United States of America v. Approximately $4,950.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $4,950.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2008cv00395
Filed: February 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/1/10. The Court enters this Certificate of Reasonable Cause Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2465, that there was reasonable cause for the seizure or arrest of the defendant currency, and for the commencement and prosecution of this forfeiture action.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/28/2010 ORDERING that this matter is STAYED for an additional six months. The scheduling conference set for 6/14/2010 is CONTINUED to 12/13/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) be fore Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Fourteen days before the scheduling conference the parties will advise the court if a further stay is necessary. If the criminal case has been resolved, the parties will file a joint status report addressing the issues listed in the 2/22/2008, Order Setting Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference. (Engbretson, K.)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/14/2009 ORDERING 25 Scheduling Conference reset for 6/14/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; 14 days before the scheduling conference the parties will advise the court if a further stay is necessary. If the criminal case has been resolved, the parties will file a joint status report addressing the issues listed in the 2/22/2008, Order Setting Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $4,950.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kristin S Door
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $4,950.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?