Proctor v. Wong, et al
Petitioner: William A Proctor
Respondent: Attorney General for the State of California and Robert Wong
Case Number: 2:1996cv01401
Filed: July 31, 1996
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/5/2015 DENYING, as untimely, petitioner's 327 Motion for Reconsideration. (Marciel, M)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 CORRECTED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/27/15 ordering petitioner's motion for an extension of time 332 to file reply briefs is granted and petitioner's reply briefs are deemed timely. Petitioner's unopposed motion to expand the record 326 is granted. (Plummer, M) Modified on 3/30/2015 (Plummer, M).
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/26/15 ORDERING that Petitioners motion for an extension of time 332 to file reply briefs is granted and petitioners reply briefs are deemed timely; Petitioners unopposed motion to expand the record 327 is granted. (Dillon, M)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/8/2012, ORDERING that in light of Ms. Lipsig's withdrawal, any and all unused budget hours allocated to second counsel are hereby transferred to lead counsel, James Thomson, Esq.. (Yin, K)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/16/2012 ORDERING that the Clerk is to update the docket to reflect new respondent; Ms. Lipsig's 321 motion to withdraw as second counsel is GRANTED; and James Thomson shall continue as petitioner's sole counsel. Attorney Jolie Lipsig terminated. (Yin, K)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER ADOPTING in Full 226 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/16/09. Petitioner's Rule 56(f) motion 185 and 186 is DENIED. Petitioner's motion for summary judgment 189 is DENIED in its entirety. Respon dents' motion for summary judgment 176 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART without prejudice, as outlined in the May 15, 2007, f&r's. Claims A, C, D, F, G, H, J, K (to the extent not already dismissed), L, M,N, O, Q, R, and S are DENIED on the merits.(Kastilahn, A)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/14/09 GRANTING 301 Application for extension of time to file response; petitioner's merits brief is due by 5/15/09. (Gaydosh, J)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/14/09 ORDERING petitioner's request for an extension of time to and including 3/2/09 to submit his brief is GRANTED. (Carlos, K)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/1/08 GRANTING petitioner's 252 Application for release of recordings of sealed proceedings to counsel. Court directs Court Reporter to prepare and release to Jolie Lipsig and/or James Thomson recordings of complete case management/budget conferences, including all sealed proceedings, held 2/13/07 and 1/8/08. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proctor v. Wong, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William A Proctor
Represented By: Jolie Lipsig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General for the State of California
Represented By: Brian G. Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Wong
Represented By: Brian G. Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?