L.H. et al v. Schwarzenegger et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv02042
Filed: September 13, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/15/14: The Office of the Special Master is hereby TERMINATED. The Clerk of the Court shall return all funds remaining in the special account, plus interest, to defendants. (Kaminski, H)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/19/13 CONFIRMING undisputed fees and costs. (Manzer, C)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 711 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/9/2013 ORDERING the Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunctive Relief 438 , is hereby TERMINATED; the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 701 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/29/13 GRANTING 695 Motion to Terminate Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunctive Relief. The 438 Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunctive Relief shall apply in full force until the last scheduled hearing (including hearings requested as a result of the activation of optional waivers) has taken place. During this time, the parties shall continue to track and monitor defendants' compliance with the Injunction. Defendants shall notify pla intiffs' counsel, the Special Master, and the Court once the last scheduled hearing has been completed. Ten (10) days after defendants file such notification, defendants shall be relieved of any duty to comply with the requirements emanating fro m the Injunction, until the last parolee serving a revocation term has been released from custody, except for the following provisions: tracking parolee discharge dates to ensure that parolees are not over-detained; notifying plaintiffs' counsel , the Special Master, and the Court once the last parolee serving a revocation term has been released from custody; upon defendants' notification that the final class member has been released, the parties and the Special Counsel shall, within 20 days, file their motions, if any, for attorneys' fees, and fees for the Special Master Court; upon resolution of the fee motions, the court will terminate this case. (Meuleman, A)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 694 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/17/13 Setting forth process for terminating Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunctive Relief. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 685 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 09/07/12 ORDERING that the Special Master's 682 Eighth Report is ADOPTED in full; defendants have demonstrated substantial compliance with the requirements detailed herein; these requirements will therefore no longer be a primary focus of plaintiffs' or the Special Master's monitoring unless and until it comes to the parties' or the Special Master's attention that there has been a significant decline in compliance. (Benson, A.)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 681 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/3/12. The Clerk is directed to pay to: Collaboration Specialists 39 Allyn Avenue San Anselmo, CA 94960 the amount of $23,005.14 in accordance with the attached statement; and A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 673 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/6/12 ORDERING that in order to insure that the record is complete, the Court will order the report, defendants' objections, and the Plaintiffs' reply filed, without further action.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/4/2011 APPROVING the appointment of Deputy Special Master Chris Toombs. (Michel, G)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 656 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/3/11 for payment of attorneys' fees for 2010 and the first and second quarters of 2011, pursuant to the court's 9/14/11 order. (Refer to 654 for Exhibit A). (Meuleman, A)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER granting 617 Motion to Compel signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/13/11. (Kaminski, H)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/11/2011 ORDERING that the hearing re 617 Motion to Compel 2010 Rates currently set for 7/18/2011 is VACATED. The court will delay decision on the pending motion until a decision is issued on the matter in Armstrong. When a decision on the matter is issued in Armstrong, Pltfs SHALL re-notice the motion to compel fees for hearing in this court. If no decision is issued before 8/31/2011, Pltfs SHALL re-notice the motion to compel fees for hearing in this court. (Zignago, K.)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/11/2011 ORDERING that Pltfs' fees and costs of $253,579.24, plus interest, are due and collectable as of 45 days from the date of entry of this Order. (Zignago, K.)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/16/11: The Clerk is directed to pay to Collaboration Specialists in accordance with the attached statement. (Attachments: # 1 Statement)(Kaminski, H)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 02/09/11 ORDERING that defendants have demonstrated substantial compliance with certain requirements and therefore they will no longer be a primary focus of Plaintiffs' or the Special Master's monitoring unless and until it comes to the parties or the Special Masters attention that there has been a significant decline in compliance.(Williams, D)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/10/11: The Clerk is directed to pay to Collaboration Specialists the amount of $21,200.33 in accordance with the attached statement. A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (Attachments: # 1 Statement) (Kaminski, H)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/2/2010 ORDERING the Clerk to pay Collaboration Specialists the amount of $54,544.11 in accordance with the attached statement; and serve a copy of this order on the financial department of this court. (cc Financial) (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Fees and Disbursements)(Matson, R)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER CONFIRMING UNDISPUTED FEES AND COSTS FOR THE THIRD QUARTER OF 2010 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/01/10 ORDERING that plf's fees and costs of $345,203.64, plus interest, are due and collectable as of forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this Order. Interest on these fees and costs will run from 11/08/10 accruing at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1961. (Benson, A.)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/15/10 ORDERING the Fifth Report of the Special Master shall be filed with the Court on or before 1/10/11. (Carlos, K)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER CONFIRMING UNDISPUTED FEES AND COSTS FOR THE SECOND QUARTER OF 2010 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/12/10 ORDERING that plf's fees and costs of $373,026.13, plus interest, are due and collectable as of forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this Order. Interest on these fees and costs will run from 09/12/10 accruing at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1961. (Benson, A.)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/1/10, ORDERING that the special master's request to employ a paralegal is GRANTED. Wendell Ricketts is to serve in this capacity effective immediately; and will be compensated at the rate of $35 per hr.(Kastilahn, A)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 592 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/29/2010 ORDERING 591 that the deadline for any motion regarding Plaintiffs' Counsel's 2010 rates shall be 1/12/2011. (Reader, L)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/28/10 ORDERING that pltfs' fees and costs of $251,097.92, plus interest, are due and collectable as of 45 days from the date of the entry of this order. Interest on these fees and costs will run from 6/4/10 accruing at the rate provided by 28 USC § 1961. (Owen, K)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 07/08/10 ORDERING that dfts are to deposit with the clerk, w/i 30 days, funds sufficient to bring the account balance back to $250,000. (Benson, A.)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 06/08/10 ORDERING that the Court's 06/07/10 577 Order is WITHDRAWN. The parties MAY file objections to the fourth report and the recommendations therein no later than 20 days from the date of this order. If objections are filed, the opposing party MAY file a response no later than 20 days thereafter. (Benson, A.)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/4/10: The parties MAY file objections to Fourth Report and recommendations no later than twenty-one (21) days from the dateof this order. If objections are filed, the opposing party MAY file a response no later than seven (7) days thereafter. (Kaminski, H)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/3/10 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay Special Master Chase Riveland in the amount of $21,513.33. (cc: Financial) (Owen, K)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 05/25/10 ORDERING that effective, 06/01/10, Virginia Morrison shall assume the duties and responsibilities of the special master in this action as indicated in this court's 394 05/21/08 order and shall be compensated at the rates set forth in this order; and effective 06/01/10, Patricia Gray shall serve as deputy special master in this action and shall be compensated at the rates set forth in this order. (Benson, A.)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/3/2010 ORDERING 394 The Clerk is directed to pay to Chase Riveland, L.H., Special Master, the amount of $47,131.15 in accordance with the attached statement; and a copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (Reader, L)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 04/19/10 ORDERING that plaintiffs' fees and costs of $238,200.85, plus interest are due and collectable within 45 days. (Williams, D)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/5/10 DIRECTING payment to Special Master Chase Riveland. (CC: Financial) (Owen, K)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 568 STIPULATION and ORDER REGARDING MODIFICATIONS TO DIVISION OF JUVENILE JUSTICE PAROLE REVOCATION EXTENSION MATRIX signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 02/12/10. (Benson, A.)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/5/10 directing payment of special master fees in the amount of $8,587.15. (cc: financial) (Owen, K)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/20/10 ORDERING dfts to deposit with the clerk of the court, within 30 days of the date of this order, funds sufficient to bring the Special Master account balance back to $250,000. (Carlos, K)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/5/2010 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay Chase Riveland, L.H. Special Master, the amount of $22,977.50. A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (cc: CFS) (Engbretson, K.)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/30/09 ORDERING that the court disregards this letter 560 . (cc Dean J. Ugboaha)(Duong, D) Modified on 12/30/2009 (Duong, D).
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/1/09 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay to Chase Riveland the amount of $15,062.41 in accordance with the attached statement. A copy of this order shall be served on the Financial Department of this court. (cc: CFS) (Duong, D)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 558 THIRD REPORT OF THE SPECIAL MASTER ON THE STATUS OF CONDITIONS OF THE STIPULATED ORDER signed by Chase Riveland, Special Master, on 11/25/09. (Engbretson, K.)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/2/09: The Clerk is directed to pay to Chase Riveland L.H. Special Master the amount of $26,502.22. A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court.(Kaminski, H)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER CONFIRMING UNDISPUTED FEES AND COSTS signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/2/2009, for the Second Quarterly Statement of 2009 ORDERING 555 that plaintiffs' fees and costs of $444,940.29, plus interest, are due and collectable as of 45 days from the date of entry of this Order. Interest on these fees and costs will run from 8/24/2009 accruing at the rate provided by 28:1961. (Reader, L)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/2/2009 ORDERING 394 The Clerk is directed to pay to Chase Riveland, L.H., Special Master, the amount of $4,415.12 in accordance with the attached statement; and a copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (Reader, L)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/10/09 GRANTING 552 joint stipulation regarding modifications to division of juvenile justice parole revocation policies and procedures. (Engbretson, K.)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 09/04/09 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay Chase Riveland, Special Master the amount of $9,257.37. A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (cc: Sac Finance)(Streeter, J)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 08/03/09 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay Chase Riveland, Special Master the amount of $4,715.90. A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (cc: CFS)(Streeter, J)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER Confirming Undisputed Fees and Costs for The First Quarterly Statement of 2009 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 07/29/09. Pltfs' fees and costs of $585,791.39, plus interest, are DUE and collectable as of 45 days from the date of entry of this Order. Interest on these fees and costs will run from 06/01/09 accruing at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1961(Streeter, J)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 547 STIPULATION and ORDER 546 requiring defendants to take immediate steps to identify and track juvenile parolees w/disabilities and effect communications needs signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/7/2009. (Marciel, M)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 07/02/09 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay Chase Riveland, Special Master the amount of $10,700.79. A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court. (cc: CFS). (Streeter, J)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/2/09: The Clerk is directed to pay to Special Master the amount of $10,886.59. A copy of this order shall be served on the financial department of this court.(Kaminski, H)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/19/2009. Plaintiffs' 499 Motion to Monitor defendants' compliance with Permanent Injunction Hearing is CONTINUED to 4/20/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK). Defendants' Opposit ion or Statement of Non-Opposition shall be filed no later than 3/25/2009; plaintiffs' Reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 4/6/2009. Plaintiffs' 519 Proposed Order for interim monitoring of various juvenile parole proceedings one day per week is DENIED without prejudice. (Marciel, M)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/12/2009 ORDERING 444 Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to submit supplemental briefing on this question not later than 10 days from the date of the hearing. Defendants are ORDERED to submit a response, if any, not later than 5 days thereafter. The supplemental briefs shall not exceed 10 pages in length. (Reader, L)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 513 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Parole Defense Counsel Access to Witness Contact Information and Certain Mental Health Information signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/11/09 re 509 . (Duong, D)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/4/2009 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay Chase Riveland the amount of $18,280.52; and a copy of this order shall be served on the financial department. (cc Financial)(Matson, R)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/5/09 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to pay to Chase Riveland, L.H. Special Master, the amount of $24,385.64 in accordance with the attached statement. A copy of this order shall be served on the Financial Department of this court. (cc: CFS).(Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.H. et al v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?