January 24, 2017 |
Filing
248
MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/24/2017 re 237 Plaintiffs' SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for AWARD ATTORNEY FEES and 240 Defendants' MOTION for LEAVE TO DEPOST MONEY: IT IS ORDERED that 237 plaintiffs' second supplemental motion for attorney's fees be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in the amount of $32,132.50. Defendants' motion for leave to deposit money with the court 240 is DENIED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
November 15, 2016 |
Filing
233
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/14/16 ORDERING a Status Conference set for Monday, December 19, 2016 at *1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5. No later than December 12, 2016, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a Joint Status Repo rt. The Joint Status Report shall set forth the status of the request for attorney's fees, including proposed deadlines for the filing of any related motion. The Joint Status Report shall also address any other issues that the parties think need to be addressed at the December 19, 2016 Status Conference. (Becknal, R) Modified on 11/15/2016 (Kirksey Smith, K).
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing
228
AMENDED MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/25/14. Plaintiff's motion for supplemental attorney's fees is granted in the amount of $21,868.75. (Manzer, C)
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing
227
ORDER granting plantiff's 215 Motion for Supplemental Attorney Fees in the amount of $20,748.75, signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/20/14. The 8/25/2014 hearing date is vacated. (Kastilahn, A)
|
May 21, 2014 |
Filing
211
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/21/14 DENYING 206 Motion for Relief from Final Judgment. (Meuleman, A)
|
February 25, 2014 |
Filing
204
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/24/2014 GRANTING 181 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees, in the amount of $314,497.73; Defendants' Motion for costs is DENIED. (Reader, L)
|
January 29, 2014 |
Filing
202
STIPULATION and ORDER 201 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/29/2014 resetting 181 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES for 2/24/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
September 11, 2013 |
Filing
173
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/11/13 ORDERING that the time for Plaintiffs to file a Motion for Attorneys' fees, and any hearing on the Attorneys' fees Motion is CONTINUED. Any Motion for Attorneys' fees filed by Plaintiffs shall be filed and heard consistent with the briefing schedule noted in the Stipulation of the parties. The hearing on any such Motion is SET for 2/10/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
August 2, 2013 |
Filing
134
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/2/2013 GRANTING 131 Defendants' Counsel's Request to appear by telephone at the 8/5/2013 2:00 PM motion. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
July 30, 2013 |
Filing
127
ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/30/2013 ORDERING 121 the United States Marshal for the EDCA and the Sacramento County Sheriff commanding to bring the body of Major Norton, III to appear in court, before the Honorable William B. Shubb, in Courtroom 5, 14th Floor, Sacramento, CA, beginning on 8/7/2013 through and including 8/9/2013 at 9:00 AM, each day and at the termination of trial each daay to retun to the Sacramento County Main Jail. (Hand Deliver to USM, SCJ USPS)(Reader, L)
|
June 25, 2013 |
Filing
93
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/24/13 ORDERING for the reasons stated by the court at the hearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' counsel's motion to withdraw be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. (Becknal, R)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing
91
ORDER GRANTING 89 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME to hear Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs, signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/20/2013: The hearing on the 88 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY is reset for 6/24/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Plaintiffs Jason Eugene DeOcampo, Jesus Sebastian Grant, and Jaquezs Tyree Berry, are hereby ORDERED to personally appear at the hearing. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
May 24, 2013 |
Filing
87
AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER 85 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/24/2013 continuing the Pretrial Conference from 6/24/2013 to 7/8/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, and the deadlines and requirements per the prior Pretrial Orders of the Court now correspond to the new Pre-trial Conference date. The trial date of 8/6/2013 remains unchanged. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
May 23, 2013 |
Filing
86
STIPULATION and ORDER 84 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/23/2013 continuing the Pretrial Conference from 6/24/2013 to 7/8/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, and is subject to the same filing deadlines and requirements per prior Pretrial Order in this case. The trial date of August 6, 2013 remains unchanged. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
May 9, 2013 |
Filing
83
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/9/2013 DISMISSING, with prejudice, Plaintiffs due process claims under the Fifth Amendment in Plaintiffs First Cause of Action; DISMISSING, with prejudice, Plaintiffs excessive force claims under the Fifth and Fourteenth Amendments in Plaintiffs First Cause of Action; DISMISSING, with prejudice, Plaintiffs claims for violation of privacy under the Ninth Amendment in Plaintiffs First Cause of Action; DISMISSING, with prejudice, Pl aintiffs claims for violation of Equal Protection under the Fourteenth Amendment in Plaintiffs First Cause of Action; DISMISSING, with prejudice, Plaintiffs claims for negligent infliction of emotional distress in Plaintiffs Sixth Cause of Action; ORDERING that each party bear their own fees and costs in relation to these dismissed claims.(Michel, G)
|