September 27, 2012 |
Filing
96
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/26/2012 ORDERING that the document filed by plaintiff on 6/5/2012 will be DISREGARDED.(Yin, K)
|
September 20, 2012 |
Filing
95
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/19/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff's April 5, 2012 request to reopen the time to appeal is granted; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.(cc: USCA) (Becknal, R)
|
June 22, 2012 |
Filing
93
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 6/21/2012 ORDERING that defendants are GRANTED ten days from the date of this order in which to file a response to plaintiff's request pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(6). (Zignago, K.)
|
February 15, 2012 |
Filing
85
ORDER adopting 81 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/15/12: Plaintiff's April 4, 2011 motion for preliminary injunction is denied 66 . Plaintiff's August 26, 2011 motion for temporary restraining order is denied 80 . (Kaminski, H).
|
January 9, 2012 |
Filing
83
ORDER denying 69 Motion for Appointment of Impartial Experts signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/6/12. (Matson, R)
|
June 7, 2011 |
Filing
77
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 6/7/2011 ADOPTING 71 Findings and Recommendations in full. Dfts' 62 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Pltf's claims against dft Swan are DISMISSED without prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
|
October 18, 2010 |
Filing
53
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/17/10 ordering that plaintiff's 10/07/10 response to defendants' answer 52 shall be disregarded.(Plummer, M)
|
August 31, 2010 |
Filing
50
ORDER denying 40 Motion for protective order signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/30/10. (Plummer, M)
|
July 13, 2010 |
Filing
46
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/12/2010 ORDERING 44 Findings and Recommendations are adopted in full; Defendants' 1/26/2010 motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status and motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 27) is denied; and Defendants are ordered to file a response to plaintiff's complaint within thirty days of the date of this order. (Matson, R)
|
June 16, 2010 |
Filing
44
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/15/10 ORDERING that the court's 04/16/10 findings and recommendations 33 is vacated. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' 01/26/10 motion to revoke plai ntiff's in forma pauperis status and motion to dismiss 27 be denied. Defendants be ordered to answer the complaint. MOTION to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status and Dismiss the Action 27 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing
39
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/07/10 granting 37 Motion for an extension of time. Defendant Suzan Hubbard shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, pay the U.S. Marshall the sum of $58.00, unless within that time defendant files a written statement showing good cause for her failure to waive service. Defendant Nola Grannis shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, pay the United States Marshall the sum of $71.00, unless within that time defendant files a written statement showing good cause for his failure to waive service. (Plummer, M)
|
April 20, 2010 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/19/10 ordering within 14 days from the date of this order defendant Nola Grannis shall pay to the U.S. Marshal the sum of $71.00, unless within that time defendant files a written statement showing good cause for his failure to waive service. The court does not intend to extend this 14 day period. The clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (Plummer, M)
|
April 16, 2010 |
Filing
33
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/15/10 RECOMMENDING that the 27 MOTION to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status be DENIED and Defendants be ordered to answer the complaint; objections due within 21 days. (Williams, D)
|
November 5, 2009 |
Filing
25
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/04/09 DIRECTING USM to serve amended complaint filed on 03/09/09, on Suzan Hubbard, D Swan, R McGahey, Benton, Brida, Grannis. (cc: USM) (Plummer, M)
|
October 6, 2009 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/5/09 ORDERING that service is appropriate for dfts Benton, Brida, Grannis, Suzan Hubbard, D Swan, R McGahey; the clerk to send pltf forms for service to be completed and returned w/in 30 days along w/ the Notice of Submission; pltf's 21 motion for protection order is DENIED.(Yin, K)
|
February 4, 2009 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/3/09 ORDERING that plaintiffs third amended complaint is DISMISSED. Plaintiff is granted a final opportunity to amend his complaint and to, within 30 days, file a fourth amended complaint. Plaintiff's 16 Motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's 17 motion for sanctions is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff the courts form for filing acivil rights action.(Dillon, M)
|