty (30) days of the issuance of this order defendants shall deposit with the Clerk of the Court a fifth interim payment of costs in the amount of $500,000.00 which amount shall be invested in the interest-bearing account previously opened for this action; and The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy ofthis order on the Financial Department of this court. (cc: Financial Dept)(Becknal, R)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1635 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/18/11 VACATING the 3/1/11 hearing. The court will make a final determination on the appropriate standard to apply when it decides the merits of the cross-motion. (Manzer, C)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1632 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/1/11 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay to: Chase Riveland, Valdivia Special Master, 5714 Deer Harbor Road, Box 367, Deer Harbor, WA 98243; the amt of $12,987.34 in accordance with the attached statement; and A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (Attachments: # 1 Statement)(Becknal, R)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1621 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/4/2011 ORDERING 1233 The Clerk is directed to pay to Chase Riveland, Valdivia, Special Master, the amount of $17,257.56 in accordance with the attached statement; and a copy of this order s hall be served on the financial department of this court. (Attachments: # 1 Statement for fees and disbursements)(Reader, L)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1620 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/3/2011 re 1619 ORDERING that plaintiffs' undisputed fees and costs of $414,239.09, plus interest, are due and collectable as of forty-five days from the date of entry of this Order. Daily interest runs from November 18, 2010 at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. 1961. (Duong, D)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1618 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/15/10: In Court Hearing set for 3/1/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton.The court FURTHER ORDERS that the briefing and hearing on the cross-motions following remand is amended. (Kaminski, H)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1617 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/2/10 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay Chase Riveland the amount of $7,331.00 in accordance with the attached statement; and a copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (Attachments: # 1 Statement)(cc financial dept) (Becknal, R)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1610 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/9/10 ORDERING that Pltf's undisputed fees and costs of $325,786.24, plus interest, are due and collectable as of 45 days from the date this order is filed. Daily interest runs from 9/17/10 at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1961. (Owen, K)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1607 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/29/10 ORDERING that the deadline for any motion regarding Pltf's counsel's fees incurred in opposing the appeal of the 3/26/09 Order shall be sixty days after the expiration of the period to file a notice of appeal or writ of certiorari. (Owen, K)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1605 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/22/10. The state is directed to file within twenty-one (21) days a brief addressing what is properly before the court and what the scope of the mandate is and the manner under which the court sha ll proceed. The Plaintiffs' will respond within fourteen (14) days thereafter. Upon receipt of the parties' briefing, the court will issue a further order, Alternatively, if the parties are as ncertain as the court, and if such a procedure is available, they may request further guidance from the Circuit.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1601 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 09/29/10 ORDERING that the deadline for any motion regarding plf's counsel's 2010 rates shall be 01/12/11. (Benson, A.)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1596 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/26/10: IT IS CONFIRMED that $455,252.50 is due and collectable as of forty-five days from the date of entry of this Order. Interest on these fees and costs will run from June 12, 2010, accruing at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1961. (Kaminski, H)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1592 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/21/2010 ORDERING 1245 that the Ninth Report of the Special Master shall be filed with the Court on or before 10/21/2010. (Reader, L)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1591 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/4/10 ORDERING that the Court's 1584 Order adopting the special master's Eighth Report is REINSTATED. (Owen, K)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1590 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/3/10 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay Special Master Chase Riveland in the amount of $21,984.15. (cc: Financial) (Owen, K)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1589 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/26/10, ORDERING that pltfs' undisputed fees and costs of $310,764.76, plus interest, are DUE and collectable as of 45 days from the date of entry of this Order. Daily interest runs from 4/1/10 at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1961. (Kastilahn, A)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1587 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/3/2010 ORDERING 1233 The Clerk is directed to pay to Chase Riveland, Valdivia, Special Master, the amount of $10,243.90 in accordance with the attached statement; and a copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (Reader, L)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1586 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/13/10. The Court WTIHDRAWS the 4/13/10 ORDER 1584 . The parties may file objections to the report, including report's recommendation to this Court, no later than (10) days from the date of this order. If objections are filed, the opposing party may file a response no later than five (5) days thereafter.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1584 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/12/2010. Pursuant to the Eighth Report of the Special Master, Court orders defendants are in substantial compliance with following requirements of Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunctive Relief, and that subjects will no longer be primary focus of plaintiffs' or Special Master's monitoring unless they are inextricably linked with review of hearing process or arise in course of investigating an individual parolees situation. Defendants shall report on status of these requirements on 1/8/2011 and every 6 months thereafter. These reports may be incorporated in defendants' compliance report. (Marciel, M)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1583 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/5/10 DIRECTING payment to Special Master Chase Riveland. (CC: Financial) (Owen, K)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1581 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/10/10. The Clerkis directed to pay Chase Riveland Valdivia Special Master, 5714 Deer Harbor Road, Box 367 Deer Harbor, WA 98243 the amount of $65,939.48 in accordance withe the attached atatement; a copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1580 ORDER CONFIRMING UNDISPUTED ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE THIRD QUARTER OF 2009 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/8/10. (Kaminski, H)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1578 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/1/10 directing payment of special master fees in the amount of $47,574.14. (cc: financial) (Owen, K)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1577 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/8/10 ORDERING that while Defendants have met the Remedial Sanctions Order's goal of establishing 1,800 ICDTP beds, information about the number and availability of ICDTP placements remains relevant to overall monitoring compliance with the Permanent Injunction's remedial sanctions requirement. (Becknal, R)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1576 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/5/2010 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay Chase Riveland, Valdivia Special Master, the amount of $26,484.99. A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (cc: CFS) (Engbretson, K.)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1571 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/1/2009 ORDERING that pursuant to 1230 Stipulation and Order, the Clerk is directed to pay Special Master Chase Riveland in accordance with this Order. (cc: Financial-Sacramento) (Suttles, J)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1570 SEVENTH REPORT OF THE SPECIAL MASTER ON THE STATUS OF CONDITIONS OF THE REMEDIAL ORDER signed by Chase Riveland, Special Master, on 10/13/09. (Engbretson, K.)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1569 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/10/2009 GRANTING parties 20 days to object to the Special Master's recommendations; opposition or non-opposition to objections due within 15 days; and replies due within 10 days thereafter. (Suttles, J)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1568 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/4/2009 ORDERING that plfs undisputed fees and costs of $542,204.85, plus interest, are due and collectable as of 45 days from the date of entry of this Order. (Suttles, J)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1566 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/2/09: The Clerk is directed to pay to Chase Riveland L.H. Special Master the amount of $27,470.12. A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (Kaminski, H)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1565 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/2/2009 ORDERING 1213 Within 30 days of the date of this order defendants shall deposit with the Clerk of the Court a fourth interim payment of costs in the amount of $500,000.00 which amount shall be invested in the interest-bearing account previously opened for this action; and The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of this Court. (Reader, L)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1563 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 09/04/09 pursuant to the court's August 18, 2005 Order of Reference, the Special Master has submitted for payment a bill for services provided during the month of August, 2009, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to pay to: Chase Riveland the sum of $27,557.40. A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (cc: Sac Finance)(Streeter, J)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1562 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/19/2009 ORDERING 1560 that Docket No. 1511 -6 in the docket of the above-captioned case, consisting of Exhibits I-K to the Decl. of Michael Bien in Opposition to Dfts' Motion to Modify Inj unction, shall be STRICKEN from the docket. It shall not be made public, and it shall not be read or considered by Court personnel or counsel. It is further ORDERED 1559 that Exhibits I-K attached to Pltfs' Notice of Errata filed 8/12/2009, and corrected to comply with the Protective Orders entered in this matter, shall replace Exhibits I-K, originally entered at Docket No. 1511 -6. (Reader, L)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1561 ORDER CONFIRMING UNDISPUTED ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FOR THE FIRST QUARTER OF 2009 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/12/09. Plaintiffs' undisputed fees and costs of $800,000.00, plus interest, are due and collectable as of forty-five days from the date of entry of this Order. Daily interest runs from May 23, 2009 at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1961.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1558 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 08/04/09 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay Chase Riveland, Special Master the amount of $38,377.14. A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (cc: CFS)(Streeter, J)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1557 STIPULATION and ORDER 1556 confirming certain undisputed attorneys' fees and costs for 3rd and 4th Quarters of 2008 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/29/2009. Plaintiffs undisputed fees and costs of $78,424.83 plus interest are due and collectable as of 45 days from entry of this Order. Daily interest runs on $2,831.78 from 12/6/2008 at rate provided by 28 USC § 1961. Daily interest runs on $75,593.05 from 3/10/2009 at rate provided by 28 USC § 1961. (Marciel, M)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1554 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 07/02/09 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay Chase Riveland, Special Master the amount of $25,695.72. A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (cc: CFS) (Streeter, J)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1532 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/2/09: The Clerk is directed to pay to Special Master the amount of $61,757.78. A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (Kaminski, H)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1503 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/4/2009 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay Chase Riveland the amount of $30,689.46; and a copy of this order shall be served on the financial department. ( cc Financial)(Matson, R)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1501 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 01/05/2009 GRANTING 1498 Stipulation Confirming Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for the Third Quarter of 2008. It is FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' fees and costs of $418,465.89, plus interest, are due and collectable as of 45 days from the date of entry of this Order. Daily interest runs from December 6, 2008 at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C Section 1961. (Streeter, J)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1500 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/5/09 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay to Chase Riveland, Valdivia Special Master, the amount of $37,275.46 in accordance with the attached statement. A copy of this order shall be served on the Financial Department of this court. (cc: CFS).(Duong, D)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1397 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/4/08 ORDERING Chase Riveland the amount of $37,693.54 accordance with the attached statement and a copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (cc: Financial) (Anderson, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valdivia, et al v. Schwarzenegger, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Cervantes
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven G Williams
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Yancy
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hossie Welch
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Valdivia
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nghia Buckius
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Carillo
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Castillo
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Cortes
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Culotta
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dixon
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Horne
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Iroff
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter - Jones
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mustafa Khalil
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Latimore
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Lyons
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude McDaniel
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Morris
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Navarro
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven O'Donohue
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ogwuobu Ojoir
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Patton
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James - Robinson
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Scurry
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark St John
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Strong
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Taylor
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Thomas
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Watson
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Williams
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hamre
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey H Malone
Represented By: Holly MacLeish Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell P. Hall
Represented By: Michael Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daren Jean Miller
Represented By: Michael Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Connolly
Represented By: Sally Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisela Montes
Represented By: Sally Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W Nielsen
Represented By: Sally Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol J Bentley
Represented By: Sally Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Giaquinto
Represented By: Sally Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W Gillis
Represented By: Sally Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel C Guaderrama
Represented By: Sally Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron E Koenig
Represented By: Sally Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur F Van Court
Represented By: Sally Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quintin L Villanueva
Represented By: Sally Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal A Terhune
Represented By: Sally Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward McNair
Represented By: Sally Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Attorneys Administrative Law Judges and Hearing Officers in State Employment
Represented By: Sally Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Represented By: Renju Palanilkumuryil Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: California Attorneys for Criminal Justice
Represented By: John Timothy Philipsborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: San Diego Criminal Defense Bar Association
Represented By: Mark F. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Criminal Defense Lawyers Club of San Diego
Represented By: Michael J. McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Chase Riveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Virginia Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Nancy Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?