Jackson v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv02023
Filed: September 11, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 228 STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/7/12.Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED.(Matson, R)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/04/11 ordering Warden Tim Virga is substituted for former Warden James Walker as a defendant in his official capacity. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief, construed as a motion for protective order 221 is granted to the extent set forth above and defendant Virga must inform the court, within 14 days, as to the whereabouts of plaintiff's legal property related to the instant case, and as to the time when plai ntiff will be permitted access to said property in order to prepare for trial, assuring the court that plaintiff's legal property is intact and will remain so. Plaintiff's request for law library access to obtain copies of trial exhibits [2 20] is granted to the extent that defendant Virga must ascertain that plaintiff is permitted such access, or is otherwise able to obtain copies, prior to the date when an exchange of trial exhibits is required, i.e. prior to 28 days in advance of trial. (Plummer, M)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/2/11 ORDERING that on 2/17/11, plaintiff filed his fifth request for the appointment of counsel. Plaintiff's previous requests were filed on 10/26/07, 2/14/08, 4/11/08 and 1/15/10. All requests were denied. In light of those orders, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's 2/17/11 request 215 is denied. (Becknal, R)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/14/11 ORDERING that plaintiff is relieved of the obligation to photocopy his trial exhibits; Instead, plaintiff is directed to bring his original exhibits to trial; should copying of any of the exhibits be required, the trial judge may order defendants to provide the copies; and plaintiffs 201 motion for access to the law library photocopying services, is denied as moot.(Dillon, M)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/13/11. The Warden of Salinas Valley State Prison, 31625 Highway 101, P. O. Box 1020, Soledad, California 93960-1020 is COMMANDED to produce John Wesley Williams, to testify before the United States District Court on 2/23/11, and from date to date until completion of the proceedings or as ordered by the Court. (cc: Warden of Salinas Valley State Prison)(Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/8/10 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Maurice Scott via video conferencing at 9:00 am on January 19, 2011 in Courtroom 5. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: IT Dept)(Dillon, M) (Dillon, M)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/13/10 ordering this case is set for a settlement conference on 10/27/10 at 9:00 a.m. at CSP-SAC, Prison Road, Represa, California 95671. Defendants' lead counsel and a person with full a nd unlimited authority, as defined by state law, to negotiate and enter into a binding settlement on defendants' behalf shall attend in person. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Litigation Office at CSP-SAC via facsimile at (916) 294-3072. (Plummer, M)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/19/2010 ORDERING that dfts' 182 motion for a continuance of the trial is GRANTED, and the Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 7/19/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Sh ubb; pltf's belated, and inappropriate, 171 objections to the 5/27/10 Amended Pretrial Order are DISREGARDED; pltf's 172 , 173 , 174 , 175 , 176 , 177 , 178 , 179 , 180 , 181 motions for writs of hc ad testificandum for trial witnesses are VACATED. (Yin, K)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/11/10 ORDERING that 166 Motion for relief under Rule 60 (b), from a portion of the 143 summary judgment order, filed on 8/19/09. (Dillon, M)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/26/2010 ORDERING pltf's 164 motion for a request for a continuance of the trial is GRANTED; the current trial date of 3/2/2010 is hereby VACATED; and this case is RE-SET for trial before Judge William B. Shubb in Courtroom 5 (WBS) on 7/27/2010 at 09:00 AM; the 163 Writ of HC Ad Testificandum for pltf's appearance at trial is VACATED, a new writ will issue at the appropriate time; the clerk to serve a copy of this order upon t he Warden of CSP-Sac; pltf is GRANTED a further extension of time, until 5/21/2010, to file his objections to the Pretrial Order, and his modified witness list; the parties objections to the Pretrial Order will be addressed at the time pltf files his objections, or the time for doing so has expired; and pltf's 161 motion for the appointment of counsel is DENIED.(Yin, K)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 [VACATED PURSUANT TO 165 ORDER] ORDER AND WRIT ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 01/21/10 ordering issuance of a writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum; Custodian to produce Christopher Jackson at 03/02/10 at 9:00 a.m. in cour troom 5 before Judge William B. Shubb; Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court desk, CA State Prison. (cc: USM Priority). (Plummer, M) Modified on 1/26/2010 (Yin, K).
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/25/09 in response to 147 Motion for Reconsideration; the court's 143 Order is AFFIRMED. (Owen, K)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS 138 , in full, signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/19/2009. Defendants' 105 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and DENIED in part as follows: A) granted as to defendants Malfi, Leiber, Rodriguez, Ruller, Arndt, Baughman, Bernardino, Kelly, B. Smith, and Acting Warden Walker, in his individual capacity; B) denied as to defendants Haythorne, Hague, and Walker, in his official capacity only. (Marciel, M)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/9/2009 GRANTING 132 Request for extension of time; opposition to 105 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT due by 4/14/09; deft's reply to opposition due within 7 days thereafter; no further extensions will be approved. (Gaydosh, J)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/22/09 GRANTING 103 Ex Parte Application. All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before 1/30/09.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?