February 3, 2010 |
Filing
27
ORDER signed by District Judge Susan Oki Mollway on 2/2/10 ORDERING because Ryan failed to exhaust his prison remedies, this court DISMISSED his Complaint pursuant to § 1997e(a); this dismissal is with respect to all defendants, even though only the Solano County Sheriffs Department and Gary Stanton filed the motion to dismiss before this court; to the extent Ryans Complaint seeks relief from Solano County, the reasons supporting the dismissal of his Complaint apply equally to Solano County ; Accordingly, the clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of all of the defendants and to close this case. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to Ryan at the following address: Stephen R. Ryan V-54525, California Mens Colony, P.O. Box 8103, San Luis Obispo, CA 93403-8103. CASE CLOSED. (Carlos, K)
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing
21
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren on 11/13/09 ORDERING: parties are notified that all pretrial proceedings will be conducted by telecommunicatons technologies to allow pltf to remain in the penal institution; Discovery due by 9/7/2010; Motions due by 5/11/2010; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2010 at 09:00 AM in Visiting Judge (TBD) before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren; Jury Trial set for 11/9/2010 at 09:00 AM in Visiting Judge (TBD) before District Judge Susan Oki Mollway.(Carlos, K)
|
September 15, 2009 |
Filing
16
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S Findings and recommendation signed by District Judge Susan Oki Mollway on 9/14/09 ORDERING pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 636(b)(1)(C) and Local Rule 74.2, the document titled "Findings and Recommendation that Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on Pleadings be Denied" is Adopted as the opinion and order of this Court. (Becknal, R)
|
August 27, 2009 |
Filing
15
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren on 08/26/09 RECOMMENDING that 11 plf's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings be denied; Objections to these F&Rs due 09/08/09; referred to Judge Susan Oki Mollway. (Benson, A.)
|
August 20, 2009 |
Filing
14
ORDER DIRECTING USM signed by Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren on 8/20/09 to serve * complaint * filed on * 3/7/08,* on * Solano County, Solano County Sheriff's Department, Gary Stanton*, Service Deadline set for 12/21/2009. (cc: USM w/3 copies of cmp, 3 summons, and 3 copies of service order) (Carlos, K) Modified on 8/20/2009 (Carlos, K).
|
July 9, 2009 |
Filing
12
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms signed by Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren on 7/2/09 ORDERING that Service is appropriate for Solano County, Solano County Sheriff's Department and Gary Stanton. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 3 USM-285 Forms, and 1 copy of the Complaint filed on 3/7/08. Case Management Deadline: 8/11/09. (Becknal, R)
|
January 7, 2009 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren on 1/6/09 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350 for this action. John Marsha ll, Warden, at California Men's Colony, or his designee, shall collect from Plaintiff's prison account monthly payments in an amount equal to twenty percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison account an d shall forward those payments to the Clerk of Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2) until a total of $350 has been collected and forwarded to the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff and on John Marshall. The court has not yet screened the Complaint to determine whether it sufficiently states a claim and shall proceed in the normal course. (cc John Marshall) (Duong, D)
|