Kirk v. Felker et al
Petitioner: |
John Michael Kirk |
Respondent: |
Tom Felker and Attorney General CA |
Case Number: |
2:2007cv02521 |
Filed: |
November 26, 2007 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Lassen |
Presiding Judge: |
Garland E. Burrell |
Presiding Judge: |
Gregory G. Hollows |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 5, 2011 |
Filing
62
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 01/05/11 recommending that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing
56
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 6/29/10 ADOPTING 49 Findings and Recommendations in full. Resp's 12 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
|
May 13, 2010 |
Filing
49
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/12/2010 RECOMMENDING that respondent's 12 motion to dismiss the petition as untimely be denied. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
November 24, 2009 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/23/09 granting 43 Motion for authorization of the subpoenas and payment of witness and travel fees. (cc: USM) (Plummer, M)
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing
39
ORDER AND WRIT ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/27/09 ordering issuance of a writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum; Custodian to produce inmate John Michael Kirk to testify via videoconference on 12/01/09 at 9:00 a.m before the Honorable Gregory G. Hollows. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (3 certified copies sent to Warden at High Desert State Prison.)(Plummer, M)
|
October 16, 2009 |
Filing
36
ORDER AND WRIT ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/16/09 ORDERING issuance of writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum; Custodian to produce John Michael Kirk, CDC# V-58590 at 9:00 a.m. on November 16, 2009 via videoconferencing before Judge Gregory G. Hollows; Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court desk, CA State Prison. (Dillon, M)
|
January 13, 2009 |
Filing
21
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 01/12/09 ordering respondent's motion to dismiss the petition as untimely filed on 04/25/08 12 is denied without prejudice to its ultimate resolution following the evidentiary hearing set hererin. ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/15/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows.) The Federal Defender is appointed to represent the petitioner for purposes of investigating, preparing for and conducting the pending evidentiary hearing. In addition to respondent's counsel and petitioner pro se, the clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order on Carolyn Wiggin, Assistant Federal Defender.(Plummer, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?