February 28, 2011 |
Filing
222
JUDGMENT dated *2/28/2011* pursuant to order signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/28/2011. (Waggoner, D)
|
December 20, 2010 |
Filing
218
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/20/10 ORDERING the time to file a stipulation of dismissal, entry of judgment, or a status report from 12/21/10 to and including 2/22/11 is GRANTED. (Carlos, K)
|
October 21, 2010 |
Filing
216
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/21/10 ORDERING that all outstanding motions are denied without prejudice; the 12/7/10 trial date is vacated; and the parties shall continue settlement discussions. If a stipulation of dismissal is not filed within 60 days, the parties shall file a status report. (Becknal, R)
|
September 20, 2010 |
Filing
209
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/17/10 ORDERING the Custodian to produce John Durell Holcomb at 11:15 a.m. on October 12, 2010 in courtroom 4 before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Plummer, M)
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing
208
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/15/2010 ORDERING 207 Trial Confirmation Hearing re-scheduled for 10/12/2010 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. The 205 writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum is hereby VACATED. The court will issue a new writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum requiring the personal attendance of the plaintiff at the 10/12/2010 trial confirmation hearing. (cc: Warden; Calipatria State Prison)(Reader, L)
|
September 13, 2010 |
Filing
205
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/13/10 ORDERING the custodian to produce John Durrell Holcomb at 11:15 a.m. on September 27, 2010 in courtroom 4 before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Plummer, M)
|
September 10, 2010 |
Filing
203
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/10/10 ORDERING the custodian to produce John Durell Holcomb via video conferencing at 11:15 a.m. on September 27, 2010 in courtroom 4 before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Department) (Plummer, M)
|
August 27, 2010 |
Filing
199
ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/27/10 ORDERING the Custodian to produce John Durrell Holcomb via video conferencing at 11:15 a.m. on September 13, 2010 in courtroom 4 before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: IT Dept) (Plummer, M)
|
August 26, 2010 |
Filing
198
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/26/2010 ORDERING 189 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are adopted in full; denying 157 Motion for Enforcement of settlement agreement; settlement agreement is VOIDED; Trial set for 12/7/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 9/13/2010 at 11:15 AM before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Waggoner, D)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing
194
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/20/10 ordering that the order to show cause issued on 07/06/10 is discharged. (Plummer, M)
|
July 6, 2010 |
Filing
189
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/02/10 ORDERING that counsel for defendants show cause within 14 days why he should not be sanctioned in the amount of $750.00 for violation s of rule 11(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for enforcement of the parties settlement agreement 157 be denied and the settlement agreement be voided. Trial be set for 12/07/10 at 10:30 a.m. with a trial confirmation hearing set for 09/13/10 at 11:15 a.m. MOTION to Enforce Parties' Agreement 157 referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
|
July 2, 2010 |
Filing
188
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/02/10 denying 186 Motion for a free transcript of the 04/14/10 hearing. (Plummer, M)
|
April 1, 2010 |
Filing
178
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/1/10 DENYING 175 Motion. (Dillon, M)
|
January 22, 2010 |
Filing
170
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/22/10 granting 169 Motion for a 60 day continuance of the evidentiary hearing. The evidentiary hearing is now scheduled for 03/24/10 at 2:00 p.m. Also, the affidavit of Brian Chavez-Ochoa described in paragraph 7 of the court's 01/07/10 order shall be filed and served no later than 03/15/10. (Plummer, M)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing
168
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/6/10 ORDERING that an Evidentiary Hearing is set for 2/4/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 26 before Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Plaintiff shall appear at the hearing via video conferenc e. Defendants counsel shall make arrangements for plaintiff to appear in this manner. Within 21 days, if plaintiff plans to testify at the hearing, he shall file an affidavit in which he addresses the question presented for the evidentiary hearing. If either party plans to call Brian Chavez-Ochoa as a witness, that party shall arrange for Mr. Chavez Ochoas appearance by issuance of a subpoena. Clerk of the Court shall serve a courtesy copy of this order on Brian Chavez-Ochoa.(Dillon, M)
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing
149
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/21/09 ordering plaintiff's counsel's motion to withdraw 139 is granted. Brian Chavez-Ochoa is hereby relieved as counsel for plaintiff. ( Settlement Conference set for 3/18/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 26 (KJM) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller.) Counsel for defendants shall make arrangements for plaintiff to appear via video conference. (Plummer, M)
|
February 7, 2008 |
Filing
107
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/7/08 ORDERING that Atty Andrea Tytell is relieved from representing pltf; and Atty Michael A. Naranjo is hereby appointed to represent pltf. A Status Conference is SET for 2/27/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (KJM) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order upon Atty Michael A. Naranjo. (Kastilahn, A)
|