Abubakar et al v. County of Solano
Plaintiff: Alice Manzone, Franklin H. Bailey, Jr., Sarah Hutchinson, James R. Seder, Juan A. Rivera, Frank D. Fong, Joshua Esquibel, James - Wilson, Kevin M. Adkins, Ronda Gomes, Brandi Aguilar, Ramiro Fernandez, Randy Pratt, Louise Bradley, Jimmie L. Hardy, Miguel Manzo, Anthony Cueva, Bryan Glenn, Michael R. Joseph, Juan Acosta, Jr., William H. Broadnax, Joseph P. Driscoll, Rex A. Moffett, Kathy L. Broussard, Steven Tomasik, Ken Stewart, Jared Clark, James B. Smith, Gregory Prestridge, Gwendolyn Jones, Rodney J. Herndon, Carol McFadden, Robert Lewis Simmons, David A. Walter, Diana Mallory, Otis E. Weary, Teresa Bruno, Jason A. Trojanowski, Lloyd A. Willmschen, Ginger Gibson, Steve T. Bone, Lauren E. Beckhusen, John F. Shepherd, James Brown, Jr., Jeffrey A. Smith, Justin B. Boykin, Robert Hurley, Jess L. Grapentine, Reyes Carbajal, Shawn T. Gilligan, Joshua W. Prior, Vincent M. Dionisio, Minerva Abubakar, Fred Lusk, David Harris, II, Ignacio E. Villasenor, Ray Chase, Steve L. Bottoms, Bert L. Curtis, Rex Moffett, Donna M. Bailey, Cynthia Chaides, Winston Russell, Cathleen Bidou, Matthew bidou, Daniel P. Chapman, Thomas G. Schlemmer, Jr., Lori Holabird, Charles Olmstead, Jeffrey L. Poblete, Kevin L. Kirkland, Thomas R. Porter, Sr., James C. Castro, Jr., James Montoya, Tina M. Arnold, Tina Arcand, Robert L. Olmstead, Theresa A. Smith, Scott A Wilson, Danny R. Hall, II, Thomas R. Collins, Mark A. Vargas, Robert B. Putnam, Felicia Gray, Steve Smyth, Mark San Augustin, Elise Broadwater, Carlos Pereda, Kate Hardy, Jim Toynbee, Anthony Ramirez, Ronald Featherson, Angelo L. Fleming, Daniel T. Castillo, Willie E. Gray, Kenneth W. Kerr, Carlos Hernandez, Gilbert P. Manzano, George V. Canton, Judy Turner, Laurence Stahl, Richard L. Brown, Onita M. Carrasco, Brad Kamman, Michael Finnegan, Elbert Townsell, Paula Toynbee, Pege Metzger, Scott Rosenkild, Francisco C. Carrion, Steven Clemente, Chad Cleveland, Derek Julio, Richard M. Jarovski, Ralph R. Castillo, Gary Aylworth, Brian M. Miller, Doris J. Lawson, Jesus Rodriguez, David Holsten, Richard James Flores, Brandon Carrasco, Mary Shortencarrier, Aaron Rollin Neisingh, Reginald Kennedy, Eric Iverson, Stacee Kamman, Joseph E. Hilyer, Jr., Kelly Scarborough, Sylvia A. Mitchell, Frank Howell, Aaron Janes, Jennifer Chastain, Allison Hagen, Deron K. Cordero, Brian James, Robert L. Dessel, Rebecca Beck, Maria G. Grapentine, Joslyn Clemons-Hatcher, Mark J. Lagrisola, Bouakiong Chug Senesackda, Ronald G. Lahmon, Jason L. Garrison, Jerome J. Metzger, III, Anita Wailes, Manuel M. Garcia, Brenda Echols, Deron Cordero, Ann Finnegan, Teresa Emmons, James W. Watson, Thomas Lombardo, Richard T. Duncan, Luz Solis, Barnes Orlandos, Sonia Bennett, Joel V. Barrilleaux, Kelly Anderson, Steven Rodd, Jr., Ronald L. Plunkett, Richard J. Petretti, James Laughlin, Steven Vincent Snyder, David V. Amiccuci, Amanda Martinez, Mark Thompson, Georgina Salinas Manzano, Deborah Randle, Renee E Campbell, R. Cacipes, James Wilson, Keith Parrish, Myrajean Riojas, Charles F. Hayes, Danette I. Mercado, Gary T. Thornton, Daniel Lewis, Keith Bloomfield, Nathan Wold, Jake Johnson III, Eugene Jiongo, Ruben Garcia, Jr., Robin J. De Vaul, Anna Sepulveda, Patricia Jiongo and Aaron Neisingh
Defendant: County of Solano
Case Number: 2:2006cv02268
Filed: October 13, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Lawrence K Karlton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/21/09 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED as follows: The Settlement Agreement, which is incorporated herein by reference, is approved as fair, reasonable and just in all respects as to the Plaintiffs, and the Parties shall perform the Settlement Agreement in accordance with its terms; The Court reserves jurisdiction over this Action for the purposes of enforcing the Settlement Agreement; The Court has made no findings or determination regarding the law, and this Stipulation and Order and any exhibits and any of the other documents or written materials prepared in conjunction with this Stipulation and Order shall not constitute evidence of, or any admission of, any violation of the law; and This Action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)
April 27, 2009 Filing 154 Settlement Agreement and Release Part 2 by Minerva Abubakar. (King, David) Modified on 4/28/2009 (Duong, D).
April 27, 2009 Filing 153 Settlement Agreement and Release Part 1 by Minerva Abubakar. (King, David) Modified on 4/28/2009 (Duong, D).
April 27, 2009 Filing 152 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Final Approval of Settlement/Dismissal by Minerva Abubakar. (King, David)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/27/09 ORDERING that since pltfs have filed a Notice of Settlement, dispositional documents disposing of the case are to be filed no later than 60 days from the effective date of this order. All hearing dates heretofore set in this matter are hereby VACATED.(Carlos, K) Modified on 3/27/2009 (Carlos, K).
March 24, 2009 Filing 150 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Minerva Abubakar. Filing deadline: 4/16/2009. (Mastagni, David)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/11/09: Plaintiff Theresa A. Smith, dismisses this action against Defendant, COUNTY OF SOLANO, without prejudice. Defendant agrees to waive any right to costs and attorney's fees as a result of this dismissal. (Kaminski, H)
March 6, 2009 Filing 148 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Pltf Theresa Smith by Theresa A. Smith. (King, David)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 03/02/09 ORDERING that plf Charles Olmstead DISMISSES his action against dft County of Solano w/o prejudice. Defendant agrees to waive any right to costs and attorneys fees as a result of this dismissal. The parties do not intend this dismissal to act as a retraxit with respect to any other plaintiff. (Benson, A.)
February 27, 2009 Filing 146 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Plaintiff Charles Olmstead by Charles Olmstead. (King, David)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/17/09 re #144 ORDERING that the current dates set forth in the Court's #118 scheduling order issued August 4, 2008 are hereby VACATED. The Scheduling order is amended as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses ddl 7/7/2009; Discovery ddl 9/4/2009; Dispositive Motion Hearing ddl 10/6/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Jury Trial set for 4/27/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton.. (Duong, D)
February 13, 2009 Filing 144 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying Scheduling Order by Minerva Abubakar. (King, David)
February 11, 2009 Filing 143 TRANSCRIPT of Plaintiff's Motion re: Discovery Disagreement and for Sanctions Proceedings held on 10/8/08, before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 3/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2009 filed by ECRO Jonathan Anderson, Phone number 916-930-4072 E-mail janderson@caed.uscourts.gov. (Anderson, J)
February 10, 2009 Filing 142 WITHDRAWAL of #141 AMENDED MOTION for DISCOVERY amending #139 MOTION for DISCOVERY Re: Def's further responses to SROGS(2) and RFPD(3) MOTION for DISCOVERY Re: Def's further responses to SROGS(2) and RFPD(3)AMENDED MOTION for DISCOVERY amending #139 MOTION for DISCOVERY Re: Def's further responses to SROGS(2) and RFPD(3) MOTION for DISCOVERY Re: Def's further responses to SROGS(2) and RFPD(3) by Minerva Abubakar. Pltfs' Withdrawal of Motion on 2/18/09 (King, David)
January 30, 2009 Filing 141 AMENDED MOTION for DISCOVERY amending #139 MOTION for DISCOVERY Re: Def's further responses to SROGS(2) and RFPD(3) MOTION for DISCOVERY Re: Def's further responses to SROGS(2) and RFPD(3) by Minerva Abubakar. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (King, David)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 BRIEFING ORDER re #139 MOTION for DISCOVERY Re: Def's further responses to SROGS(2) and RFPD(3) MOTION for DISCOVERY Re: Def's further responses to SROGS(2) and RFPD(3) filed by Minerva Abubakar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/20/09. (Hinkle, T)
December 26, 2008 Filing 139 MOTION for DISCOVERY re Def's further responses to SROGS(2) and RFPD(3) by Minerva Abubakar. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (King, David) Modified on 12/29/2008 (Manzer, C).
November 17, 2008 Filing 138 RESPONSE to #137 Court Order of October 10, 2008; Second Amended Response to Plaintiffs' RPD, Set Two by County of Solano. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 11/20/2008 (Manzer, C).
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/10/08 ORDERING that dft, on or before 11/17/08 is to complete its search and produce all docs responsive to pltfs' Request for Production (Set Two), as refined by pltfs' "six categories" of responsive documents; provide a privilege log describing any responsive docs w/held pursuant to the attorney-client privilege or work product doctrine; and certify in writing that all responsive docs have been produced; and to file a Second Amended Response to the subject production request. It is further ORDERED that pltfs' #102 Motion to Compel Production of Docs pursuant to their Request for Production is GRANTED; and pltfs' request for sanctions is DENIED. (Yin, K)
October 8, 2008 Filing 136 MINUTES (Text Only) for MOTION HEARING held on 10/8/2008 before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan re: Pltf's Motion for Discovery Disagreement (Set 2) and for Sanctions #102 , #103 . All parties present. Arguments heard. Court order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel David King and James Carr present. Defendants Counsel John Whitefleet present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Jonathan Anderson, ECRO. (Cannarozzi, N)
October 8, 2008 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT of Plaintiff's motion re: discovery disagreement and for sanctions Proceedings held on 9/17/08, before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 10/29/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/10/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2009 filed by ECRO Jonathan Anderson, Phone number 916-930-4072 E-mail. janderson@caed.uscourts.gov (Anderson, J)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/3/08: Plaintiff, MICHAEL JOSEPH, dismisses his action against Defendant, COUNTY OF SOLANO without prejudice. Defendant agrees to waive any right to costs and attorney's fees as a result of this dismissal. Plaintiff Michael R. Joseph terminated. (Kaminski, H)
October 2, 2008 Filing 133 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of John R. Whitefleet in Support of Joint Statement #131 Re Discovery Dispute Over Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents Set Two. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 10/3/2008 (Becknal, R).
October 1, 2008 Filing 132 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of James B. Carr in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents Set Two #103 MOTION for DISCOVERY. (Carr, James) Modified on 10/3/2008 (Becknal, R).
October 1, 2008 Filing 131 JOINT STATEMENT re Discovery Dispute re Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Set Two. (Carr, James) Modified on 10/3/2008 (Becknal, R).
September 26, 2008 Filing 130 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael Joseph Without Prejudice (Mastagni, David) Modified on 9/29/2008 (Becknal, R).
September 17, 2008 Filing 129 MINUTES (Text Only) for MOTION HEARING held on 9/17/2008 before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan re: Pltf's Motion re: Discovery Disagreement and for Sanctions (Set 2) #103 . All parties present. Arguments heard. After consideration, the Court ordered the parties to meet and confer this afternoon re: the pending motion. The Court ordered the matter continued to 10/8/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. The parties were instructed to file a new joint statement. (due no later than 1 week prior to the hearing) Plaintiffs Counsel David Mastagni, David King and James Carr present. Defendants Counsel John Whitefleet present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Tiffany Brown, ECRO. (Cannarozzi, N)
September 17, 2008 Filing 128 DECLARATION of David E. Mastagni in SUPPORT oF #103 MOTION for DISCOVERY. (Mastagni, David) Modified on 9/18/2008 (Reader, L).
September 10, 2008 Filing 127 DECLARATION of John R. Whitefleet in SUPPORT of Joint Statement Re: Discovery #124 . (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 9/11/2008 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 10, 2008 Filing 126 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Docket Entry Number 125 by County of Solano re #125 Declaration. (Whitefleet, John)
September 10, 2008 Filing 125 OBJECTIONS to Pretrial (Status) Scheduling Order. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 9/11/2008 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 10, 2008 Filing 124 JOINT STATEMENT Regarding #103 MOTION for DISCOVERY. (Carr, James) Modified on 9/11/2008 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 10, 2008 Filing 123 DECLARATION of JAMES B. CARR in SUPPORT OF #103 MOTION for DISCOVERY. Attorney Carr, James B. added. (Carr, James)
August 21, 2008 Filing 122 AMENDED Consent to Be Included as an Individual Plaintiff by Jake Johnson III. Attorney Mastagni, David E. added. (Mastagni, David) Modified on 8/22/2008 (Kaminski, H).
August 14, 2008 Filing 121 Plaintiffs' CHANGE OF DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney David Der King and David Der King for Plaintiffs. Attorney Willy Masaichi Yamada; Straun Wolfe Boston and James Richard Traber terminated (King, David) Modified on 9/11/2008 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 6, 2008 Filing 120 MINUTE ORDER by CRD: Due to the unavailability of the Court, Pltf's Motion re: Discovery Disagreement and for Sanctions (Set 2) #103 previously set for hearing on 08/27/08 is CONTINUED to 9/17/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Text only entry) (Cannarozzi, N)
August 6, 2008 Filing 119 Plaintiffs' AMENDED MOTION Amending #103 MOTION for DISCOVERY. (Carr, James) Modified on 9/11/2008 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 08/04/08 modifying #47 Scheduling Order; the current dates are hereby VACATED and the new dates are as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/9/2009. Expert Witness Rebuttals due by 03/23/2009. Discovery Motion Cut-Off 04/08/2009. Discovery due by 5/8/2009. Dispositive Motion due by 6/8/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Jury Trial set for 12/15/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Manzer, C)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 08/04/08 ORDERING that Patricia Jiongo, Successor in Interest of Eugene Jiongo, is substituted for Eugene Jiongo as individual plaintiff in this action.(Manzer, C)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 08/04/08 ORDERING that Steven Sorvetti and Jake Johnson are permitted to join this action as plaintiffs upon filing a consent to be included as a plaintiff. (Manzer, C)
July 31, 2008 Filing 115 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re Joinder of Additional Plaintiffs by plt. (Mastagni, David) Modified on 8/4/2008 (Anderson, J).
July 31, 2008 Filing 114 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re Substituting Plaintiff Decedent With Plaintiff Successor in Interest by plt. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Death Certificate, #2 Ex. B - Declaration of Patricia Jiongo)(Mastagni, David) Modified on 8/4/2008 (Anderson, J).
July 31, 2008 Filing 113 WITHDRAWAL of #102 MOTION for DISCOVERY by plt. (Mastagni, David) Modified on 8/4/2008 (Anderson, J).
July 30, 2008 Filing 112 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order (Mastagni, David) Modified on 9/11/2008 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/25/2008 ORDERING #109 that Plaintiff Randy Pratt, is DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendant agrees to waive any right to costs and attorney's fees as a result of this dismissal. (Reader, L)
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/24/08 re #106 ORDERING that plt Richard Petretti DISMISSES his action against dft County of Solano without prejudice. (Duong, D) Modified on 7/24/2008 (Duong, D).
July 23, 2008 Filing 109 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Plaintiff Randy Pratt Without Prejudice by plts. (Mastagni, David) Modified on 7/23/2008 (Duong, D).
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/21/08 ORDERING that plaintiff PAULA TOYNBEE, dismisses her action against Defendant, COUNTY OF SOLANO, without prejudice. Defendant agrees to waive any right to costs and attorneys fees. The parties do not intend this dismissal to act as a retraxit with respect to any other plaintiff. (Becknal, R)
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/21/08 ORDERING that Plaintiff, RICHARD PETRETTI, dismisses his action against Defendant, COUNTY OF SOLANO, without prejudice. Defendant agrees to waive any right to costs and attorneys fees. The parties do not intend this dismissal to act as a retraxit with respect to any other plaintiff. (Becknal, R)
July 17, 2008 Filing 106 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Richard Petretti Without Prejudice and Proposed Order by plts.
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 BRIEFING ORDER re plaintiffs' #102 MOTION for DISCOVERY and #103 MOTION for DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/14/08. (Hinkle, T)
July 11, 2008 Filing 104 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss plt Paula Toynbee by plts. (Mastagni, David) Modified on 7/14/2008 (Duong, D).
July 10, 2008 Filing 103 Plaintiffs' MOTION for DISCOVERY Motion for Hearing Regarding Discovery Disagreement and Request for Sanctions re: Request for Production of Documents, Set Two Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Carr, James) Modified on 7/11/2008 (Mena-Sanchez, L). Modified on 7/16/2008 (Davis, D).
July 8, 2008 Filing 102 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Hearing regarding Discovery Disagreement; Request for Sanctions Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Mastagni, David) Modified on 7/9/2008 (Kaminski, H). Modified on 7/11/2008 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/09/08 ORDERING that persuant to the parties stipulation, the individuals listed in Exhibit A shall have an extension of time to serve responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set No. One, and Special Interrogatories Set No. One up to, and including 07/01/08.(Benson, A)
June 4, 2008 Filing 100 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by James B. Carr. (Carr, James)
June 2, 2008 Filing 99 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extending time, to and including 7/1/08, to answer discovery by Minerva Abubakar. (Traber, James) Modified on 6/3/2008 (Duong, D).
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/25/08: Plaintiff, Daniel Lewis, dismisses his action against Defendant, County of Solano, without prejudice. Defendant agrees to waive any right to costs and attorney's fees as a result of this dismissal. The parties do not intend this dismissal to act as a retraxit with respect to any other plaintiff. Daniel Lewis terminated. (Kaminski, H)
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/25/08: Plaintiff, Tina Arcand, dismisses her action against Defendant, County of Solanowithout prejudice. Defendant agrees to waive any right to costs and attorney's fees as a result of this dismissal. The parties do not intend this dismissal to act as a retraxit with respect to any other plaintiff. Tina Arcand terminated. (Kaminski, H)
April 24, 2008 Filing 96 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by Minerva Abubakar. (Traber, James)
April 24, 2008 Filing 95 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by Minerva Abubakar. (Traber, James)
March 3, 2008 PARTY UPDATE: Juan Acosta, Jr, and Brandi Aguilar, and Tina M. Arnold, and Elise Broadwater, and R. Cacipes, and Deron K. Cordero, and Robert L. Dessel, and Vincent M. Dionisio, and Joshua Esquibel, and Danny R. Hall, II, and Fred Lusk, and Amanda Martinez, and Pege Metzger, and Rex A. Moffett, and Aaron Neisingh, and Joshua W. Prior, and Bouakiong Chug Senesackda, and John F. Shepherd, and Robert Lewis Simmons, and Ken Stewart, and Steven Rodd, Jr, and James Wilson added. (Waggoner, D)
March 3, 2008 Filing 94 CONSENT to be Included as an Individual Plaintiff. (Traber, James) Modified on 3/4/2008 (Duong, D).
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/26/08 GRANTING #82 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Consent to Be Included as a Plaintiff Forms. (Anderson, J)
February 25, 2008 Filing 92 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: MOTION HEARING held on 2/25/2008 re #82 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Consent to Be Included as a Plaintiff Forms. After oral argument, the motion stands SUBMITTED. Court order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel James Traber present. Defendants Counsel John Whitefleet present. Court Reporter: Kelly O'Halloran. (Rivas, A)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 02/22/08 ORDERING that #80 plfs' Motion for Discovery is DENIED; Dft is directed to redraft its requests for production and interrogatories and serve plfs w/i 10 days; plfs have 90 days thereafter to respond to the discovery. This order is w/o prejudice to plfs moving for additional time to respond. (Benson, A)
February 20, 2008 Filing 90 MINUTES (Text Only) for MOTION HEARING held on 2/20/2008 re Pltf's Motion for Discovery #80 before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan: All parties present. Brief arguments heard. Summary order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel James Carr and Will Yamada present. Defendants Counsel John Whitefleet present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO, CD 1 of 1. (Cannarozzi, N)
February 15, 2008 Filing 89 REPLY to defendant's Opposition to Motion for Leave to file additional consent to be included as plaintiff forms. Attorney Traber, James Richard added. (Traber, James) Modified on 2/20/2008 (Marciel, M).
February 14, 2008 Filing 88 DECLARATION of James B. Carr re #80 AMENDED MOTION for DISCOVERY amending #74 Amended #72 Motion for Hearing re Discovery Disagreement. Concerning Exhibits A and B to the Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Disagreement (Carr, James)
February 13, 2008 Filing 87 DECLARATION of John R. Whitefleet in Concerning #86 Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Disagreement (Protective Order). (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 2/14/2008 (Duong, D).
February 13, 2008 Filing 86 JOINT STATEMENT Regarding Discovery Disagreement re #74 by the parties . Attorney Carr, James B. added. (Carr, James) Modified on 2/14/2008 (Duong, D).
February 8, 2008 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM/RESPONSE in OPPOSITION by dft County of Solano to #82 plts' Motion for Leave to File Adtl Consent to be Included as a Plaintiff Forms. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 2/11/2008 (Duong, D).
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/4/08 DENYING #64 MOTION Recuse and Disqualify Counsel for Defendants. (Anderson, J)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 01/31/08 ORDERING that #61 plfs' Motion to Compel immediate production of documents and request for sanctions are DENIED. (Benson, A)
January 28, 2008 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Consent to Be Included as a Plaintiff Forms by plts . Attorney Mastagni, David E. added. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Mastagni, David) Modified on 1/29/2008 (Duong, D).
January 28, 2008 Filing 81 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: MOTION HEARING held on 1/28/2008 re #64 MOTION Recuse and Disqualify Counsel for Defendants From Further Participation In This Matter filed by Minerva Abubakar. After oral argument, the motions stands SUBMITTED. Court order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel James Carr present. Defendants Counsel John Whitefleet, Terence Cassidy present. Court Reporter: C. Bodene. (Rivas, A)
January 22, 2008 Filing 80 AMENDED MOTION for DISCOVERY re #74 #72 by Minerva Abubakar. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2008 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Carr, James) Modified on 1/23/2008 (Duong, D).
January 17, 2008 PARTY UPDATE: Added additional plaintiffs pursuant to consents filed.(Donati, J)
January 17, 2008 Filing 79 REPLY BRIEF in Support of #64 Motion to Recuse and Disqualify Counsel for Defendant from Further Participation in this Matter by Minerva Abubakar. (Carr, James) Modified on 1/18/2008 (Kaminski, H).
January 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) by CRD: The 02/13/08 hearing re: Pltf's Motion for Discovery #74 is ADVANCED to 2/12/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Ordered by Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 01/16/08. (Cannarozzi, N)
January 14, 2008 Filing 77 RESPONSE in OPPOSITION re #64 MOTION to Recuse and Disqualify Law Firm of Counsel - Porter Scott and Its Attorneys (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of John R. Whitefleet ISO Opposition to Motion to Disqualify, #(2) Declaration of Terence J. Cassidy ISO Opposition to Motion to Disqualify)(Whitefleet, John) Modified on 1/18/2008 (Kastilahn, A).
January 9, 2008 Filing 76 MINUTES (Text Only) for MOTION HEARING held on 1/9/2008 before Judge Edmund F. Brennan re: Pltf's Motion for Discovery #61 . All parties present. Arguments heard. Court order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel James Carr and Will Yamada present. Defendants Counsel John Whitefleet present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO, CD 1 of 1. (Cannarozzi, N)
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 BRIEFING ORDER re #74 AMENDED MOTION for DISCOVERY Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Hearing Regarding Discovery Disagreement filed by Minerva Abubakar. Signed by Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/8/08. (Hinkle, T)
January 8, 2008 Filing 74 AMENDED #72 MOTION for Hearing re Discovery Disagreement by Minerva Abubakar. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Carr, James) Modified on 1/9/2008 (Marciel, M).
January 8, 2008 Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER by CRD: The 02/06/08 hearing re: Pltf's Motion for Discovery #72 is VACATED. The Court is unavailable to hear the motion on the date selected. Pltf's counsel is advised to contact the Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Brennan to obtain available law and motion dates. (Text only entry) (Cannarozzi, N)
January 4, 2008 Filing 72 MOTION for DISCOVERY Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Hearing Regarding Discovery Disagreement by Minerva Abubakar.Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Carr, James)
January 2, 2008 Filing 71 DECLARATION of John R. Whitefleet. Concerning Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Disagreement (Whitefleet, John)
January 2, 2008 Filing 70 STATEMENT of Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Disagreement by Plaintiff Minerva Abubakar. (Carr, James)
December 21, 2007 Filing 69 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Minerva Abubakar re #64 Motion. (Carr, James) Modified on 12/26/2007 (Kaminski, H).
December 21, 2007 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Thomas Schlemmer in SUPPORT OF #65 Memorandum and #64 MOTION . (Carr, James) Modified on 12/26/2007 (Kaminski, H).
December 21, 2007 Filing 67 DECLARATION of David Holsten in SUPPORT OF #65 Memorandum and #64 MOTION . (Carr, James) Modified on 12/26/2007 (Kaminski, H).
December 21, 2007 Filing 66 DECLARATION of James B. Carr in SUPPORT OF #65 Memorandum and #64 MOTION. (Carr, James) Modified on 12/26/2007 (Kaminski, H).
December 21, 2007 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in SUPPORT of #64 MOTION Recuse and Disqualify Counsel for Defendants (Carr, James) Modified on 12/26/2007 (Kaminski, H).
December 21, 2007 Filing 64 MOTION to Recuse and Disqualify Counsel for Defendants From Further Participation In This Matter by Minerva Abubakar. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Carr, James) Modified on 12/26/2007 (Kaminski, H).
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 BRIEFING ORDER re #61 MOTION for HEARING REGARDING DISCOVERY Disagreement filed by Minerva Abubakar. Signed by Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/20/07. (Hinkle, T)
December 18, 2007 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Minerva Abubakar re #60 Designation of Counsel. (Carr, James)
December 18, 2007 Filing 61 MOTION for HEARING REGARDING DISCOVERY Disagreement by Minerva Abubakar. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Carr, James) Modified on 12/20/2007 (Reader, L).
December 18, 2007 Filing 60 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney James B. Carr and James B. Carr for Minerva Abubakar, attorney Straun Wolfe Boston terminated (Carr, James)
July 27, 2007 Filing 59 AMENDED Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff by Kathy L. Broussard. Attorney Yamada, Willy Masaichi added. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 7/27/2007 (Duong, D).
July 26, 2007 Filing 58 AMENDED Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff by Joslyn Clemons-Hatcher. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 7/27/2007 (Duong, D).
July 25, 2007 Filing 57 AMENDED Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff by Renee E Campbell, Manuel M. Garcia, Teresa Emmons, Randy Pratt. Attorney Yamada, Willy Masaichi added. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 7/26/2007 (Duong, D).
July 23, 2007 Filing 56 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Sarah Hutchinson.. Attorney Yamada, Willy Masaichi added. Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff (Yamada, Willy)
July 23, 2007 Filing 55 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Sonia Bennett, Justin B. Boykin.. Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff (Yamada, Willy)
July 18, 2007 Filing 54 AMENDED Consent to be included as an individual plaintiff by Theresa A. Smith. Attorney Yamada, Willy Masaichi added. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 7/19/2007 (Marciel, M).
July 16, 2007 Filing 53 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Lauren E. Beckhusen, Daniel P. Chapman, Jason L. Garrison, Bryan Glenn, Jeffrey L. Poblete, Robert B. Putnam.. Attorney Yamada, Willy Masaichi added. Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff (Yamada, Willy)
July 12, 2007 Filing 52 AMENDED Consent to be Included as an individual plaintiff by Otis E. Weary, Barnes Orlandos. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 7/13/2007 (Duong, D).
July 10, 2007 Filing 51 AMENDED Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff by Gwendolyn Jones, Danette I. Mercado, James Montoya. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 7/11/2007 (Duong, D).
July 6, 2007 Filing 50 AMENDED Consent to be included as an individual plaintiff by Michael R. Joseph. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 7/9/2007 (Marciel, M).
July 5, 2007 Filing 49 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Teresa Bruno.. Attorney Yamada, Willy Masaichi added. Consent to Be Included as an Individual Plaintiff (Yamada, Willy)
July 3, 2007 Filing 48 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Luz Solis.. Attorney Yamada, Willy Masaichi added. Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff (Yamada, Willy)
June 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STATUS PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/27/2007 ORDERING Discovery due by 11/8/2008. Dispositive Motion due by 12/8/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Jury Trial set for 6/9/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Reader, L)
June 27, 2007 Filing 46 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Gilbert P. Manzano, Georgina Salinas Manzano.. Attorney Yamada, Willy Masaichi added. Consent To Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff (Yamada, Willy)
June 26, 2007 Filing 44 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Reginald Kennedy, Richard J. Petretti.. Attorney Yamada, Willy Masaichi added. Consent to Be Included As Individual Plaintiffs (Yamada, Willy)
June 26, 2007 Filing 43 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Anthony Ramirez.. Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff (Yamada, Willy)
June 25, 2007 Filing 45 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/25/2007. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. 6 day Jury Trial set for 6/9/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Court Order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel James Carr, James Traber present. Defendants Counsel John Whitefleet present. (Rivas, A)
June 18, 2007 Filing 42 JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 6/19/2007 (Reader, L).
June 14, 2007 Filing 41 AMENDED Consent To Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff by Steven Clemente, Brad Kamman. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 6/15/2007 (Manzer, C).
June 11, 2007 Filing 40 NOTICE by County of Solano. of Change of Firm Name (Cassidy, Terence)
June 8, 2007 Filing 39 AMENDED Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff by Nathan Wold . (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 6/11/2007 (Duong, D).
May 29, 2007 Filing 38 AMENDED Consent to be included as an individual plaintiff by Daniel T. Castillo. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 5/30/2007 (Marciel, M).
May 25, 2007 Filing 37 AMENDED Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff by Aaron Rollin Neisingh. Attorney Yamada, Willy Masaichi added. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 5/29/2007 (Duong, D).
May 25, 2007 Filing 36 AMENDED Consent To Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff by Jason A. Trojanowski . (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 5/29/2007 (Duong, D).
May 23, 2007 Filing 35 AMENDED DOCUMENT by James Brown, Jr, Onita M. Carrasco.. Consent To Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff (Yamada, Willy)
May 22, 2007 Filing 34 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kelly Scarborough, Ginger Gibson.. Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff (Yamada, Willy)
May 21, 2007 Filing 33 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Diana Mallory, Judy Turner, Frank D. Fong.. Attorney Yamada, Willy Masaichi added. Consent To Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff (Yamada, Willy)
May 16, 2007 Filing 32 AMENDED CONSENT to be included as an individual plaintiff by Donna M. Bailey.(Yamada, Willy) Modified on 5/22/2007 (Kaminski, H).
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 05/15/07 re 16 Motion for Facilitated Notice ORDERING: 1) The language of the proposed notice is approved as fair and accurate, 2) Pltfs' counsel is authorized to mail the proposed notice to all persons who were Unit 13 Correctional Officers at any time between 10/16/03 and the present, 3) To be timely filed, Consent to Be Included as a Plaintiff forms must be filed with the court by 07/27/07 and may only be extended upon a showing of good cause, 4) Within 21 days of this order, the County of Solano shall produce to pltfs a list containing the names and addresses of all persons who were Unit 13 Correctional Officers at any time between 10/16/03 and the present, so that notice may be accomplished and 5) The hearing currently set for 05/21/07 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED.(Manzer, C) Modified on 5/16/2007 (Manzer, C). Modified on 5/16/2007 (Donati, J).
May 14, 2007 Filing 30 REPLY to RESPONSE to MOTION re #15 MOTION for Facilitated notice pursuant to 29USc216(b). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ron Plunkett)(Yamada, Willy) Modified on 5/15/2007 (Duong, D).
May 11, 2007 Filing 29 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Judy Turner.. Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff (Yamada, Willy)
May 7, 2007 Filing 28 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION re #15 MOTION for Facilitated Notice by dft County of Solano. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 5/8/2007 (Duong, D).
May 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/3/07 ORDERING that pltf, Jim Toynbe, is DISMISSED w/prejudice. (Brown, T)
May 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/3/07 ORDERING that pltf, Keith Bloomfield, is DISMISSED w/prejudice.(Brown, T)
May 2, 2007 Filing 25 Defendant's ANSWER to First AMENDED COMPLAINT /and Demand for Jury Trial by County of Solano.(Whitefleet, John) Modified on 5/3/2007 (Engbretson, K.).
April 30, 2007 Filing 24 AMENDED Consent to be included as an individual by Sylvia A. Mitchell. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 5/4/2007 (Matson, R).
April 27, 2007 Filing 23 AMENDED Consent to Be Included As Individual Plaintiff by Ronald Plunkett. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 5/4/2007 (Matson, R).
April 23, 2007 Filing 22 AMENDED Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/24/2007 (Duong, D).
April 19, 2007 Filing 21 AMENDED Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff . (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/20/2007 (Duong, D).
April 19, 2007 Filing 20 AMENDED Consent to Be Added As An Individual Plaintiff. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/20/2007 (Duong, D).
April 19, 2007 Filing 19 AMENDED Consent to Be Included As An Individual Plaintiff. (Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/20/2007 (Duong, D).
April 18, 2007 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against County of Solano by plts(Duong, D)
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 04/17/07 re #14 ORDERING that plts may file a First Amended Complaint. Defendant's responsive pleading to Plaintiff's amended complaint will be due fourteen days from the date the amended complaint is served on dft. (Duong, D) Modified on 4/18/2007 (Duong, D).
April 16, 2007 Filing 16 MOTION for Facilitated Notice pursuant to 29USC 216(b)by plts. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. [This entry made for reporting purposes only. Parties are to refer to docket entry #15 for the image of the motion, which was docketed incorrectly as a notice.](Duong, D)
April 16, 2007 Filing 15 MOTION for Facilitated Notice pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by plts. Attorney Yamada, Willy Masaichi added. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities #2 Declaration Will Yamada #3 Proposed Order)(Yamada, Willy) Modified on 4/17/2007 (Duong, D).
April 13, 2007 Filing 14 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Filing of Amended Complaint by the parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Mastagni, David) Modified on 4/16/2007 (Duong, D).
March 29, 2007 Filing 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss his action against dft County of Solano with prejudice by plt Keith Bloomfield . (Mastagni, David) Modified on 3/29/2007 (Duong, D).
March 29, 2007 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss his action with prejudice against dft County of Solano by Plaintiff Jim Toynbee . (Mastagni, David) Modified on 3/29/2007 (Duong, D).
January 23, 2007 Filing 11 CONSENT to be Included as an Individual Plaintiff. Attorney Mastagni, David E. added. (Bert Curtis). (Mastagni, David) Modified on 1/24/2007 (Duong, D).
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STATUS ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/18/07 ORDERING initial disclosures to be made 90 days after the 1/16/07 status hearing and all discovery is STAYED until then. A further Status Conference is SET for 6/25/2007 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Parties are reminded that pursuant to FRCP 16(b) the Pretrial Scheduling Order shall not be modified except by leave of court upon a showing of good cause.(Carlos, K)
January 16, 2007 Filing 9 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/16/2007. Plaintiff shall bring on a motion to provide notice within 90 days or the parties shall so stipulate within 90 days. Futher Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2007 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Plaintiffs Counsel Straun w. Boston present. Defendants Counsel John R. Whitefleet present. (Rivas, A)
January 5, 2007 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT by County of Solano. Attorney Whitefleet, John Robert added. (Whitefleet, John)
December 13, 2006 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by County of Solano.(Cassidy, Terence)
November 9, 2006 Filing 6 STIPULATION To Extend Time, to and including 12/13/06, to Respond to Complaint by County of Solano. Attorney Cassidy, Terence John added. (Cassidy, Terence) Modified on 11/13/2006 (Duong, D).
November 2, 2006 Filing 5 RETURN SERVICE EXECUTED upon Clerk to Board of Supervisors County of Solano on 10/23/06 by plts re #3 Summons, #1 Complaint, #4 Civil New Case Documents for LKK. (Boston, Straun) Modified on 11/3/2006 (Duong, D).
October 13, 2006 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2007 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms #2 VDRP Forms) (Kastilahn, A)
October 13, 2006 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Solano* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Straum W. Boston* *1912 J. Street* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Kastilahn, A)
October 13, 2006 RECEIPT number 201 12962 for $350.00 for Civil Filing Fee from Kathleen Mastagni. (Kastilahn, A)
October 13, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of the Fair Labor Standards Act [29 USC ? 201, et seq.] against County of Solano by plts. Attorney Boston, Straun Wolfe added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Summons)(Boston, Straun) Modified on 10/16/2006 (Duong, D).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abubakar et al v. County of Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Manzone
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin H. Bailey, Jr.
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Hutchinson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Seder
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan A. Rivera
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank D. Fong
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Esquibel
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James - Wilson
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin M. Adkins
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Gomes
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Aguilar
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Fernandez
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Pratt
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Bradley
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie L. Hardy
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Manzo
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cueva
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Glenn
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Joseph
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Acosta, Jr.
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Broadnax
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph P. Driscoll
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex A. Moffett
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy L. Broussard
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Tomasik
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Stewart
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Clark
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B. Smith
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Prestridge
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Jones
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney J. Herndon
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol McFadden
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lewis Simmons
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Walter
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Mallory
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis E. Weary
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Bruno
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason A. Trojanowski
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd A. Willmschen
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Gibson
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve T. Bone
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren E. Beckhusen
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. Shepherd
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brown, Jr.
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Smith
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin B. Boykin
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hurley
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jess L. Grapentine
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyes Carbajal
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn T. Gilligan
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua W. Prior
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent M. Dionisio
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Abubakar
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Richard Traber
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Lusk
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Harris, II
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio E. Villasenor
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Chase
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve L. Bottoms
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bert L. Curtis
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Moffett
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M. Bailey
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Chaides
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Russell
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Bidou
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew bidou
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Chapman
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas G. Schlemmer, Jr.
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Holabird
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Olmstead
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Poblete
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin L. Kirkland
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Porter, Sr.
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Castro, Jr.
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Montoya
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina M. Arnold
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Arcand
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Olmstead
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa A. Smith
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A Wilson
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny R. Hall, II
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Collins
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Vargas
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B. Putnam
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Gray
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Smyth
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark San Augustin
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise Broadwater
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Pereda
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Hardy
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Toynbee
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ramirez
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Featherson
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo L. Fleming
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel T. Castillo
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie E. Gray
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Kerr
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Hernandez
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert P. Manzano
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George V. Canton
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Turner
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurence Stahl
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Brown
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onita M. Carrasco
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Kamman
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Finnegan
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elbert Townsell
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Toynbee
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pege Metzger
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Rosenkild
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco C. Carrion
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Clemente
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Cleveland
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Julio
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard M. Jarovski
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph R. Castillo
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Aylworth
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian M. Miller
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris J. Lawson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Rodriguez
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Holsten
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard James Flores
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Carrasco
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Shortencarrier
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Rollin Neisingh
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Kennedy
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Iverson
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacee Kamman
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Hilyer, Jr.
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Scarborough
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia A. Mitchell
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Howell
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Janes
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Chastain
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Hagen
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deron K. Cordero
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian James
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Dessel
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Beck
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria G. Grapentine
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joslyn Clemons-Hatcher
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark J. Lagrisola
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bouakiong Chug Senesackda
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald G. Lahmon
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason L. Garrison
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome J. Metzger, III
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Wailes
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel M. Garcia
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Echols
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deron Cordero
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Finnegan
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Emmons
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Watson
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lombardo
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard T. Duncan
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Solis
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barnes Orlandos
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Bennett
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel V. Barrilleaux
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Anderson
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rodd, Jr.
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald L. Plunkett
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Petretti
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Laughlin
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Vincent Snyder
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David V. Amiccuci
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Martinez
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Thompson
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgina Salinas Manzano
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Randle
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee E Campbell
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Cacipes
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wilson
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Parrish
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrajean Riojas
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles F. Hayes
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danette I. Mercado
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary T. Thornton
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lewis
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Bloomfield
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Wold
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Johnson III
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Jiongo
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Garcia, Jr.
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin J. De Vaul
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Sepulveda
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Jiongo
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: James Byron Carr
Represented By: David D. King
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Neisingh
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Will M. Yamada
Represented By: Straun Wolfe Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Solano
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?