Kent v. United States of America
Plaintiff: John Kent
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2007cv02361
Filed: November 2, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/01/11 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's case be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) and Eastern District of California Local Rules 110 and 183(a); Objections to these F&Rs due within 14 days; referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Benson, A.)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/15/11 GRANTING 64 Motion to Compel; the Citys request for an award of reasonable expenses incurred by the City in having to file the motion to compel is DENIED. If plaintiff fails to attend or act reasonably during his deposition, the Citymay file a motion seeking the involuntary dismissal of plaintiffs entire action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) and Local Rules 110 and 183(a). (Meuleman, A)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/16/10 ORDERING that within 14 days of the date of service of this order, defendant BrianRamsey shall either pay to the United States Marshals Service the sum of $75.00 or, alternatively, file with the court a written statement showing good cause for failing to waive service. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshals Service. (cc USM) (Becknal, R)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/28/2010, ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to serve on the USM the following documents: four copies of this order, a copy of 50 pltf's complaint, a copy of the summons, a completed USM- 285 for dfts Melody Lane, Brian Ramsey, and Caroline McNorton, four copies of 8 pltf's second amended complaint, three copies of 11 the court's 7/23/08 scheduling order, along with the attached forms, and three copies of 46 this court 's 12/30/09 status (pretrial scheduling) order. The USM shall serve process, along with copies of this courts July 23, 2008 scheduling order and related documents, and this courts December 30, 2009 status (pretrial scheduling) order on dfts Lane, Ramsey and McNorton. Such service shall be completed within 90 days of receipt of the required info from the Clerk of Court, without prepayment of costs. (Kastilahn, A)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/1/09: Status Conference RESET for 12/16/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. No later than December 2, 2009, all parties shall file status reports (or a joint status report). The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (Kaminski, H) (cc: USM)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/19/09 ORDERING that a status conference is set for 10/7/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Not later than 14 days prior to the status conference, the parties shall file status reports. (Engbretson, K.)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/7/09: 18 MOTION to STAY hearing RESET for 8/5/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, no later than July 22, 2009, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure timely to file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to the pending motion. Plaintiff is directed to file an opposition, if any, to the motions, or a statement of nonopposition thereto, no later than July 22, 2009. (Kaminski, H)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 01/28/09 ORDERING that the 12 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED; the deadline within which plaintiff may submit service documents to the U.S. Marshal is EXTENDED to 15 days after the date this order is filed; no further extensions of time will be authorized; for the reasons set forth in the 07/23/08 order the 13 request for reconsideration regarding defendants is DENIED. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kent v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?