March 26, 2010 |
Filing
317
ORDER signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 3/25/10 ORDERING that deft's 304 Motion to Vacate the ad testificandum is DENIED; pltf's 305 Subpoena request is DENIED as untimely; pltf's 311 Request to make a computer available at trial is GRANTED. The court will consider deft's 312 Motion re habit evidence at trial. (cc: Sacramento IT) (Owen, K)
|
March 11, 2010 |
Filing
303
ORDER signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 3/10/2010 ORDERING that a A Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum shall issue, under the seal of page 2 this court, commanding the Warden to produce the inmate named Wilson to testify in United S tates District Court on 3/29/2010 and 3/30/2010 until completion of the proceedings or as ordered by the court. The custodian shall notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and shall provide any new custodian with a copy of this writ . The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a courtesy copy of this order and writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum on the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation Out-To-Court Desk, P.O. Box 290007, Represa, CA95671. (cc Out-To-Court Desk)(Duong, D)
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing
290
ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 03/05/10 ORDERING the Warden to produce inmates Weaver, #J-62752; Cotton, #T-24647; Moore, #D-35681; Guinn, #H-73336 and Eilson, #H-60032 on 03/29/10 and 03/30/10 at 10:00 a.m. for trial at 501 I Street, Sacramento, California until completion of the proceedings or as ordered by the court and to notify the court of any change in custody of the inmate had have been ordered to provide any new custodian with a copy of this writ. (Benson, A.)
|
December 15, 2009 |
Filing
281
ORDER signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 12/14/09 ORDERING this matter is set for trial for 3/29/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski.(Carlos, K)
|
December 2, 2009 |
Filing
278
ORDER signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 12/1/2009 ORDERING that the trial date set for 2/2/2010 is VACATED. A new trial date will be set by a forthcoming order. Pending trial, Pltf shall remain in prison in Sacramento. Pltf's request for evidentiary hearing is DENIED. Pltf's motion in limine regarding prior bad acts evidence is DENIED as moot. Any propsed voir dire questions shall be presented 7 days before the first day of trial. (Engbretson, K.)
|
November 17, 2009 |
Filing
274
WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 11/16/09 ORDERING the Warden to produce inmate Barry Lamon (E-08345) to testify by videoconference on 11/30/09 at 10:00 a.m., until completion of the proceedings or as ordered by the court (cc: Sac IT) (Benson, A.)
|
January 6, 2009 |
Filing
260
ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 1/6/09 ADOPTING 258 Findings and Recommendations in full. Pltf's 254 Motion for Injunctive Relief is DENIED. (Engbretson, K.)
|
February 4, 2008 |
Filing
207
ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 2/4/08 ORDERING that the FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS filed 12/19/07 192 and 193 are both ADOPTED in full. Plaintiff's MOTIONS for injunctive Relief 139 , 140 , 141 , 146 , 148 , 149 , [152 ] and 177 are DENIED. Defendants' MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 156 is contstrued as a MOTION to Dismiss and, so construed, is GRANTED. Plaintiff's religious diet claim is dismissed with prejudice; and Defendants Pliler and Hawthorne are DISMISSED as defendants to this action. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|