August 22, 2014 |
Filing
107
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/22/14 ORDERING that plaintiff's motion to file a seventh amended and supplemental complaint filed 03/27/14 97 is granted; the seventh amended complaint is deemed filed and served effective 04/24/14. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed with prejudice; and defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings filed 02/19/14 88 be denied as moot. MOTION for JUDGMENT on the Pleadings 88 referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
March 10, 2014 |
Filing
90
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/7/14 ORDERING that within 21 days of this order, the parties shall address why defendants should not be collaterally estopped from acting contrary to the Gilman decision, why an appropriate remedy in this case should not be a new parole hearing, and the practical effect of the Gilman decision on the Brodheim habeas case, No. 2:06- 2326. Both parties shall file a response that is fifteen pages or less in length.(Dillon, M)
|
November 26, 2013 |
Filing
83
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/26/13 ordering ( Status Conference set for 1/23/2014 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows.) The parties shall file a joint status report by 1/16/14. (Plummer, M)
|
November 12, 2013 |
Filing
80
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/9/2013 and agreed by the parties that defendants shall file their response to the sixth amended complaint on or before 11/18/2013. (Yin, K)
|
October 9, 2013 |
Filing
77
[DISREGARD - DUPLICATE - REFER TO 75 AS ORIGINAL] ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/8/13 ORDERING that Defendant are not required to respond to Plaintiff's fifth amended complaint, filed 8/30/13. Plaintiff shall file a sixth Amended Complaint on or before 10/8/13. Defendants shall file their response to the amended complaint on or before 11/8/13. (Mena-Sanchez, L) Modified on 10/9/2013 (Marciel, M).
|
October 8, 2013 |
Filing
75
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/8/2013 ORDERING defendants are not required to respond to 73 Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Michael J. Brodheim; Plaintiff shall file a Sixth Amended Complaint on or before 10/8/2013; Defendants shall file their response to the amended complaint on or before 11/8/2013. (Waggoner, D)
|
August 14, 2013 |
Filing
72
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/13/13 ORDERING that Defendants need not respond to the fourth amended and supplemental complaint, filed on July 1, 2013. (See ECF No. 70 .) Plaintiff shall file his fifth amended complaint by no later than August 30, 2013. Defendants shall respond to the fifth amended complaint by no later than September 30, 2013.(Dillon, M)
|
June 11, 2013 |
Filing
69
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/11/13 ORDERING that Defendants need not respond to the third amended and supplemental complaint, filed on May 27, 2013. On or before July 1, 2013, Plaintiff shall file a fourth amended com plaint or take other appropriate action based on the Governors response to the Boards findings that Plaintiff be granted parole. If Plaintiff files a fourth amended complaint, Defendants shall file their response to the amended complaint on or before July 31, 2013.(Dillon, M)
|
May 7, 2012 |
Filing
56
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/7/12 RECOMMENDING that the civil rights action, Case No. Civ-S-05-1512 LKK GGH P, be dismissed without prejudice to the ruling in the Gilman class. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
March 29, 2012 |
Filing
51
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/28/12 ORDERING that plaintiff show cause, within fourteen days, why the civil rights action, Case No. Civ-S-05-1512 LKK GGH P, should not be dismissed forthwith. (Dillon, M)
|
July 27, 2005 |
Filing
1
ORDER signed by Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/26/05. A separate civil action is to be opened as to plaintiff Michael J. Brodheim. 2 Amended Complaint is DISMISSED. Clerk directed to sent plaintiff a new form for filing a civil rights action, an Application to Proceed IFP, and a copy of the Amended Complaint.(Marciel, M) Modified on 7/27/2005 (Marciel, M).
|