Carroll v. Schwarzenegger et al
Plaintiff: Vernon D. Carroll
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger, N. Grannis, Raymond E Baker, Ken Clark, S. Sury Adevara, E. Mazin and Kings County
Case Number: 2:2008cv00408
Filed: February 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by District Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi on 7/17/2012 ORDERING Plaintiff's # 20 claims in the Second Amended Complaint against Defendant Sampath Suryadevara, identified in this action as Defendant S. Sury Adevara, are HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Insofar as there are no remaining claims in this action, this Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to close the case. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi on 3/22/12 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 75 Motion for Extension. The Court DIRECTS the Clerks Office to send Plaintiff a copy of the Second Amended Complaint, as well as a copy of t he 1/23/12 Motion and the 2/23/12 Motion; and the Court GRANTS Plaintiff an extension until 4/9/12 to serve the 1/23/12 Motion and the 2/23/12 Motion and to file a declaration confirming that he served those motions on Defendant. Plaintiffs 3/19/12 Motion is DENIED in all other respects. (Meuleman, A)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER authorized by District Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi on 1/10/2012 ORDERING 68 Motion for Third Review is construed as a second motion for reconsideration of the 64 Minute Order and is hereby DENIED for the reasons stated in this Court's 67 Order filed on 1/6/2012. (Waggoner, D)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REGARDING SERVICE signed by District Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi on 11/8/11 ORDERING the United States Marshal (USM) to file a status report within fourteen days from the date of this order. The status report shall address the following: Whether the USM has attempted to serve Sampath Suryadevara at 5357 E. Townsend Ave., Fresno, CA 93727; and 1771 W. Romney Dr., Ste. #C, Anaheim, CA 92801; If the USM has attempted to serve Sampath Suryadevara at those addresses, how was service attempted an d what were the outcomes of the attempts; If the USM has not attempted service at those addresses, why was there no attempt to serve Sampath Suryadevara at those addresses. The Court CAUTIONS the USM that the failure to file the status report within fourteen days of the date of this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. (CC: USM PRIORITY)(Becknal, R)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi on 5/9/2011 ORDERING that on the basis of the foregoing, Plaintiff's claims in the Second Amended Complaint against Defendant E. Mazin are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice; Plaintiff's claims against defendant S. Sury Adevara remain. (Waggoner, D)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi on 2/3/11 GRANTING plt's 45 Motion for a copy of his amended complaint and DIRECTS the Clerks Office to send Plaintiff a file-stamped copy of the SecondAmended Complaint with a copy of this order. The Court reminds Plaintiff that he must return the Notice of Submission of Documents, with the associated documents, regarding Defendant E. Mazin by February 11, 2011, and Plaintiff must return the Notice of Submission of Documents, with the associated documents, regarding Sampath Suryadevara, identified in this action as Defendant S. Sury Adevara, by February 28, 2011.(Duong, D)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi on 1/12/11. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a declaration by 2/4/2011 stating whether Sampath Suryadevara is the person identified as Defendant S. Sury Adevara in this Action. The Co urt CAUTIONS Plaintiff that, if he fails to file his declaration by 2/4/11, or if he states that Sampath Suryadevara is not the person he has identified as Defendant S. Sury Adevara, this Court will dismiss this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi on 9/27/2010 ORDERING Plaintiff's 34 request for the appointment of counsel is DENIED; pltf's 33 request for the district court to conduct an investigation of dfts' current resid ence and/or employment addresses is DENIED; pltf shall file a declaration or affidavit setting forth further information which the Marshal's Office may use to identify dfts S. Sury Adevara and E. Mazin for service; pltf shall file the declaratio n or affidavit by no later than 11/12/2010; pltf's request for "declaration after service and set forth and alias summons motion as filed" is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; pltf may renew this request by no later than 11/12/2010; the Court CAUTIONS pltf that, if he fails to provide timely and sufficient information for the Marshal's Office to identify dfts for service, this Court will recommend that the district judge dismiss this action pursuant to FRCP 4(m). (Reader, L)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE, signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi on 7/26/10. Pltf shall provide the Court with the current addresses of dfts S. Sury Adevara and E. Mazin by NO LATER than 8/27/10. If pltf cannot provide current addresses for dfts, pltf shall file a declaration with the Court by NO LATER than 8/27/10. (Kastilahn, A)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment and 28 Motion for Default Judgment signed by District Judge Susan Oki Mollway on 4/28/10: The Clerk of the Court is directed to forward a copy of this order to the United States Marshal. (cc: USM) (Kaminski, H)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi on 2/19/2010 DENYING 25 Motion for Investigation. (Matson, R)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve * Amended Complaint * filed on * 12/11/2009,* on * S. Sury Adevara, E. Mazin*, Service Deadline set for 5/24/2010 signed by District Judge Susan Oki Mollway on 1/15/2010. (Matson, R)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCREENING ORDER signed by District Judge Susan Oki Mollway on 12/21/09: Service shall be made on Adevara and Mazin. The Clerk of the Court shall send Carroll two (2) USM-285 forms, one summons, an instruction sheet, and three endorsed copies of the Second Amended Complaint filed December 11, 2009. (Kaminski, H)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi on 12/16/09 ORDERING that pltf's 20 motion to amend is CONSTRUED as pltf's Second Amended Cmplt; pltf's 19 motion for legal pro-per status is DENIED AS MOOT as to obtaining legal supplies and DENIED w/out prejudice as to access to the law library. (Yin, K)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge Susan Oki Mollway on 11/17/09 DISMISSING claims against Governor Schwarzenegger, Grannis, Baker, Clark, and Kings County, as Carroll has not stated any viable claim against these Dfts. The court gives Carroll until 12/17/09, to file a Second Amended Complaint to state viable claims against Adevara and Mazin. (Engbretson, K.)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Susan Oki Mollway on 10/26/09 ORDERING that plaintiff is granted an extension of time to file Amended Complaint; Amended Complaint due by 11/24/2009. Clerk directed to send copy of 10/14/09 Order of plaintiff's updated address. (Owen, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon D. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond E Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sury Adevara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Mazin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?