Noonkester v. Tehama County Sheriff, et al
Case Number: |
2:2006cv00306 |
Filed: |
February 13, 2006 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Gregory G. Hollows |
Presiding Judge: |
David F. Levi |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 25, 2012 |
Filing
86
ORDER signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 5/25/2012 ORDERING 85 The court DENIES as beyond its jurisdiction Noonkester's ex parte application requesting the court to order Coalinga State Hospital to release its financial hold on plaintiff's settlement funds and return them to plaintiff. The court expresses its sincere hope that Noonkester and the state can reach an amicable settlement of their dispute over his settlement funds. (Reader, L)
|
March 9, 2012 |
Filing
84
ORDER 83 for DISMISSAL signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 3/8/2012. Court has considered the Settlement Agreement executed by both parties arising out of court-ordered mediation. Good cause appearing, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs and fees. (Marciel, M)
|
July 29, 2011 |
Filing
78
ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM, signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 7/28/11. The Director of the Coalinga State Hospital is COMMANDED to produce inmate Riley Noonkester before Mediator Joe Ramsey, by video-conference from C oalinga State Hospital, to the U.S. District Court, 501 I Street, Sacramento, California 95814 in Courtroom #2 on October 27, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this Order and Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum on the Lit igation Coordinator at Coalinga State Hospital via fax at (559) 935-4308. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 7/29/2011 (Kastilahn, A). (cc: Sent three certified copies of Order and Writ of HC Ad Testificandum to the Director of Coalinga State Hospital; and faxed a copy of this Order and Writ to the Litigation Coordinator at Coalinga State Hospital via fax at (559) 935-4308.
|
July 21, 2011 |
Filing
76
ORDER signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 7/21/2011. Court is DENYING defendants' 62 Motion for Summary Judgment on Noonkester's claims regarding access to dayroom and exercise yard while cellside; detention cellside when high- security pretrial detainee was held in SHU; delayed medical treatment for DVT and use of restraints during transport between Jail and Courthouse. Court is GRANTING 62 Summary Judgment to defendants on all other claims and to Sheriff Parker in his personal capacity on all claims. Court orders parties to contact Sujean Park with Alternative Dispute Resolution Program to move forward with mediation. (cc: S. Park, ADRP Director) (Marciel, M)
|
June 24, 2011 |
Filing
75
ORDER signed by Chief Circuit Judge Alex Kozinski on 06/23/11 GRANTING the 74 Motion for a Status Report. Motion for Summary Judgment is under review. (Michel, G)
|
September 1, 2009 |
Filing
70
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 08/31/09 ADOPTING 60 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; and GRANTING 59 Defendant Transcor America's Motion to Dismiss. (Streeter, J)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?