Kemper vs Catholic Healthcare West
Case Number: 2:2006cv00295
Filed: February 10, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/2/2020 GRANTING 299 Motion for Settlement Corrected Facility Order, ENTERING a Settlement Corrected Facility Order as to Mark Twain Medical Center. This Order constitutes a final judgment for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54. (Coll, A)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/17/2020 GRANTING 296 Dignity Health's Unopposed Motion for a Settlement Corrected Facility Order for the Mercy Medical Center Redding Facility. A Settlement Corrected Facility Order is hereb y entered as to Mercy Medical Center Redding, including each of its related facilities as identified in Section 2 of the Facility Consent Decree Mercy Medical Center Redding, which has fulfilled its obligations under and complied with its Consent Decree and Facility Modification Plan. This Order constitutes a final judgment for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54. (Zignago, K.)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 SETTLEMENT CORRECTED FACILITY ORDER FOR SIERRA NEVADA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/11/19 GRANTING 289 Dignity Health's Unopposed Motion for a Settlement Corrected Facility Order for the Sierra Nevada Memorial Hospital Facility. A Settlement Corrected Facility Order is hereby entered as to Sierra Nevada Memorial Hospital, including each of its related facilities as identified in Section 2 of the Facility Consent Decree Sierra Nevada Memorial Hospital, which has fulfilled its obligations under and complied with its Consent Decree and Facility Modification Plan. This Order constitutes a final judgment for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54.(Becknal, R)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 282 SETTLEMENT CORRECTED FACILITY ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 04/26/18 GRANTING 280 Dignity Health's Unopposed Motion for a Settlement Corrected Facility Order for the Mercy Medical Center Merced, Dominican Campus Facility. A Settlement Corrected Facility Order is ENTERED as to Mercy Medical Center Merced, Dominican Campus, including each of its related facilities as identified in Section 2 of the Facility Consent Decree Mercy Medical Center Merced, Dominican Campus, which has fulfilled its obligations under and complied with its Consent Decree and Facility Modification Plan. This Order constitutes a final judgment for purposes of FRCP 54. (Benson, A.)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/20/2017 ORDERING that Dignity Healths 275 Unopposed Motion for a Settlement Corrected Facility Order for the St. Rose Dominican Hospitals, Rose de Lima Campus Facility is GRANTED. (Zignago, K.)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/17/2017 GRANTING 275 Motion and ORDERING A Settlement Corrected Facility Order is hereby entered as to St. Joseph's Hospital and Medical Center, including each of its related facilities as i dentified in Section 2 of the Facility Consent Decree St. Joseph's Hospital and Medical Center, which has fulfilled its obligations under and complied with its Consent Decree and Facility Modification Plan. This Order constitutes a final judgment for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54.(Washington, S)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 SETTLEMENT CORRECTED FACILITY ORDER FOR ST. JOSEPHS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/16/17 GRANTING 274 Dignity Health's Unopposed Motion for a Settlement Corrected Facility Order for the St. Josep h' Hospital and Medical Center Facility. Settlement Corrected Facility Order is hereby entered as to St. Joseph's Hospital and Medical Center, including each of its related facilities as identified in Section 2 of the Facility Consent De cree St. Joseph's Hospital and Medical Center, which has fulfilled its obligations under and complied with its Consent Decree and Facility Modification Plan. This Order constitutes a final judgment for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54. (Benson, A.)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 273 SETTLEMENT CORRECTED FACILITY ORDER FOR FRENCH HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/7/17. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Dignity Healths Unopposed 271 Motion for a Settlement Corrected Facility Order for the French Hospital Medical Center Facility is GRANTED. A Settlement Corrected Facility Order is hereby entered as to French Hospital Medical Center, including each of its related facilities as identified in Section 2 of the Facility Consent Decree French Hospital Medical Center, which has fulfilled its obligations under and complied with its Consent Decree and Facility Modification Plan. This Order constitutes a final judgment for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54. (Becknal, R)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 SETTLEMENT CORRECTED FACILITY ORDER FOR ARROYO GRANDE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL granting by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/12/17. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Dignity Health' 268 Unopposed Motion for a Settlement Corrected Facility Order for the Arroyo Grande Community Hospital Facility is GRANTED. A Settlement Corrected Facility Order is hereby entered as to Arroyo Grande Community Hospital, including each of its related facilities as identified in Section 2 of the Facility Co nsent Decree Arroyo Grande Community Hospital, which has fulfilled its obligations under and complied with its Consent Decree and Facility Modification Plan. This Order constitutes a final judgment for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54. (Kastilahn, A)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/23/2017 ORDERING that the 259 Joint Motion for Approval of Facility Consent Decree Community Hospital of San Bernardino is hereby GRANTED. (Zignago, K.)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/22/2017 ORDERING that Dignity Health's Unopposed Motion for a Settlement Corrected Facility Order for the Mercy Medical Center Merced Facility is GRANTED. (Zignago, K.)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/13/2017 ORDERING that Dignity Health's Unopposed 243 Motion for a Settlement Corrected Facility Order for the Dominican Hospital Facility is GRANTED. (Zignago, K.)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/19/2017 ORDERING that Dignity Health's Unopposed 237 Motion for a Settlement Corrected Facility Order for the St. Rose Dominican Hospitals, San Martin Campus Facility is GRANTED. (Zignago, K.)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 01/18/2017 GRANTING Joint 236 Motion for Approval of Facility Consent Decree. (Jackson, T)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/19/2015 GRANTING 219 Unopposed Motion for a Settlement Corrected Facility Order; ENTERING a Settlement Corrected Facility Order as to Chandler Regional Medical Center, including each of its related facilities as identified in Section 2 of the Facility Consent Decree - Chandler Regional Medical Center. (Michel, G.)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/03/15 ORDERING that the 204 Joint Motion for Approval of Facility Consent Decree - St. Mary's Medical Center San Francisco is GRANTED. (Benson, A)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/11/14 GRANTING 196 Motion for a Settlement Corrected Facility Order for the Mercy Gilbert Medical Facility. A Settlement Corrected Facility Order is hereby entered as to Mercy Gilbert Medical Center, including each of its related facilities as identified in Section 2 of the Facility Consent Decree Mercy Gilbert Medical Center, which has fulfilled its obligations under and complied with its Consent Decree and Facility Modification Plan. This Order constitutes a final judgment for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54. (Meuleman, A)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/8/14 ORDERING that the Joint Motion 179 for Approval of FACILITY CONSENT DECREE - FRENCH HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER be and hereby is GRANTED. (Becknal, R)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/12/14 ORDERING that the JOINT MOTION for approval of facility Consent Decree- St. Joseph's Hospital and Medical Center 175 , 187 is GRANTED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/5/2014. Parties Joint Motions for Approval of Facility Consent Decrees for the following institutions are currently set for hearing on 3/17/2014: 169 St. Rose Dominican Hospitals, San Martin Campus; 170 St. Rose Dominican Hospitals and Siena Campus; 172 St. Bernardine Medical Center; 173 Grande Arroyo Community Hospital; 174 Marian Regional Medical Center; and 175 St. Joseph's Hospital and Medical Center. The Court does not find oral argument regarding these Motions necessary and will decide them on the papers. Accordingly, the Hearing on these Motions is VACATED. (Marciel, M)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 SETTLEMENT CORRECTED FACILITY ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/30/2014. (Michel, G)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/30/2013 ORDERING 165 that, in accordance with Paragraph 16.1 of the Consent Decree, the Supplement to Exhibit A provided with that Stipulation, dated 3/20/2013, replaces the prior Exhib it A to the Consent Decree, which became the operative Exhibit A pursuant to an order of this Court on or about 11/26/2012. The Supplement to Exhibit A filed with this Court on 3/22/2013, identifies the Facilities that are entitled to the protections of the Consent Decree, and shall be the operative Exhibit A to the Consent Decree as of 3/22/2013. (Reader, L)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/1/2013 GRANTING 159 Joint Motion for Approval of Facility Consent Decree - Mercy Hospitals of Bakersfield - Southwest Campus; VACATING the associated motion hearing set for 8/12/2013. (Michel, G)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/26/12 Approving Stipulation regarding Defendant's submission of supplement to Exhibit A. The Supplement to Exhibit A, dated 11/12/12, replaces the prior Exhibit A to the Consent Decree filed on or about 3/22/09; identifies the Facilities that are entitled to the protections of the Consent Decree; and shall be the operative Exhibit A to the Consent Decree going forward.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/21/12 ORDERING that the Parties' Stipulation 146 Regarding Rescheduling Date of Continued Settlement Conference is GRANTED. The Continued Settlement Conference regarding Named Plaintiff Edward L. Kemper's claim for damages is SET for 7/19/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Kastilahn, A)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion for Approval of facility Consent Decree-Dominican Hospital signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/14/12. (Matson, R)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/23/12 ORDERING Plaintiffs, pursuant to Local Rule 182(h), to designate a member of the Bar of this Court who does maintain an office within this District as co-counsel with the authority to act as attorney of record for all purposes. Local Rule 182(h). (Meuleman, A)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/30/11 ORDERING that plaintiff's 121 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing is DENIED without prejudice; the 10/05/11 hearing is VACATED; plaintiff's 123 Motion to Appear Telephonically is DENIED a s moot; a Settlement Conference is set for 03/22/12 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd; counsel are directed to submit settlement conference statements to the settlement judge not later than 03/15/12 (cc: DAD). (Benson, A.)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 FACILITY CONSENT DECREE - SEQUOIA HOSPITAL signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/03/10. (Benson, A.)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/25/2010 GRANTING 94 Joint Motion for Approval of Facility Consent Decree for Chandler Regional Medical Center.(Matson, R)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/26/2010 GRANTING 89 Motion for approval of facility consent decree - Mercy Gilbert Medical Center. (Zignago, K.)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/25/10 ORDERING the parties' Joint Motion for Approval of Notice for Individual Facility Consent Decrees 84 is GRANTED. (Carlos, K)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/15/2009 GRANTING 77 Joint Motion for Approval of the Stipulation Regarding Agreed Upon Tolerances and Procedures. (Suttles, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemper vs Catholic Healthcare West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?