Susanville Indian Rancheria v. Leavitt et al
Plaintiff: Susanville Indian Rancheria
Defendant: Margo Kerrigan, Charles W. Grim and Michael O. Leavitt
Case Number: 2:2007cv00259
Filed: February 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 25:640 Indian Tribal Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. on 2/28/07 ORDERING the following Preliminary Injunction issued: The parties are directed to execute the Compact and CY 2007 FA and provide such funding as is authorized under these agreements without impo sing any condition that would prevent pltf from charging beneficiaries for services. If a judicial determination is made that dfts' rejection of pltf's final offer (and imposition of conditions on executing the Compact and 2007 FA proposed therein) was lawful, either (1) all reference to the Tribe's pharmacy services program in the 2007 FA shall be deleted, no further funds shall be allocated to the Tribe's pharmacy services program, and any funds specially allocated for the pharmarcy services program shall be returned; or (2) a provision shall be added to the 2007 FA stating that eligible benficiaries will not be charged for services pursuant to the pharmacy services program.(Carlos, K)
February 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. on 2/20/07 ORDERING the briefing schedule for cross motions for summary judgment set forth in the Court's 2/14/07 Order is AMENDED as follows: Cross motions filed by 3/20/07; oppositions filed by 4/2/07; replies filed by 4/10/07; and the hearing is re-set for 4/30/2007 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr..(Carlos, K)
February 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER extending the parties' 2006 Annual Funding Agreement until a ruling on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction issues. A hearing will be held on Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction on February 26, 2007, at 2:00 p.m. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion no later than 4:30 p.m. on February 20, 2007, and Plaintiff shall file a reply no later than 4:30 p.m. on February 22, 2007. Each side's summary judgment motion shall be filed no later than March 6, 2007, oppositions shall be filed no later than March 20, 2007, and a hearing shall be held on April 2, 2007 at 9:00 a.m.(Bettencourt, Karen)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Susanville Indian Rancheria v. Leavitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margo Kerrigan
Represented By: Ernest Robert Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Grim
Represented By: Ernest Robert Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O. Leavitt
Represented By: Ernest Robert Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanville Indian Rancheria
Represented By: Geoffrey D Strommer PRO HAC VICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?