August 15, 2011 |
Filing
202
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/13/2011 ORDERING that plaintiff's 191 motion for verdict notwithstanding judgment and for a new trial is DENIED. This case is CLOSED. (Duong, D)
|
August 9, 2011 |
Filing
201
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/8/11 ORDERING the court hereby DISCHARGES the order to show cause 188 . (Becknal, R)
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing
176
AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/24/11 ORDERING the 04/07/11 order and writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum 157 is vacated. The Custodian is to produce Charles T. Davis at 06/20/11 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Plummer, M)
|
May 23, 2011 |
Filing
172
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/20/11 ORDERING that the court hereby VACATES the May 31 trial date and RESETS the trial date to June 20, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. Trial will begin on this date. All other dates remain the same. An appropriate writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum shall issue in accordance with this order. (Duong, D)
|
April 11, 2011 |
Filing
158
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/11/2011. Defendant's Request for Separate Trial regarding punitive damages is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion In Limine is GRANTED to the extent that defendant may introduce evidence of fac t of plaintiff's felony convictions for impeachment purposes ONLY. The parties shall file: a) Motions In Limine by 5/10/2011 21 days before Trial; b) Trial Briefs by 5/17/2011 - 14 days before Trial; c) Evidentiary Objections by 5/17/2011 - 14 d ays before Trial; d) Proposed Voir Dire by 5/24/2011 - 17 days before Trial; and e) Proposed Jury Instructions by opening of Trial on 5/31/2011. No filing shall exceed 20 pages. Plaintiff's 4/4/2011 151 Motion for Order directing officials at High Desert State Prison to give him access to his legal property is DENIED as unnecessary. (Marciel, M)
|
April 7, 2011 |
Filing
157
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/07/11 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Charles T. Davis at 05/31/11 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Plummer, M)
|
March 23, 2011 |
Filing
148
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/23/11 ORDERING the custodian to produce Byron Eugene Johnson at 04/06/11 at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Plummer, M)
|
March 22, 2011 |
Filing
147
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/22/11 ORDERING dfts' request that the trial confirmation hearing be conducted telephonically 145 is DENIED; pltf's motion for extension of time to comply with a portion of the pretri al order 146 ; pltf is ORDERED to mail copies of the exhibits, schedules, and summaries and other items he anticipates offering into evidence to defendants no later than 4/1/11 and to bring copies with him to the trial confirmation hearing. (Carlos, K)
|
February 17, 2011 |
Filing
143
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 02/17/11 ordering the custodian to produce Byron Eugene Johnson via video-conferencing at 04/06/11 at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 3 before the Honorable Kimberly J. Mueller. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept) (Plummer, M)
|
May 4, 2010 |
Filing
138
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/4/10 ORDERING that plaintiff's 3/19/10 motion for appointment of counsel is denied. (Becknal, R)
|
May 3, 2010 |
Filing
137
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/03/10 ORDERING this case is set for a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on May 26, 2010, at 11:00 a.m. at High Desert State Prison, 475-750 Rice Canyon Road, Susan ville, California 96127; parties shall appear with full settlement authority; the parties are to provide confidential settlement conference statements to Sujean Park, 501 I Street, Suite 4-200, Sacramento, California 95814, to be received no later than May 17, 2010; the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Litigation Officeat High Desert State Prison via facsimile at (530) 251-5031. (Williams, D)
|
January 29, 2010 |
Filing
133
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/29/10 ORDERING that 132 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED; 131 Motion for Extension of time is GRANTED and plaintiff has 60 days from the date this order is served to file and serve a pretrial statement.(Dillon, M)
|
December 15, 2009 |
Filing
129
ORDER DIRECTING THE FILING OF PRETRIAL STATEMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/15/09 ordering plaintiff shall file and serve his pretrial statement and any motions necessary to obtain the attendance of witnesses at trial within 30 days of filing of this order. Defendants shall file their pretrial statement not later than 21 days after plaintiff's pretrial statement is filed. The pretrial conference will be conducted on the file only, without appearance by either party. The date for jury trial before the Honorable Garland E. Burrell will be set in the pretrial order. (Plummer, M)
|
October 30, 2009 |
Filing
128
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/29/09 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 127 motion for reconsideration filed October 19, 2009 is DENIED. (Duong, D)
|
September 15, 2009 |
Filing
122
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/15/09 ORDERING that Plaintiffs 6/30/08 motions to continue this matter pursuant to Rule 56(f) are DENIED; Plaintiffs 120 request for judicial notice is DENIED; RECOMMENDING that Defendant Mirandas 4/3/04, motion for summary judgment be granted; Defendant Baillies 4/4/04, motion for summary judgment be granted; Plaintiffs 4/24/09 cross-motion for summary judgment be denied; Judgment be entered in favor of those defendants; and the Clerk be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 15 days.(Dillon, M)
|