October 17, 2011 |
Filing
143
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/17/2011 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Larry Wimberly, P-92181, at the Jury Trial set for 10/31/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Michel, G)
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing
141
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/29/11 ORDERING that SUPPLEMENTAL briefing to be filed within ten days of the Pretrial Conference.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
September 2, 2011 |
Filing
135
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/1/2011 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Robert Mitchell, P-87230, at 9:00 AM on 10/31/2011 in Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Zignago, K.)
|
August 23, 2011 |
Filing
132
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/22/11 ORDERING all parties have filed a Consent to Jurisdiction of United States Magistrate and this matter is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings and entry of final judgment. The Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 9/29/2011 at 10:00 AM and the Jury Trial is reset for 10/31/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Matson, R)
|
August 19, 2011 |
Filing
131
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/18/11 ORDERING all parties have filed a "Consent to Jurisdiction of United States Magistrate Judge." According to E.D. Cal. Local Rule 305, both the district court judge assigned to the case and the magistrate judge must approve the assignment of the action to the magistrate judge. I approve the assignment, and if the magistrate judge approves the assignment all documents thereafter filed shall bear case number and initials 2:06-cv-2321 GGH, and the then scheduled dates before me are VACATED. (Becknal, R)
|
March 31, 2011 |
Filing
121
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/31/11 ORDERING the 4/7/11 Status Conference is VACATED and RESET to 4/28/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Donati, J) Modified on 3/31/2011 (Donati, J).
|
March 15, 2011 |
Filing
120
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 03/11/11 ordering the King Hall Civil Rights Clinic is appointed as attorney for plaintiff pursuant to General Order No. 230. The clerk of the court is directed to send counsel a copy of the file in this matter. Counsel shall submit all deposition transcript costs for payment pursuant to section 8030.6 of the California Business and Professions Code. The case is set for status conference at 04/07/11 at 10:00 a.m. (Plummer, M)
|
January 7, 2011 |
Filing
117
ORDER for writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for Plaintiff Mitchell's appearance at settlement conference at Solano State Prison 2/1/11. signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas on 1/7/11. (Masterson, G)
|
November 17, 2010 |
Filing
114
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/16/10 GRANTING 113 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The King Hall Civil Rights Clinic is appointed as attorney for Plaintiff pursuant to General Order no. 230 for the limited purpose of representing Plaintiff in Mediation proceedings. (Williams, D)(cc: King Hall Civil Rights Clinic). Modified on 11/18/2010 (Williams, D).
|
October 8, 2010 |
Filing
112
ORDER Setting Settlement Conference and Related Deadlines. Settlement Conference set for 2/1/2011 at 11:00 AM at Solano State Prison before Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas on October 8, 2010. (Masterson, G)
|
October 6, 2010 |
Filing
111
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/6/10: The Court, having considered the parties' stipulation for mediation 109 , ORDERS that this matter be mediated before Magistratie Judge Vadas within 120 days. The deadlines for pretrial statements and the trial date are hereby VACATED. (Kastilahn, A)
|
September 3, 2010 |
Filing
107
FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 09/02/10 ordering Plaintiff shall file and serve his pretrial statement and any motions necessary to obtain the attendance of witnesses at trial on or before 11/19/10. Defenda nts shall file their pretrial statement on or before 12/03/10. The pretrial conference is set in this case for 12/17/10 before the Magistrate Judge to be conducted on the file only without appearance by either party.(Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 4/1/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Jury Trial set for 5/24/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.)(Plummer, M)
|
August 27, 2010 |
Filing
106
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/25/2010 ORDERING that The 101 findings and recommendations filed July 27, 2010, are adopted in full. Plaintiff's 71 motion for partial summary judgment, filed on November 24, 2009 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part and Defendants' 78 cross-motion for summary judgment, filed on December 28, 2009 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as stated in this order. (Duong, D)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing
101
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/26/2010 ORDERING that pursuant to the stipulation between the parties, pltf's claims against dfts Streeter, Chatham and Galaviz, as well as pltf's Fou rteenth Amendment claim against dfts Adams, Morrison, Daviega, Hill and Hubach are voluntarily DISMISSED w/ prejudice and the clerk to note their dismissal in the dkt; DENYING pltf's 76 motion for sanctions; and RECOMMENDING that pltf's [ 71] motion for partial summary judgment be granted in part and denied in part; and dfts' 78 cross-motion for summary judgment be granted in part and denied in part, as stated in the recommendations. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due w/in 14 days.(Yin, K) Modified on 7/27/2010 (Yin, K).
|
January 6, 2010 |
Filing
84
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 01/05/10 granting 82 defendants' Motion for permission to file late their cross motion for summary judgment. Defendants' cross motion for summary judgment is deemed timely filed. (Plummer, M)
|
April 16, 2009 |
Filing
68
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 04/17/09 ordering ( Discovery extended to 7/31/2009, Dispositive Motion re-set to 11/30/2009.) There will be no further extension (Plummer, M) Modified on 4/21/2009 (Plummer, M).
|
February 4, 2008 |
Filing
29
ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/1/08 ORDERING that dft Epperson must SHOW CAUSE, within 10 days, why the court should not find that he/she is in default for failing to file a response to the c omplaint. Dfts Babich, Ingwerson, Lockard and C. Adams are voluntarily DISMISSED from this action; and dfts' 4/10/07, motion to dismiss these dfts is, therefore, DENIED AS MOOT. It is RECOMMENDED that dfts' 4/10/07, 20 motion to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies be denied in part and granted in part. Motion referred to Judge Burrell. Within 20 days after being served with these findings, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. Any reply shall be served and filed within 10 days after service of the objections. (Kastilahn, A)
|