Intermotive, Inc. v. InPower, LLC
Case Number: 2:2005cv00844
Filed: April 28, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/14/12 ORDERING that the parties' Request to Seal Document(s ) 75 is DENIED without prejudice. If the parties wish to renew their request in light of this order, they may do so by 11/23/12. Otherwise, the settlement agreement shall be filed on the public docket by 11/30/12.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/26/12: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/2/2012. Discovery due by 2/10/2013. Status Conference set for 2/21/2013 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H) .
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/11/12 ORDERING that the Court grants 63 the Stipulation to lift stay in all things and directs the parties to file a joint status report addressing the status of the litigation and a proposed schedule for future proceedings within 30 days of the date of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/10/11: Within forty-five days of the date of this order, the parties are to notify the court whether they have reached a settlement. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intermotive, Inc. v. InPower, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?