June 17, 2011 |
Filing
47
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 6/17/2011 ORDERING 46 that the motion to stay 43 , shall be held in ABEYANCE up to and including 7/18/2011; on or before that date, the parties shall inform the Court whether the agreement referred to in the declaration of counsel has been executed; the hearing on the motion set for 6/20/2011 via telephone conference at 10:30 AM is hereby VACATED. (Reader, L)
|
June 9, 2011 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 6/8/11 ORDERING that a hearing on the pending MOTION to STAY 43 shall be held on Monday 6/20/2011 at 10:30 AM via telephone conference. The court will place the conference call to counsel for each party using the telephone numbers of record, unless provided with an alternative number. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
May 5, 2011 |
Filing
35
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 5/4/2011 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part petitioner's 34 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Office of Federal Defender attorney David M. Porter is ADDED as counsel for petitioner Lance Arman Cromwell. Clerk directed to serve a copy of 2/26/2010 18 Third Amended Petition and this Order on Mr. Porter (AFD). (cc: petitioner Lance Arman Cromwell via conventional service) (Marciel, M) Modified on 5/5/2011 (Marciel, M).
|
April 19, 2011 |
Filing
33
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PETITION signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 4/18/2011 ORDERING that the petition for writ of habeas corpus is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Resp is ORDERED to release Ptnr from custody on Shasta County Superior Court case number 03F4527, unless, within 90 days, the State of California elects to retry him. (Zignago, K.)
|
April 15, 2011 |
Filing
32
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 4/14/11 ORDERING that Respondent's 4/12/11 MOTION to alter or amend judgment 31 is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part; The 3/17/11 order granting the petition for writ of habeas corpus is VACATED. An Amended order superseding the 3/17/11 order will issue; the forthcoming order will contain an amended finding (deleted sentence) as described herein, but will not alter or amend the Judgment formerly announced. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
March 17, 2011 |
Filing
29
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 3/17/11 ORDERING that the petition for writ of habeas corpus is GRANTED in part, as to this claim, and denied in part, as to the remaining claims. Respondent is therefore ORDERED to release petitioner from custody on Shasta County Superior Court case number 03F4527, unless, within 90 days, the State of California elects to retry petitioner. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
February 24, 2011 |
Filing
27
PRELIMINARY REPORT TO THE DISTRICT JUDGE signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 2/23/11 ORDERING that each of the parties in this case has filed a Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). It is therefore recommended that the above-captioned case be referred and reassigned to the undersigned, the United States Magistrate Judge currently assigned to this case, for all further proceedings and entry of final judgment. (Becknal, R)
|
February 10, 2010 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 02/10/10 ordering the briefing schedule for respondent's response and petitioner's reply, set forth in the Order filed on 01/05/10 12 is vacated. The second amended petition, filed o n 02/03/10 15 is stricken from the record, for petitioner's failure to comply with the court's order. Petitioner must file a 3rd amended petition setting forth all 5 grounds upon which he chooses to proceed, provided they are all exhaust ed claims within 21 days; if he fails to do so timely, this matter will proceed upon the amended petition filed on 12/21/09 11 ; thereafter, without further order of the court, respondents must file a response to petitioner's habeas petition within 60 days. (Plummer, M)
|
December 17, 2009 |
Filing
9
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/17/09 ORDERING that petitioner has discharged the show cause order 7 , by his timely response 8 ; Petitioner must inform the court, within 21 days, whether he has received a response to his inquiry from the California Supreme Court and, if so, he must inform the court of the status of his state court petition; if no response is received, the petitioner must so inform the court within the same time period.(Dillon, M)
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing
7
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/12/09 ORDERING that petitioner must show cause, within 21 days, why the stay in this matter should not be lifted.(Dillon, M)
|