Wilson v. Woodford et al
Case Number: 2:2005cv00876
Filed: May 3, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/14/2017 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 88 are ADOPTED in FULL; The Clerk of the Court is directed to change the short title of this action in accordance with this order; and this action is DISMISSED. (Reader, L)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/16/17 recommending that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/22/16 ORDERING that within 20 days of service of this order the parties shall inform the court why this case should not be dismissed. (Kastilahn, A)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/22/2013 DENYING without prejudice, plaintiff's 74 motion for enforcement; and DENYING plaintiff's 75 motion for default and sanctions. (cc: DAD) (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?