Osband v. Calderon, et al
Defendant: Robert K. Wong
Petitioner: Lance Ian Osband
Respondent: Arthur Calderon, Jeanne S. Woodford, John Stokes, Steven W. Ornoski, Robert L Ayers and Robert K. Wong
Case Number: 2:1997cv00152
Filed: October 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 06/05/2024 SUBSTITUTING Jeff Lynch, Warden of California State Prison, Sacramento as Respondent in this case. (Spichka, K.)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 5/20/2024 GRANTING 721 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their objections to 707 Findings and Recommendations no later than 6/24/2024. Any further requests for extensions of time shall be supported by declarations under seal detailing the work of petitioner's counsel and respondent's counsel on this case. (Huang, H)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 4/15/2024 GRANTING 719 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their objections to 707 Findings and Recommendations no later than 5/24/2024. (Huang, H)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/05/2024 GRANTING 716 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their Objections no later than 04/24/24.(Lopez, K)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01-30/2024 GRANTING 714 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their Objections no later than 03/25/2024.(Lopez, K)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 709 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/22/2023 GRANTING 708 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their Objections to 707 Findings and Recommendations no later than 1/8/2024. (Huang, H)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 707 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/07/2023 RECOMMENDING that the court finds Petitioner has satisfied the requirements of 28 U.S.C. section 2254(d) for subclaim C of Claim XX of the Amended Petition for W rit of Habeas Corpus and that the court recommends that Claim I; Claim V; Claim IX; and subclaims A, B, D, E, F, and G of Claim XX of the Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 30 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Spichka, K.)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 688 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/25/2016 GRANTING petitioner Lance Ian Osband's 687 Request for extension of time. Petitioner shall file his Reply Brief no later than 5/4/2015. (Marciel, M)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/23/2015 GRANTING 685 Petitioner's request for an extension of time; Petitioner shall file his reply brief no later than 3/23/2015.(Reader, L)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/6/2014 GRANTING 677 Petitioner's Seventh request for extension of time; Petitioner shall file his reply brief no later than 11/22/2014. (Reader, L)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 671 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/30/2014 GRANTING Petitioner's 670 Fourth Request for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file his reply brief no later than 7/25/2014. (Zignago, K.)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/30/14 GRANTING petitioner's 668 request for a third extension of time to file reply brief. Petitioner shall file his reply brief no later than 6/28/14. (Kastilahn, A)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/26/13 ORDERING that petitioner's 664 Request is GRANTED; and petitioner shall file his reply brief no later than 2/28/2014. (Kastilahn, A)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/8/13 ORDERING the court grants respondent's 10/2/13 request for relief from one-day default in filing respondent's opposition to petitioner's opening brief regarding the application of 28 U.S.C. section 2254(d) to Claims I, V, IX and XX. (Becknal, R)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/30/13 ORDERING that within five days of the filed date of this order, Plaintiff shall file a response to Motion for Extension to time 655 .(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/23/2013 GRANTING 647 Motion for 63-Day Extension of Time; ORDERING that the respondent's brief on the application of 28 U.S.C. § 2254(d) to claims I, V, IX, and XX be filed by 4/2/2013. (Michel, G)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/17/12: Mr. Osband's June 25, 2012 filing shall remain on the docket. To the extent Mr. Osband seeks action based on that filing, his request is denied. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to serve a copy of this order upon petitioner Lance Osband by U.S. mail. (Kaminski, H)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/11/2012 GRANTING 639 Unopposed Request to Modify Briefing Schedule; ORDERING Respondent to file an Answer to Petitioner's Opening Brief addressing the application of § 2254(d) to claims I, V, IX, and XX by 10/1/2012. Petitioner shall file any Reply by 11/30/2012. (Michel, G)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/13/12 ORDERING that Petitioner's Request to extend time is GRANTED; No later than 7/3/2012, Petitioner shall file the opening brief regarding application of § 2254(d) to claims I, V, IX and XX. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/13/12: 623 Request is GRANTED. (Kaminski, H)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/18/2012 GRANTING 616 Request for Extension of Time. Petitioner's Opening Brief regarding application of § 2254(d) to Claims I, V, IX, and XX due by 3/16/2012. (Michel, G)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/19/11: Petitioner's opening brief due: 1/26/2012. Answer Brief due by 4/25/2012. Reply to Answer Brief due by 6/24/2012. (Manzer, C)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/22/11: In Court Hearing RESET for 10/11/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/29/11 CONTINUING In Court Hearing to 8/31/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Meuleman, A)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/20/2011 GRANTING Respondent's Request to Continue 603 ; the In Court Hearing re: Cullen v. Pinholster set for 6/29/2011 is VACATED and RESET for 8/10/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Schultz, C)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/13/11 ORDERING that by 04/28/11, each party shall file a brief on the impact of Cullen v. Pinholster on these proceedings and, in particular, on the issue of sealing portions of the evidentiary hearing transcript and exhibits and on this court's consideration of the claims that were the subject of the evidentiary hearing. (Benson, A.)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/2/11 ORDERING that no later than 4/20/2011, Petitioner's counsel shall complete review of the exhibits and file any request for reconsideration. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/3/2011. Court finds 2/1/2011 587 Request to vacate deadline seeking reconsideration of 12/20/2010 Order is GRANTED. The time for seeking reconsideration shall 21 days after Court acts on parties' Joint Request for Clarification. (Marciel, M)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/1/2011 re 585 ORDERING that petitioner's counsel shall load all evidentiary hearing exhibits into trial presentation software. Petitioner's counsel will then digitally highlight thos e sections of each exhibit petitioner requests the court retain under seal. By February 28, 2011, petitioner's counsel shall send to respondent's counsel digital files containing the highlighted exhibits in.pdf format. Before March 31, 201 1, the parties shall meet and confer to identify their agreements and disagreements regarding the sections of the exhibits to remain sealed. By March 31, 2011, the parties shall file a joint statement identifying and explaining their agreements and disagreements regarding the sections of the exhibits to remain sealed. The joint statement shall be accompanied by copies of the highlighted exhibits.(Duong, D)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/14/11 ORDERING that the Court finds it in the best interest of the court and the parties to reassign this case from the Honorable Judge William B. Shubb to the Honorable Kimberly J. Mueller and vacate the referral of the case to a magistrate judge pursuant to Local Rule 302(c). (Becknal, R)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/14/2010. Court cannot accept communications directly from party represented by counsel. Accordingly, petitioner's 574 Request for Status shall be DISREGARDED. Clerk directed to serve a copy of this Order on Lance Ian Osband. (cc: petitioner Osband) (Marciel, M)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/5/2009 GRANTING 565 Petitioner's Second Request to extend time for filing his reply to Respondent's response re the lines of hearing transcript that should remain under seal; Petitioner shall file his reply on or before 11/4/2009. (Reader, L)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/31/2009 GRANTING petitioner's 562 Request for Extension of Time. The time for filing Reply required by Court's 530 Order is EXTENDED through 10/5/2009. (Marciel, M)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/13/09 ORDERING the time for filing petitioner's statement or other responsive pleading is EXTENDED through 4/18/09. (Carlos, K)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/5/2009. Within 20 days of filed date of this Order, petitioner shall file UNDER SEAL a Statement identifying each portion of the Evidentiary Hearing Transcript, and each portion of any Exhibit s, that he believes should remain under seal, based on attorney/client privilege or work product doctrine. Within 20 days of filing of petitioners Statement, respondent shall file Responsive Statement, also UNDER SEAL. Within 10 days of filing of Response, petitioner may file asealed Reply. Thereafter, Court will designate portions of final Transcript and Exhibits that will remain under seal, and set a Post-Hearing Briefing Schedule. (Marciel, M)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 529 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/29/09 ORDERING that Ptnr's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The record of the evidentiary hearing be kept under seal until this court has reviewed the Magistrate Judge's unsealing order. This matter is REMANDED to the Magistrate Judge to consider which portions of the transcript and exhibits from the evidentiary hearing should be unsealed. (Engbretson, K.)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/1/2008 ORDERING w/in 20 days of the filed date of this order, petitioner to file a concise reply to 486 Brief Regarding Sealing Portions of the Evidentiary Hearing Transcripts and Exhibits. On 3/5/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (KJM) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller argumentswill be heard on the issues raised in the parties' briefs regarding sealing the evidentiary hearing transcript and exhibits.(Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osband v. Calderon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lance Ian Osband
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Brosnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arthur Calderon
Represented By: Ward Allen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeanne S. Woodford
Represented By: Ward Allen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Stokes
Represented By: Ward Allen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven W. Ornoski
Represented By: Ward Allen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L Ayers
Represented By: Ward Allen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert K. Wong
Represented By: Ward Allen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?