June 22, 2016 |
Filing
252
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be dismissed signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/22/16: F&R referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Kaminski, H)
|
February 22, 2016 |
Filing
249
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 02/19/16 ordering plaintiff shall file and serve his pre-trial statement, and any motions necessary to obtain the attendance of witnesses at trial on or before 5/02/16. Defendants shall file their pretrial statement on or before 5/16/16. A pre-trial conference shall be conducted on the file only, without appearances, following submission of pre-trial statements. (Plummer, M)
|
September 17, 2015 |
Filing
246
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 09/17/15 vacating the 4/27/15 findings and recommendations 242 . Plaintiff shall file a status report within 30 days of the date of this order. The clerk of the court shall forward with this order a copy of the 12/09/14 order at 236 . (Plummer, M)
|
April 27, 2015 |
Filing
242
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 04/24/15 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution and failutre to comply with court orders; referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to these F&Rs due within 14 days. (Benson, A)
|
December 9, 2014 |
Filing
236
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/09/14 ordering plaintiff's status report shall be filed and served within 30 days from the date of service of this order. Defendants' status report shall be filed within 30 days after service of plaintiff's status report. The clerk of the court shall mail to all parties the form "Consent to Proceed before United States Magistrate Judge," together with the instant order. (Plummer, M)
|
June 26, 2014 |
Filing
233
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 6/25/14. Plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Show Cause Response due by 7/9/2014. (Manzer, C)
|
August 22, 2013 |
Filing
232
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 8/21/13. Plaintiff shall show cause within 14 days why this case should not be dismissed. (Manzer, C)
|
April 10, 2013 |
Filing
231
ORDER signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 4/9/13 GRANTING 207 Amended Motion for Joinder; DENYING 222 and 227 Motions for Reconsideration. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to issue and send to Funtanilla a summons for Linda L. Melching. Funtanilla shall complete service of process on Melching within 60 days from the date of this order. Melching shall reply to the complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of FRCP 12(a). (Meuleman, A)
|
December 15, 2009 |
Filing
224
ORDER AND WRIT ISSUED signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/14/09 ORDERING issuance of writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum; Custodian to produce Gregorio C. Funtanilla, Jr., at 1/25/10 at 11:15 A.M. by video-conferencing at California S ubstance Abuse Treatment Facility and State Prison-Corcoran before the Honorable Lawrence K. Karlton. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody of this inmate and is order to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and a writ on the Out-to Court desk, CA State Prison. (cc: USM Priority) (Becknal, R)
|
December 11, 2009 |
Filing
223
ORDER signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 12/10/0 ORDERING that the 209 09/08/09 Scheduling Order is VACATED; a revised scheduling order will be entered after determination of plf's motion for joinder. (Benson, A.)
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing
210
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/14/09 ORDERING that w/in 20 days, dfts to file a response to pltf's 207 motion for joinder.(Yin, K)
|
September 3, 2009 |
Filing
208
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/3/09 ORDERING that Upon reconsideration, the order of the magistrate judge filed May 5, 2009, is AFFIRMED. Plaintiff's 206 May 13, 2009, motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The 199 fi ndings and recommendations filed March 19, 2009, are adopted in full. Plaintiff's 165 motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED. Defendants' 170 motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED. Claims 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 12 and 17 are dismissed. This action shall proceed to trial as to claims 9, 10, 11, 13, 14, 15, and 16. (Duong, D)
|
February 9, 2009 |
Filing
198
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 02/09/09 submitting 170 Motion for Summary Judgment for decision. Plaintiff may not file any other papers regarding the summary judgment motion unless otherwise directed by the court. (Plummer, M)
|
February 5, 2009 |
Filing
197
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 02/05/09 ordering that the pretrial conference set for 02/23/09 and the jury trial set for 05/27/09 before the Honorable Lawrence K. Karlton are vacated. (Plummer, M)
|
January 29, 2009 |
Filing
195
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/29/09 GRANTING dfts' 193 request for extension of time to repsond to pltf's 170 motion for summary judgment; dfts have until 1/30/09 to file their opposition. (Yin, K)
|