Nelson v. Runnels et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv01289
Filed: June 12, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/1/14 ORDERING that Defendants Amero, Dangler and Smith are dismissed from this action, with prejudice; and this action is closed. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/18/2014 ORDERING that defendants' counsel shall notify this court, within 7 days, whether any remaining defendant has any objection to his or her dismissal from this action.(Yin, K)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/28/2014 and stipulated between the parties to DISMISS defendant G. James, M.D., with prejudice. (Yin, K)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/20/13 ordering ( Settlement Conference set for 2/25/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.) The parties are required to file a signed waiver of disqu alification, no later than 12/05/13. The parties are directed to exchange non-confidential settlement statements 7 days prior to the settlement conference. These statements shall simultaneously be delivered to the court using the following email address: kjnorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Plummer, M)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/15/2013 ORDERING the Clerk to inform Ms. Sujean Park to set this matter FORTHWITH for a settlement conference before a magistrate judge; should the parties fail to reach a settlement agreement, the court will then set dates for pretrial conference and trial, subject to the filing fo a further Joint Status Report. (cc: ADR)(Yin, K)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/12/13 ORDERING that the parties may engage in further discovery until 8/30/13, which shall also be the deadline for expert witness disclosures. Plaintiff may, but need not, file and serve a Third Amende d Complaint on or before 5/31/2013 if a Third Amended Complaint is filed, defendants shall timely file and serve an answer. Should plaintiff file a Third Amended Complaint, any party may, but need not, file and serve a motion for summary judgment on or before 11/1/2013. If no party files a motion for summary judgment, the parties shall, on or before 11/15/2013, file a further joint status report that identifies, for the subsequent year, any dates on which any party is unavailable to proceed to trial or attend a pretrial conference. (Kastilahn, A)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/8/13. Attorney Kresta Nora Daly added for Raymond Paul Nelson. Joint status report due within 60 days. (cc: ADR and Kresta Daly via electronic notification and USPS) (Manzer, C)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/4/13. Attorney James Jeffries Goodwin terminated. Case Referred back to ADR and Pro Bono Coordinator to seek different counsel. Case stayed. (Manzer, C)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/23/2012 ORDERING that Counsel shall separately, on or before Wednesday, 4/25/2012, show cause why each counsel did not timely file a joint status report. Counsel shall jointly, on or before Wedn esday, 4/25/2012, file a joint status report informing the court whether there is a need for further discovery in this action; whether there is a reasonable possibility to achieve settlement in this action and, if so, whether a settlement conference should be scheduled forthwith; proposed dates for a trial confirmation hearing and for trial, with an estimated length of trial; and any other matters requiring resolution at the status conference, or that may contribute to the just and expeditious disposition of this action. (Zignago, K.)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/19/11 ORDERING that the Pretrial Order, filed 6/17/11 104 , is VACATED, including all dates set forth therein; the parties may engage in further discovery. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file and serve, within thirty days after the filing date of this order; a Third Amended Complaint. A Further Status Conference is scheduled on Monday, 4/30/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Not later than fourteen days prior to the Status Conference, counsel shall together file and serve a joint status report that addresses the need for any further discovery. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL and CONFIRMING STATUS CONFERENCE signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/29/11 ORDERING that James Jeffries Goodwin is APPOINTED as counsel. James Jeffries Goodwin shall notify Sujean Park, at (916) 930-4278 or via email at spark@caed.uscourts.gov, if he has any questions related to the appointment. A Status Conference is SET for 10/24/2011 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 4. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order upon James Goodwin, Goodwin Law Corp, 101 Parkshore Drive, Suite 100 Folsom CA 95630. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/7/2011 ORDERING that Pltf's 110 motion to continue proceeding in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Pltf's request for appointment of counsel, renewed at the 8/29/2011 status conference, is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to contact Sujean Park for the purpose of locating forthwith an attorney who is willing to accept this appointment. (cc: Sujean Park) (Zignago, K.)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/29/2011 ORDERING that within 7 days, Pltf shall file a new IFP application. The Clerk is directed to send Pltf a blank IFP application. The current trial date of 9/20/2011 is VACATED, as are all other deadlines set forth in the court's 104 Pretrial Order. A status conference will be held on Monday, October 24, 2011, at 11:15 a.m., in Courtroom No. 4. (Zignago, K.)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER 105 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/19/2011. Trial Confirmation Hearing is RE-SCHEDULED for 8/15/2011 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK). (Marciel, M)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/16/11 ORDERING that the courts 98 order to show cause filed is DISCHARGED. Plaintiffs 100 motion to obtain the attendance of incarcerated witness Joshua Christenson is GRANTED; the court will issue a timely writ ad testificandum to obtain the attendance of Mr. Christenson at trial.(Dillon, M)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/6/11ORDERING that within 7 days after the filing date of this order, plaintiff shall: (1) show cause in writing why he did not timely comply with this courts 94 and 97 orders; (2) submit an amended motion, with supporting affidavits, to obtain the trial attendance of plaintiffs incarcerated and/or involuntary witnesses; and (3) submit an amended comprehensive witness list that includes all of plaintiffs witnesses, including his medical expert witnesses.(Dillon, M)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/5/11 ORDERING that plaintiffs 95 request for extension of time is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall file, on or before 5/27/11, an amended motion, with supporting affidavits; the pretrial conference is rescheduled to 6/2/11, before the magistrate judge, without appearance by any party. The Trial Confirmation Hearing is rescheduled to 7/18/11, at 11:15 a.m., and the commencement of Trial is rescheduled to 9/20/11 at 10:30 a.m. before the Honorable Lawrence K. Karlton, in Courtroom No. 4.(Dillon, M)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/20/11 ORDERING that within 14 days after the filing date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the court the following: a new affidavit and motion to obtain the trial attendance of plaintiffs incarcerated witnesses; an amended witness list that includes plaintiffs medical expert witnesses; and if additional time is required to complete either of these matters, plaintiff shall file a timely request for a very limited extension of time, and such request shall demonstrate plaintiffs due diligence in attempting to timely comply with this order.(Dillon, M)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/26/11 ordering that a settlement conference would not be presently helpful in resolving this case. Accordingly, the parties are directed to adhere to the terms of the Further Scheduling Order filed by the undersigned on 10/14/10 84 . (Plummer, M)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/10/11 ORDERING that the parties to this action shall each, no later than 15 days from the filing date of this order, submit confidential statements as described in this order. (Dillon, M)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/28/10 ordering plaintiff and defendants shall within 7 days after service of this order, file separate status reports identifying the estimated length of trial. The court will thereafter issue a further scheduling order setting this case for trial and setting forth the deadlines for filing pretrial statements. (Plummer, M)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ADOPTING 78 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/16/10; 69 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. (Manzer, C)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/11/10 recommending that 69 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT be denied. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/12/2010 ORDERING that the 6/29/10 trial and the deadlines for filing pretrial statements are VACATED pending further order of this court.(Yin, K)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/27/09 ordering plaintiff's 06/02/09 and 06/30/09 motions for appointment of counsel 56 , 60 are denied. Plaintiff's 06/02/09 motion to obtain the attendance of certain incarcerated witnesses at trial 57 is denied as premature. Plaintiff's 06/02/09 motion to compel 58 is denied without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/28/2009 ORDERING Pltf's 9/8/2008 request to dismiss defendant Garbutt from this action (Doc. No. 41) is granted; Dft Garbutt is dismissed; andPltf's 12/10/2008 and 12/19/2008 motions to compel (Doc. Nos. 46 & 47) are denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that dfts' 36 Motion to Dismiss be granted. Objections to the F&R's are due w/in 15 days.(Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Runnels et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?