Hawkins v. Wong
Petitioner: Jeffrey Jay Hawkins
Respondent: Robert Wong
Case Number: 2:1996cv01155
Filed: June 19, 1996
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/2/2019. (Henshaw, R)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/6/2019 GRANTING 274 Request to Modify Scheduling Order. Evidentiary Hearing, previously scheduled for 9/21/2020, to proceed on 10/26/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan and the Status Conference, previously scheduled for 8/12/2020, to proceed on 9/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Henshaw, R)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/19/2019 DENYING without prejudice petitioner's 262 motion to bifurcate the evidentiary hearing and GRANTING petitioner's 263 motion to schedule the evidentiary hearing, and t he evidentiary hearing shall proceed on 9/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. All discovery must be completed by 6/22/2020; any discovery motions must be filed by that date. The parties shall submit a joint statement on or before 7/23/2019 in accordance with this order. A further status conference is set for 8/12/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Yin, K)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/02/19 VACATING the 5/08/19 hearings 262 , 263 on the motions. A status conference is set for 6/19/19 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 8. Within 21 days of the date of this order, parties shall submit status reports. (Plummer, M)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/2/2019 ORDERING Document 265-1 sealed. The tendered redacted document is substituted. (Henshaw, R)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/25/2015 GRANTING Coffin's 253 motion to withdraw and the Clerk shall terminate petitioner's pro se 252 motion as moot. Morrissey's motion 254 shall remain pending until new counsel is located to represent petitioner. This matter is REFERRED to the Selection Board for the USDC for the Eastern District of California to recommend qualified replacement counsel for appointment by this court. The Clerk shall serve this order upon Kurt Heiser, CJA Administrator and Jennifer Mann, Assistant Federal Defender. Attorney Lynne Coffin terminated. (cc: Kurt Heiser, Jennifer Mann) (Yin, K)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER denying 243 Respondent's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/6/13. (Kastilahn, A)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/24/13 GRANTING 241 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Marcia A Morrissey added for Jeffrey Jay Hawkins. (Dillon, M)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/5/13 ORDERING that Petitioner's Request to expand the record with the evidence submitted at Docket Nos. 228 - 232 is DENIED; The FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 9/20/10 222 are ADOPTE D in full; Respondent's motion for summary adjudication 173 is GRANTED as to Claims C, D, E, F, G, H, I, J, K, L, M, N, O, P, Q, T, U, V, X, Y, Z, AA, BB, CC, DD, FF, GG, and the trial court error sub-claims of Claim W and is otherwise DENI ED; Petitioner's MOTION for Summary Adjudication 182 is DENIED; and Petitioner's MOTION for an evidentiary hearing 215 is GRANTED as to Claims A, B, R, S, and the ineffective assistance of counsel sub- claims of Claim W and is otherwise DENIED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/27/11 ORDERING that by 6/14/11, each party shall file a brief on the impact of Cullen v. Pinholster, on petitioners motion for an evidentiary hearing and the findings and recommendations issued thereon, including particularly (but without limitation), Claims A, B, P, R, and W.(Dillon, M)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 222 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/2/10 RECOMMENDING that Respondents 173 motion for summary adjudication be granted as to Claims C, D, E, F, G, H, I, J, K, L, M, N, O, P, Q, T, U, V, X, Y, Z, AA, BB, CC, DD, FF, GG, and the trial court error sub-claims of Claim W and otherwise be denied; Petitioners 182 motion for summary adjudication be denied; Petitioners 215 motion for an evidentiary hearing be granted as to Claims A, B, R, S, and the ineffective assistance of counsel sub-claims of Claim W and otherwise denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Jay Hawkins
Represented By: Lynne Coffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Wong
Represented By: Peter H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?