January 23, 2012 |
Filing
659
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/23/12 ORDERING that the parties will file a further Joint Status Report by 01/24/12 advising the Court whether final confirmation of the settlement terms has been reached. If confirmation has been reached, the Court will vacate the 03/05/12 trial date, and order the parties to file either a Stipulated Request for Dismissal of the action or a further Joint Status Report by 04/09/12. (Benson, A.)
|
January 19, 2012 |
Filing
657
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/18/2012 STAYING case until 1/20/2012. A Joint Status Report is due at that time. (Michel, G)
|
January 10, 2012 |
Filing
655
STIPULATION and ORDER 654 requesting modification of Scheduling Order signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/10/2012. The current due dates for Pretrial filings are as follows: Motions In Limine - 1/11/2012; Oppositions to Motions In Limine - 1/2 5/2012; Replies to Oppositions and Joint Final Pretrial Statement - 2/1/2012; Hearing on Motions In Limine and Final Pretrial Conference - 2/8/2012; Trial Briefs - 2/17/2012; and Responses to Trial Briefs - 2/27/2012. Parties' due date for filin g Motions In Limine and Oppositions to Motions is STAYED for period of 7 days so that they may focus thier efforts on reaching resolution of remaining issues in litigation. Parties to file a Joint Status Report no later than 1/17/2012 advising Court of status of Settlement discussions. (Marciel, M)
|
December 13, 2011 |
Filing
649
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/12/11 ORDERING that Defendant's Request 641 is DENIED. Additionally, Plaintiff's MOTION TO STRIKE [641[ is DENIED as moot. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
December 8, 2011 |
Filing
648
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/7/2011 ORDERING that this case is set for a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/3/2012, at 1:00 p.m. at the U. S. District Court, 501 I Street, Sacramento, CA 95814 in C ourtroom #25. The parties are directed to exchange non-confidential settlement conference statements seven days prior to this settlement conference. These statements shall simultaneously be delivered to the court using the following email address: k jnorders@caed.uscourts.gov. If a party desires to share additional confidential information with the court, they may do so pursuant to the provisions of Local Rule 270(d) and (e). Each party shall e-file a one page document entitled Notice of S ubmission of Settlement Conference Statement. See Local Rule 270(d). Each party is reminded of the requirement that it be represented in person at the settlement conference by a person able to dispose of the case or fully authorized to settle the matter at the settlement conference on any terms. See Local Rule 270. (Zignago, K.)
|
November 3, 2011 |
Filing
643
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/2/11 ORDERING that the court SETS the following schedule: Joint pretrial statement due February 1, 2012; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2012; Hearing on motions in limine sets for 2/8/2012 at 10: 00 AM; Jury Trial set for 3/5/2012 at 09:00 AM. Hearing on the proposed dispositive motion in limine set for 12/14/2011 at 10:00 AM. The court will issue a briefing schedule in accordance with this hearing date, if the hearing is confirmed. The cou rt also will refer this case to settlement. The parties are to submit a stipulation with seven (7) days of the issuance of this order indicating their availability for settlement conference. Upon receipt of the stipulation, the court will issue an order of referral. (Duong, D)
|
September 2, 2011 |
Filing
633
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/1/2011. Since Judge Mueller was the Magistrate Settlement Judge in this matter, parties are ordered to inform Court, w/in 2 weeks of entry of this Order, whether they will will waive any conflict if she remains on the case as trial judge. (Marciel, M)
|
August 9, 2011 |
Filing
629
ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 8/9/2011 ORDERING that dfts' 524 motion for reconsideration of the magistrate judge's discovery order re: punitive damages and dfts' Rule 52(c) motion (made orally on the record on 6/14/2011) are MOOT. (Zignago, K.)
|
August 3, 2011 |
Filing
628
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/3/2011 ORDERING that plaintiffs have prevailed on their claims against UC Davis for ineffective accommodation of female student-athletes under Title IX based upon UC Davis' failure t o demonstrate a continuing practice of program expansion. However, plaintiffs have not prevailed on any other theories of Title IX liability. Moreover, plaintiffs have not prevailed on their claims for Equal Protection Clause violations against any of the individual defendants. As such, defendants Larry Vanderhoef, Greg Warzecka, Pam Gill-Fisher, and Robert Franks are DISMISSED. (Krueger, M)
|
July 12, 2011 |
Filing
621
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 7/12/11 EXTENDING proposed findings of facts and conclusions of law deadline from 7/15/11 to 7/19/11; plaintiffs' written response to defendants' Rule 52 Motion shall be EXTENDED from 7/15/11 to 7/22/11. (Meuleman, A)
|
June 27, 2011 |
Filing
619
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 6/27/11 ORDERING the admission into evidence excerpts of NCAA Manuals. (Meuleman, A)
|
May 18, 2011 |
Filing
594
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 5/18/2011 ORDERING Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration and/or Clarification 540 DENIED. (Krueger, M)
|
February 22, 2011 |
Filing
532
STIPULATION and ORDER 531 signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr., on 2/18/11: The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order is modified as follows: Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 4/21/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrel l, Jr.. Bench Trial is SET for 5/23/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr.. Jury Trial is tentatively SET for August 9-11, 2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr.. (See order for further dates.)(Kastilahn, A)
|
January 12, 2011 |
Filing
520
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/12/11, ORDERING that 513 dfts' Motion for a Protective Order, is DENIED in PART and GRANTED in PART as discussed in this Order. Dfts Vanderhoef, Warzecka, Roberts, and Gill-Fisher SHALL r espond to the discovery demands set forth in this Order within 21 days of the entry of this Order. It is further ORDERED that the Stipulation Regarding Financial Information of Individual Defendants executed by the parties through their respective attorneys on June 18, 2008 and attached hereto as Exhibit A is hereby incorporated as part of this Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kastilahn, A)
|
December 8, 2010 |
Filing
509
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 12/8/2010 ORDERING Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 417 , 426 , 437 , and 452 GRANTED in Part and DENIED in Part. (Krueger, M)
|
November 12, 2010 |
Filing
484
ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 11/12/10 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Request to Seal Confidential documents is GRANTED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
November 8, 2010 |
Filing
465
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 11/5/2010re 464 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' claims against defendant Lawrence Swanson in this action are dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice. Defendant Larry Swanson shall no t seek attorneys' fees, costs or any other relief against Plaintiffs, on their own or through counsel, based upon the filing or prosecution of this action by them. Defendant agrees that neither he nor anyone on his behalf will pursue any claim a gainst Plaintiffs or their counsel for their prosecution of this action against him, including a malicious prosecution claim. Defendant Larry Swanson will withdraw his Motion for Summary Judgment currently set for hearing on December 3, 2010. Each of the parties to bear their own costs.(Duong, D)
|
October 27, 2010 |
Filing
463
ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 10/27/10 ORDERING 462 Ex Parte Application filed by Christine Wing-Si Ng, Lauren Mancuso, Arezou Mansourian GRANTED and they shall be permitted to file a consolidated opposition to the motions for summary judgment filed by the individual dfts and to file asingle memorandum of points and authorities to address the motions of the individual dfts that exceeds the Court's 20 page limited but which is not more than 50 pages. (Carlos, K)
|
September 27, 2010 |
Filing
455
ORDER GRANTING 454 Motion to File Document Under Seal signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 9/27/10. Exhibit N in support of dft Warzecka's motion for summary judgment shall be filed under seal. (Manzer, C)
|
September 20, 2010 |
Filing
451
STIPULATION and ORDER 450 signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr., on 9/20/10, ORDERING that the hearing on dfts' motions for summary judgment 443 , 437 , 426 , 417 is CONT'D to 12/3/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. Pltfs shall file their oppositions to the motions for summary judgment no LATER than 11/9/10; and dfts shall file their replies no LATER than 11/24/10. (Kastilahn, A)
|
September 13, 2010 |
Filing
436
STIPULATION and ORDER 435 To Modify The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order, signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr., on 9/13/10: The last date to hear dispositve motions shall BE 12/3/10. Discovery is to be completed BY 10/25/2010, aside from individual Dft financial status discovery. (Kastilahn, A)
|