Glenn v. Cole et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv00151
Filed: January 19, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/18/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff's 84 motion for sanctions is DENIED. In the future, the court will not respond to such material. (Yin, K)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/28/2011 DENYING plaintiff's 73 motion. (Yin, K)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K Delaney on 08/11/11 ordering that plaintiff's 02/22/11 ex parte motion for an order to sanction defendant..." construed as a motion requesting an order directing High Deseert State Prison to granish the wages of defendant Cole 63 is denied. (Plummer, M)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 9/16/2010 ORDERING 51 Findings and Recommendations are adopted in full; and plaintiff's motions for transfer to CSP-Sacramento 47 49 are denied. (Matson, R)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/7/10 RECOMMENDING that 47 and 49 motions for transfer to CSP-Sacramento be denied. Referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/7/10 recommending that plaintiff's 36 motion for default judgment be granted; Plaintiff be awarded $1.00 in nominal damages from defendant Cole; Plaintiff be awarded $2,000.00 in punitive damages from defendant Cole. Referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 02/08/10 ordering the court will hear plaintiff's motion for default judgment 36 on 04/20/10 by video conference at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiff shall submit any documents relevant to his claim, including the CDC 114d order, no later than 04/01/10. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on defendant Jonathan Cole and Monica Andersoon, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (cc: Monica Anderson, Attorney General)(Plummer, M)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/13/09 GRANTING 31 Motion for Entry of Default; Clerk of the Court is directed to enter a default against the defendant, Jonathan S. Cole; The 31 motion to appoint counsel is DENIED; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (cc Monica Anderson)(Dillon, M)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/07/09 ordering defendant Jonathan Cole to show cause within 20 days from the date of this order why default should not be entered. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (cc: Monica Anderson)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn v. Cole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?