Wall v. Leavitt
Case Number: 2:2005cv02553
Filed: December 14, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 STIPULATION and ORDER 228 for Releases and Dismissal signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 7/1/2009. Pursuant to parties' stipulated settlement, Court hereby APPROVES settlement and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff to waive all appeal rights and the Secretary to waive her right to collect costs with prejudice and per other terms and conditions set forth in Settlement Agreement. (Marciel, M)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/28/2009 GRANTING 211 Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendant's brief is now due on 2/24/2009 and all other briefing deadlines and schedules specified in the prior order remain unchanged. (Matson, R)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/12/09 ORDERING that defendant shall file his motion for summary judgment within thirty days of this order. Plaintiff shall file an opposition and/or cross-motion within thirty days of being served with defendant's motion. The opposition may explain why further discovery is needed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f). Defendant may file a reply within fifteen days of receiving plaintiff's opposition and/or cross-motion. (Duong, D)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 1/8/09 ORDERING that the Findings and Recommendations 202 are ADOPTED; and Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment, 165 , is GRANTED as to the Third C ause of Action, and the First Cause of Action insofar as it alleges the non-existence of informal procedures for challenging and rectifying a tentative requirement to repay Medicare for conditional payments made prior to payment by a primary payer. (This order resolves the entire docket # 165).(Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wall v. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?