Braeseke v. Board Of Prison Term et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv00279
Filed: February 11, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 48 Respondent's Motion for Reconsideration and alternative Motion for Stay, signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 1/12/11. (Kastilahn, A)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/4/2011 ORDERING that petitioner is requested to file a written response to 48 Respondent's Motion no later than 4:00 p.m. on 1/7/2011. (Donati, J)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/23/10 GRANTING petitioner's application for writ of habeas corpus; the respondent is directed to release the petitioner within 30 days unless a new parole suitability hearing is held in accordance with the provisions required by the Fourteenth Amendment; respondent is also directed to file a status report within 30 days. CASE CLOSED. (Manzer, C)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/30/10 recommending that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be granted; and the California Board of Parole Hearings be ordered to set a date for petitioner to parole within 30 days. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braeseke v. Board Of Prison Term et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?