Yeager et al v. Bowlin et al
Plaintiff: Charles Chuck Yeager and General Chuck Yeager Foundation
Defendant: Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, David McFarland, Aviation Autographs, Bowlin & Associates, Inc., Spalding Services, Inc. and International Association of Eagles, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv00102
Filed: January 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/6/2015 DENYING 245 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike and DENYING 266 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/8/15 ORDERING that the ex parte application filed June 30, 2015 246 is stricken. (Becknal, R)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/17/2015 DENYING 223 Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs of Collection of Judgment. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/8/15 re 222 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the transcript shall be received under seal pursuant to Local Rule 141 and FRCP 5.2. (Meuleman, A)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/2/15 ORDERING that 223 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs of Collection of Judgment hearing is CONTINUED to 6/29/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Def endants shall file a supplemental memorandum addressing the timeliness of their motion for attorneys' fees and costs of collection of judgment on or before 6/8/2015. Plaintiffs shall file a supplemental response addressing the same issue on or before 6/15/2015. (Kastilahn, A)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/15/2014 GRANTING 218 Motion to Substitute Party; SUBSTITUTING The Estate of Ed Bowlin, Connie Bowlin as Executor/Personal Representative as defendant for Ed Bowlin. (Michel, G)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER re 215 Request for copies of documents signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/4/14. (Kaminski, H)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/27/2014 ORDERING that the judgment debtor examination and the show cause hearing set for 3/12/2014 before the undersigned are VACATED. This order does not discharge the obligation of responde nt Victoria Yeager to pay the sums specified in the court's order filed 2/13/2014. Respondent is cautioned that failure to timely pay counsel Mark Serlin the sum of $896.11 and the United States Marshal the sum of $731.68 may result in contempt proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on respondent Victoria Yeager. (Zignago, K.)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/13/14: The order to show cause (ECF No. 198, 203) is discharged. No later than 2/19/14, Victoria Yeager shall pay counsel Mark Serlin the sum of $896.11. No later than 2/19/14, Victori a Yeager shall remit to the USM the sum of $731.68 for reimbursement of costs incurred in connection with service of OSC. No later than 2/24/14, Victoria Yeager and Charles Yeager shall provide to defendants the financial documents requested in the subpoena duces tecum. Hearing to show cause re: sanctions for failure to comply with the subpoena duces tecum set for 3/12/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Kaminski, H)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/28/2014 ORDERING the Clerk of Court to provide the U.S. Marshal with a copy of this order and a copy of 198 Order to Show Cause; DIRECTING the U.S. Marsha l to personally serve said orders on Deponent Victoria Yeager by 2/5/2014; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to thereafter file a proof of service with the court; ORDERING Deponent Victoria Yeager to personally appear at the Show Cause Hearing SET for 2/12/ 2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney and to SHOW CAUSE as to why she should not be held in contempt for failure to comply with 192 Order; GRANTING 201 Request to Withdraw as Counsel; SUBSTITUTING Plaintiffs in pro se; ORDERING that all further orders of the court be served on the plaintiffs at 15995 Pleasant Valley Road, Penn Valley, CA 95946. (Hand-delivered to U.S. Marshal) (Michel, G)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/9/14 ORDERING General Charles "Chuck Yeager to appear for examination on 2/12/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Becknal, R)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: CONTEMPT signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/9/2014 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE the Request for the Issuance of a Bench Warrant as to Victoria Yeager; ORDERING Deponent Victoria Yeager to SHOW CAUSE in writing, by 1/22/2014, as to why she should not be held in contempt for failure to comply with the courts 193 Order; ALLOWING the defendants to submit in writing, by 1/22/2014, brief points and authorities in support of the Request for the Issuance of a Bench Warrant; ORDERING Attorney Don Lesser to submit, by 1/22/2014, a Request to Withdraw as Attorney of Record; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve this order and all further orders of the court on Plaintiff Charles Yeager and Deponent Victoria Yeager at 15995 Pleasant Valley Road, Penn Valley, CA 95946. (Michel, G)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/20/2013 ORDERING 189 for Appearance and Examination Hearing set for 1/8/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney, as to Charles Chuck Yeager. (Reader, L)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER TO APPEAR signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/16/13: Charles Yeager is ordered to appear for Judgment Debtor Exam set for 7/10/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Manzer, C)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 163 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs in the amount of $275,596.58 signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/3/10. (Kaminski, H)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/23/10 ORDERING that Defendant shall submit an amended Motion for attorney's fees by 5/3/2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plainitiffs shall file any opposition to this motion by 5/17/10. Defendants may then file any reply no later than 5/24/10. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 4/26/10 hearing on this matter is VACATED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/2/2010 re: 155 Stipulation and Proposed Order ORDERING that motion hearing RESET for 4/26/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. Plaintiff's opposition brief shall be filed no later than 4/5/2010 and defendant's reply shall be filed no later than 4/19/2010. (Waggoner, D)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/25/10 ORDERING the court will not allow defendants' costs of $332.90 for copies of documents in the Munger case. In sum, the court allows: Fees for Service: $ 229.09, Fees of Court Reporters for Transcripts: 3,484.14, Fees for Witnesses: 113.70, Fees for Exemplification and Copies: 1,387.29; Total $5,214.22; Accordingly, the cost of $5,214.22 will be allowed. (Becknal, R)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/3/10 ORDERING that the Court's 139 Order re Costs is VACATED and set aside. Defendants shall submit any reply to plaintiff's 140 Objections within 10 days of the date of this order. (Owen, K)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER RE: COSTS signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/29/10. Costs of $8,131.65 will be allowed.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/6/2010 ORDERING 103 that defendants' motion for summary judgment be, and hereby the same is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' complaint be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED as to the remaining defendants. CASE CLOSED. (Reader, L)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 2/5/2009. Clerk directed to REASSIGN action to District Court, pursuant to Local Rule 72-302 (c)(21). Status Conference set for 3/23/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeager et al v. Bowlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Chuck Yeager
Represented By: Robert G. Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Chuck Yeager Foundation
Represented By: Robert G. Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Bowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Bowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviation Autographs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowlin & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spalding Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Eagles, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?