Yellen v. Olivarez, et al
Plaintiff: Michael S Yellen
Defendant: Ana M Olivarez, J Gomez, J J Pacheco, L Reeves, S Stiles, J Spano and San Joaquin Health Department
Case Number: 2:1994cv01298
Filed: August 17, 1994
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER ADOPTING 297 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/17/12 and GRANTING defendants' 282 , 283 and 284 Motions for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Manzer, C)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/27/12 ORDERING plaintiff's 05/17/12 motion for leave to file a late opposition to summary judgment 292 is granted. Plaintiff's 05/17/12 opposition is d eemed an opposition to defendant Spano's motion for summary judgment 283 and an opposition to the Corrections defendants' motion for summary judgment 284 . Plaintiff's 05/29/12 motion for an extension of time to file objections to the court's 05/09/12 findings and recommendations 293 is granted. Plaintiff's 06/25/12 objections are deemed timely filed. The court's 05/09/12 findings and recommendations 291 are vacated. Also, RECOMMENDING that the 02/29/12 mo tion for summary judgment filed on behalf of the San Joaquin County Public Health defendants 282 be granted. Defendant Spano's 02/29/12 motion for summary judgment 283 be granted. The Corrections defendants' 02/29/12 motion for summary judgment 284 be granted. Motions 282 , 283 , 284 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/08/12 ORDERING that the hearing set for 05/11/12 is vacated. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/30/12; It is ordered that within five days plaintiff shall show cause in writing, if any he has, why defendants' motions should not be granted. (Matson, R)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/11/12 ORDERING that Plaintiffs April 2, 2012 motion for extension of time 288 is denied; Plaintiff shall file and serve opposition, if any he has, to defendants pending motions for summary judgment on or before April 20, 2012; Defendants reply briefs, if any, shall be filed and served on or before April 27, 2012; and Hearing on this matter is continued to May 11, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom # 27.(Dillon, M)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/15/2012 ORDERING 279 Motion to reopen discovery is DENIED; time for defendants to file their renewed motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 2/29/2012; in all other respects, the provisions of this court's 1/20/2012 Order remain in full force and effect. (Waggoner, D)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/19/12 ordering that within 30 days from the date of this order defendants shall file a renewed motion for summary judgment. (Plummer, M)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER adopting in full 274 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 1/18/12. Plaintiff's 259 motion for reconsideration is GRANTED.This court's 3/1/11 order and judgment are VACATED; and this matter is REFERRED back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Kastilahn, A)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/13/11 ordering that plaintiff's 08/29/11 motion 272 is granted. Plaintiff shall contact the Clerk's office to make arrangements to pick up the bottles that he has submitted to the court. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 04/07/11 motion for reconsideration be granted; The 03/01/11 order and judgment thereon be vacated; and this matter be referred back to the undersigned for further proceedings. Motion for Reconsideration 259 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/18/11 ORDERING that Motion Hearing for the 259 Motion for reconsideration is set for 6/10/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd.(Dillon, M)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 255 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/25/2011 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for lack of prosecution and for failure to respond to a court order. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/17/2011 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 252 are ADOPTED in FULL; and plaintiff's request for injunctive relief is DISMISSED as MOOT. (Reader, L)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/7/2011 ORDERING that w/in 10 days, pltf to inform the court in writing whether he intends to prosecute this action further.(Yin, K)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/17/10 ORDERING that Pltf's 250 Motion to Reopen Discovery is DENIED; it is RECOMMENDED that Pltf's request for injunctive relief be dismissed as moot. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections to F&Rs due within 14 days of service. (Owen, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellen v. Olivarez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S Yellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana M Olivarez
Represented By: Kelli Marie Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Gomez
Represented By: Kelli Marie Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J J Pacheco
Represented By: Kelli Marie Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Reeves
Represented By: Kelli Marie Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Stiles
Represented By: Kelli Marie Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Spano
Represented By: Paul Reynaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin Health Department
Represented By: Gilberto Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?