Chatman v. Felker, et. al.

Case Number: 2:2006cv02912
Filed: December 26, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/4/15: Defendants R. Cox, T. Dillard, Gordon, D. Guimond, C. K. Harvey, C. Hougland, G. James, M. Keating, W. Koenig, Laguna, E. Park, W. Patton, A. Pfadt, R. Rath, R. Ross, Stiles, J. Stiles, A. Amero and C. Barcus terminated. Dispositional Documents due within 45 days. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 11/5/2015 (Donati, J).
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by District Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/14/2015 ORDERING the custodian to produce Charles Chatman #P-99062, to testify in USDC at 9:00 a.m. on 11/30/2015 in courtroom 4, before Judge R obert C. Jones; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court Desk and Warden. (cc: OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/11/15 denying 110 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/20/13 ordering within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file and serve a pretrial statement and any motions necessary to obtain the attendance of witnesses at trial. Defendan ts shall file a pretrial statement not later than 30 days after the filing of plaintiff's statement. The pretrial conference will be conducted on the file only, without appearance by either party. The date for jury trial before the assigned district judge will be set in the pretrial order. (Plummer, M)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/13/2013 ORDERING, except as modififed by footnote one of this order, the 95 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are ADOPTED in full; 77 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as detailed in this Order. (Waggoner, D)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/23/2013 recommending that defendants' 77 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted in part and denied in part as detailed in these findings and recommendations. 1 C omplaint filed by Charles Chatman and 77 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by defendants referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton;Parties may file objections to findings and recommendations within 14 days after being served; failure to file objections within the specified time may waive the right to appeal. (Waggoner, D)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/19/13 ordering defendants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment. The 08/01/12 motion for summary judgment 77 is administratively vacated pending receipt of defendants' timely reply. (Plummer, M)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/3/12 ORDERING that Plaintiffs November 28, 2012 opposition is deemed timely filed; 87 findings and recommendations are VACATED; and defendants reply, if any, is due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/19/12 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/4/12 ORDERING that within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either an opposition to the motion or a statement of no opposition.(Dillon, M)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/10/12. (Plummer, M)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/24/12 denying 72 Motion for Summary Judgment. (See order for further details) Plaintiff's request for an extension of time 73 is denied as moot. (Plummer, M)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/16/12 granting 65 Motion to Compel ; If defendants McDonald, J. Stiles, Amero, S. Stiles, and Barcus have not already done so, they shall, within 21 days after the filing date of this order, p rovide responses to plaintiffs interrogatories, as discussed above. Any request to extend this deadline shall be accompanied by an appropriate declaration establishing good cause, including an explanation as to what efforts have been made to respond to the discovery requests since they were first served. Any further motion to compel based on defendants discovery responses served in accordance with this order must be filed within 30 days of plaintiffs receipt of those responses. Dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed within 90 after the filing date of this order. (Dillon, M)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/05/11 ordering that the courrent deadline for dispositive motions is hereby vacated. Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 21 days after the court issues its ruling on the motion to compel. (Plummer, M)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/28/2010 ORDERING 45 Findings and Recommendations are adopted in full; and 34 Motion to Dismiss is denied.(Matson, R)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/31/10 ORDERING plaintiff's motion for court intervention in serving defendant Patton 44 is granted. After conducting a good-faith inquiry as to the wher eabouts of defendant Patton as set out in Section III above, defendants' counsel shall file and serve an appropriate response within 30 days of the date of this order. Also, RECOMMENDING that Defendants' motion to dismiss be denied. Defendants be ordered to respond to the amended complaint within the time provided in FRCP 12. Motion to Dismiss 34 referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve * Amended Complaint * filed on * 4/18/2009,* on * A. Pfadt, M. Keating, J. Stiles, D. Guimond, W. Patton, C. Hougland, R. Ross, T. Dillard, E. Park, Gordon, G. James, R. Cox, S. M. Roche, C. K. Harvey, J. S. Avila, Tom Felker, M. D. McDonald, T. Perez, R. Rath, A. Amero, W. Koenig, Laguna*, Service Deadline set for 2/9/2010 signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/9/2009. (Matson, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatman v. Felker, et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?