Nelson v. City of Davis et al
Case Number: 2:2005cv01193
Filed: June 15, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/12/13. DISMISSING this entire action with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/20/13 DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE defendants M. Garcia (Officer), Calvin Handy (Chief of Police), John Wilson (Sergeant), Javier Barragan (Officer) and Calvin Chang (Officer), with all parties bearing their own attorney's fees and costs. The case remains active against defendants City of Davis and James Hyde. (Meuleman, A)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/28/10 ORDERING that based on the foregoing, Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 136 , 137 and 139 are DENIED. To the extent that said motions also request summary adjud ication as to certain claims, however, they are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Summary adjudication is granted as to the Second, Third, Sixth, Ninth and Eleventh Claims for Relief. Defendants' requests for summary adjudication are, however, otherwise denied. (Becknal, R)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/19/2009 GRANTING 133 Application; dft Calvin Chang may file memorandum in support of his motion not to exceed 30 pages; page limits similarly extended to other dfts filing own motions, pltfs opposition points and authorities to any such motions henceforth; reply papers may be up to 15 pages in length. (Suttles, J)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/27/09 ORDERING that an opportunity should be afforded for further dispositive motions. Motions comporting with the Ninth Circuit's requirements must be filed not later than Friday, 10/23/09. Status Conference set for 8/27/09 is hereby VACATED.(Streeter, J)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/26/09 ORDERING that an opportunity should be afforded for further dispositive motions. Motions comporting with the Ninth Circuit's requirements must be filed not later than Friday, 10/23/09. The Status Conf set for 8/27/09 is VACATED and pltf's request for telephonic appearance 130 is DENIED as MOOT.(Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. City of Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?