Lee v. McGrath, et al
Case Number: |
2:2003cv02197 |
Filed: |
October 20, 2003 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Lawrence K. Karlton |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly J. Mueller |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 21, 2010 |
Filing
96
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 06/18/10 ordering petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus is dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(a). (Plummer, M)
|
June 8, 2010 |
Filing
92
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/8/2010. Court directs parties to expand record with following materials (stated in text of Order) by date of Evidentiary Hearing, if possible. If not, parties should be prepared to address at Hearing the time necessary for provision of said materials. (Marciel, M)
|
June 4, 2010 |
Filing
90
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 06/03/10 denying 85 Motion for judicial notice and the proposed order 86 will not be signed. (Plummer, M)
|
April 23, 2010 |
Filing
84
ORDER re 83 Petitioner's Ex Parte Application, signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/23/10. Petitioner's counsel is authorized to issue a subpoena ordering the person listed below to appear and testify at the June 22, 2010 evidentiary hearing in this action; and The USM shall serve that subpoena and pay witness fees for the following witness: Gregory W. Foster. (Kastilahn, A)
|
March 9, 2010 |
Filing
76
ORDER ADOPTING 74 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to all sections but Section IV.b signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 03/08/10 and ORDERING that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas is DENIED only as to his claims that the trial court violated his 14th Amendment rights when it reneged on the 22 year plea agreement and that counsel was ineffective in failing to preserve this plea offer; the Magistrate Judge shall conduct an evidentiary hearing as to whether petitioner's trial counsel was ineffective in failing to investigate petitioner's competence to enter the no contest pleas. (Benson, A.)
|
December 10, 2009 |
Filing
74
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/10/09 ORDERING that the 72 findings and recommendations filed September 14, 2009 are hereby VACATED. It is recommending that petitioner's 52 application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied. Objections due within 20 days after being served with these findings and recommendations.(Duong, D)
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing
72
[VACATED per 74 ORDER] FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/13/09 recommending that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied. Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 52 referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 20 days]. (Plummer, M) Modified on 12/10/2009 (Duong, D).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?