Broadway v. Felkner et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv01482
Filed: July 3, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 01/13/11 ordering plaintiff's petition for a writ of execution 126 is denied. (Plummer, M)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/27/10 ORDERING the findings and recommendations 124 are ADOPTED IN FULL; and pltf's requests for enforcement of the settlement agreement 120 121 123 are DENIED. (Carlos, K)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/27/10 recommending that plaintiff's requests for enforcement of the settlement agreement 120 , 121 and 123 be denied. MOTIONS 120 , 121 and 123 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/3/09 ORDERING the Findings and Recommendations 109 are ADOPTED IN FULL; the motion for summary judgment 99 by dfts Sisto and Barnes is GRANTED; the motion for summary judgment 67 by dfts Townsend and Dangler is DENIED. (K, Carlos)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/9/2009 ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re 107 Findings and Recommendations; Pltf's request for access to the law library and to his legal materials,construed as a request for injunctive relief, is denied. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadway v. Felkner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?