Hookano v. Washington Mutual Bank, et al
Plaintiff: Sandra D. Hookano
Defendant: FDIC, California Reconveyance Company, Keller Williams Realty, Washington Mutual Bank, Inc., Paul Boudier, Janis Watson, JP Morgan Chase Bank and Jane Thompson
Not Yet Classified: VDRP
Case Number: 2:2008cv00751
Filed: April 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K Karlton
Referring Judge: John F Moulds
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 JUDGMENT dated *11/4/10* pursuant to order signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/3/10. (Becknal, R)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/3/10 ORDERING the court dismisses this case for lack fo a subject matter jurdisdiction. The Clerk of the court is driedt to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)
September 22, 2010 Filing 77 RESPONSE by Sandra D. Hookano to #75 Order to Show Cause, #76 Response. (Ho'okano, Thomas)
September 22, 2010 Filing 76 RESPONSE by California Reconveyance Company, FDIC as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, Inc. to #75 Order to Show Cause. Attorney Yoo, S. Christopher added. (Yoo, S.)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/15/10 ORDERING that the pltf and moving dfts shall show cause within 7 days why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Manzer, C)
September 9, 2010 Filing 74 REQUEST for judicial notice in opposition to dfts' motion to dismiss by Sandra D. Hookano. (Kastilahn, A)
September 3, 2010 Filing 73 REPLY to #71 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by California Reconveyance Company, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, Inc. (Yoo, S.) Modified on 9/7/2010 (Manzer, C).
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/3/10 ORDERING that pending before the court is a motion to dismiss #66 by defendants Washington Mutual Bank, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, and California Reconveyance Company. The court does not find oral argument necessary in this matter. Accordingly,the hearings on the above motions currently set for 9/13/10 are VACATED. The deadline for submission of plaintiffs' oppositions and defendant's reply memoranda, if any, remain unchanged. (Becknal, R)
August 23, 2010 Filing 71 OPPOSITION by Sandra D. Hookano to #66 Motion to Dismiss. (Ho'okano, Thomas)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/13/10 ORDERING that the hearing of Defendants' MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #66 is CONTINUED from 8/30/10 to 9/13/2010 at 10:00 AM. Defendants' Reply Brief, if any, calculated from the 9/13/10 continued hearing date. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 12, 2010 Filing 69 PROPOSED ORDER Granting #68 Stipulation for Continuance of the hearing on defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Sandra D. Hookano. (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 8/13/2010 (Duong, D).
August 12, 2010 Filing 68 STIPULATION Continuing Hearing On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Verified Complaint And Extending The Briefing Schedule to 9/13/2010 10:00am by Sandra D. Hookano. (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 8/13/2010 (Duong, D).
June 25, 2010 Filing 67 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, California Reconveyance Company in re #66 Motion to Dismiss,. (Yoo, S.)
June 25, 2010 Filing 66 MOTION to DISMISS by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, California Reconveyance Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yoo, S.)
June 23, 2010 Filing 65 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: JP Morgan Chase Bank served on 5/26/2010. (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 6/24/2010 (Williams, D).
June 23, 2010 Filing 64 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California Reconveyance Company served on 5/26/2010. (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 6/24/2010 (Williams, D).
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/14/10 ORDERING that pursuant to the Stipulation, the Defendants shall have up to, and including, 6/25/10 to respond to the Second Amended Complaint. (Becknal, R)
June 11, 2010 Filing 62 STIPULATION to extend time to respond to #56 Second Amended Complaint by defendants. Attorney Yoo, S. Christopher added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yoo, S.) Modified on 6/14/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 23, 2010 Filing 61 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Janis Watson, JP Morgan Chase Bank, California Reconveyance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas E. Ho'okano* *Law Office of Thomas E. Ho'okano* *2170 Promontory Point Lane* *Gold River, CA 95670*. (Marciel, M)
April 23, 2010 Filing 60 [DISREGARD - REFER TO #61 AMENDED SUMMONS AS ORIGINAL] SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Washington Mutual Bank, Inc., Janis Watson, JP Morgan Chase Bank, California Reconveyance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas E. Ho'okano* *Law Office of Thomas E. Ho'okano* *2170 Promontory Point Lane* *Gold River, CA 95670*. (Marciel, M) Modified on 4/23/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 21, 2010 SERVICE BY MAIL: #59 Order served on Hermann E. Lorenz Jr. (Owen, K)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/21/10 ORDERING that the FDIC, as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank is DISMISSED with prejudice without costs and attorneys' fees. (Owen, K)
April 20, 2010 Filing 58 PROPOSED ORDER granting #57 Dismissal of FDIC as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (McWhorter, Robert) Modified on 4/21/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 20, 2010 Filing 57 STIPULATION to Dismiss FDIC, as Receiver of Washington Mutual Bank by FDIC. (McWhorter, Robert) Modified on 4/21/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 19, 2010 Filing 56 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants by Sandra D. Hookano. (Ho'okano, Thomas)
April 14, 2010 SERVICE BY MAIL: #55 Order served on Hermann E. Lorenz Jr.. (Engbretson, K.)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/14/2010 GRANTING leave to file her Second Amended Verified Complaint by 4/19/2010. The FDIC-R's pending #41 Motion To Dismiss is withdrawn without prejudice. (Engbretson, K.)
April 13, 2010 Filing 54 PROPOSED ORDER re #53 Stipulation by FDIC as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (McWhorter, Robert)
April 13, 2010 Filing 53 STIPULATION Granting Leave To File Second Amended Complaint And Addressing Dismissal Of FDIC-R by FDIC as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (McWhorter, Robert)
March 31, 2010 [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] REMOVAL FROM VDRP, terminating VDRP party. This case has been removed from the VDRP process.(Martinez, L)
March 24, 2010 SERVICE BY MAIL: #52 Order served on Hermann E. Lorenz, Jr. (Benson, A.)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 03/24/10 ORDERING that plf's #45 Motion to Shorten Time is DENIED. Plaintiff may, however, file a motion to file her second amended complaint pursuant to standard notice and briefing schedules. (Benson, A.)
March 23, 2010 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by FDIC as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank re #50 Opposition to Motion. (Kennedy, John)
March 23, 2010 Filing 50 OPPOSITION by FDIC as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank to #45 EX PARTE APPLICATION to SHORTEN TIME. (Kennedy, John) Modified on 3/23/2010 (Kaminski, H).
March 23, 2010 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM by Sandra D. Hookano in SUPPORT of #45 EX PARTE APPLICATION . (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 3/23/2010 (Kaminski, H).
March 22, 2010 Filing 48 Plaintiff's Proposed Second Amended Verified Complaint re #45 EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by Sandra D. Hookano. (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 3/23/2010 (Kaminski, H).
March 22, 2010 Filing 47 PROPOSED ORDER re #45 EX PARTE APPLICATION (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 3/23/2010 (Kaminski, H).
March 22, 2010 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Thomas E. Ho'okano in Support of #45 EX PARTE APPLICATION. (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 3/23/2010 (Kaminski, H).
March 22, 2010 Filing 45 EX PARTE APPLICATION for an order SHORTENING TIME by Sandra D. Hookano. (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 3/23/2010 (Kaminski, H).
March 9, 2010 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Robert S. McWhorter in Support Of #41 MOTION to DISMISS. (McWhorter, Robert)
March 9, 2010 Filing 43 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by FDIC as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank in re #41 Motion to Dismiss. (McWhorter, Robert)
March 9, 2010 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM by FDIC as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank in SUPPORT of #41 MOTION to DISMISS. (McWhorter, Robert)
March 9, 2010 Filing 41 MOTION to DISMISS by FDIC as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (McWhorter, Robert)
March 9, 2010 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT by FDIC as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (McWhorter, Robert)
August 28, 2009 SERVICE BY MAIL: #39 Order, served on Hermann E. Lorenz Jr.. (Reader, L)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER CONTINUING STAY OF CASE signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/28/2009 ORDERING #37 This case is hereby STAYED for an additional 180 days, until 3/6/2010 to enable the FDIC-R to complete its determination of Plaintiff's administrative claim. All dates scheduled by this Court are VACATED. Counsel for the FDIC-R shall advise the Court when the administrative process has been completed. Should the process not be completed within 180 days counsel for the FDIC-R shall so advise the Court and provide a status report.(Reader, L)
August 25, 2009 Filing 38 PROPOSED ORDER re #37 Stipulation by FDIC as receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (McWhorter, Robert)
August 25, 2009 Filing 37 STIPULATION Continuing Stay of Case to 3/6/2010 by FDIC as receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (McWhorter, Robert) Modified on 8/26/2009 (Duong, D).
June 16, 2009 SERVICE BY MAIL: #36 Order served on Hermann E. Lorenz Jr. (Engbretson, K.)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/16/09 ORDERING that it has come to the court's attention that the court has opened a minimal account for his daughter with Washington Mutual Bank. Upon review and consideration of the case, the court determines that this interest presents no conflict in the fair adjudication of the case and that recusal is not necessary. (Engbretson, K.)
March 11, 2009 SERVICE BY MAIL: #35 Order staying case served on attorney Hermann E Lorenz Jr.. (Marciel, M)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER #34 continuing stay of case signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/11/2009. This action is STAYED until administrative processs has been completed or for 180 days. Should administrative process not be completed w/in 180 days, counsel for FDIC shall so advise Court and provide Status Report. The Status Conference scheduled for 3/23/2009 is hereby VACATED. (Marciel, M)
March 6, 2009 Filing 34 PROPOSED ORDER continuing Stay of Case pursuant to #33 Stipulation by FDIC as receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (McWhorter, Robert) Modified on 3/11/2009 (Marciel, M).
March 6, 2009 Filing 33 STIPULATION Continuing Stay of Case by FDIC as receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (McWhorter, Robert) Modified on 3/9/2009 (Duong, D).
January 7, 2009 SERVICE BY MAIL: #32 Order served on Hermann E Lorenz Jr. (Kastilahn, A)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #30 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/7/09 ORDERING that the FDIC, as receiver for Washington Mutual Bank, is hereby substituted as dft in the place of Washington Mutual Bank. The status (pretrial scheduling) conf order entered on 8/20/08 is VACATED; and a Status Conference is SET for 3/23/2009 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. This case is STAYED until 3/16/09. (Kastilahn, A)
January 6, 2009 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc. re #30 Stipulation, #28 Proposed Order. (on Hermann Lorenz) (Kennedy, John)
January 6, 2009 Filing 30 AMENDED STIPULATION #26 Permitting Substitution of Party Defendant and Staying Case (Amended w/Exhibit A) by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc. (Kennedy, John) Modified on 1/6/2009 (Benson, A)
January 6, 2009 Filing 29 [DISREGARD - WRONG IMAGE - COUNSEL TO RE-FILE] STIPULATION Permitting substitution of defendant and staying case [Amended w/Exhibit] by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc.. (Kennedy, John) Modified on 1/6/2009 (Benson, A.).
January 5, 2009 Filing 28 [PROPOSED] ORDER substituting party defendant; staying case; and Re-scheduling Status Conference re #30 Stipulation by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc. Attorney Kennedy, John Thomas added. (Kennedy, John). Modified on 1/6/2009 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 17, 2008 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc. re #26 Stipulation. (on Hermann Lorenz, Esq.) (McWhorter, Robert)
December 17, 2008 Filing 26 STIPULATION permitting substitution of party dft and staying case by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc. Attorney McWhorter, Robert Scott added. (McWhorter, Robert) Modified on 1/6/2009 (Benson, A.).
September 8, 2008 Filing 25 [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] COURT LETTER from VDRP Administrator appointing Hermann E. Lorenz, Jr., of Lorenz and Cutter, as Neutral Attorney.(Martinez, L)
September 4, 2008 Filing 24 First Amended Verified Complaint To Set Aside Trustee's Sale And Cancellation of Trustee's Deed, Damages For Fraud and Breach of Contract, Equitable Estoppel, Damages For Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress, and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sandra D. Hookano by Sandra D. Hookano.(Ho'okano, Thomas)
September 4, 2008 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Counsel Allowing the Filing of a First Amended Verified Complaint by Sandra D. Hookano. (Ho'okano, Thomas)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (VACATED per #32 Court Order) STATUS PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/20/2008 ORDERING Discovery due by 2/18/2009. Dispositive Motion due by 4/18/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2009 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Jury Trial set for 10/20/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Case Referred to Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program (VDRP). (Reader, L) Modified on 1/7/2009 (Kastilahn, A).
August 18, 2008 Filing 21 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/18/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2009 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. 5 day Jury Trial set for 10/20/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Court order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Thomas Hookano present. Defendants Counsel Lawrence Stevens present. (Rivas, A)
August 11, 2008 Filing 20 PLAINTIFF(S) STATUS REPORT by Sandra D. Hookano. (Ho'okano, Thomas)
August 7, 2008 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc.. (Stevens, Lawrence)
August 7, 2008 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc.. (Stevens, Lawrence)
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: Per plaintiff's request (with no objection from defendant), the status conference currently set for June 30, 2008 is reset to August 18, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. Status reports shall be filed ten (10) days prior to the new status conference date. Approved by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 06/25/2008. (Hoover, S)
June 23, 2008 Filing 16 PLAINTIFF(S) STATUS REPORT by Sandra D. Hookano and REQUEST for continuance of status conference. (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 6/24/2008 (Duong, D).
June 20, 2008 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc. re #14 Status Report. (Stevens, Lawrence)
June 20, 2008 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc.. (Stevens, Lawrence)
June 7, 2008 Filing 13 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel from 6/9/08 through 6/27/08 by Sandra D. Hookano. (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 6/9/2008 (Duong, D).
May 28, 2008 PARTY UPDATE: Paul Boudier and Keller Williams Realty terminated. (Duong, D)
May 28, 2008 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Sandra D. Hookano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation of Counsel Dismissing Defendants, #2 Exhibit Stipulation of Counsel Dismissing Defendants, #3 Exhibit Stipulation of Counsel Dismissing Defendants)(Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 5/29/2008 (Duong, D).
May 28, 2008 Filing 11 DISREGARD - See Amended Notice entry #12 [NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Sandra D. Hookano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation Dismissing Defendants)](Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 5/29/2008 (Duong, D).
May 5, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc.. (Stevens, Lawrence) Modified on 5/8/2008 (Marciel, M).
May 5, 2008 Filing 9 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Washington Mutual Bank, Inc.. Attorney Stevens, Lawrence William added. (Stevens, Lawrence)
April 18, 2008 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Sandra D. Hookano. Washington Mutual Bank, Inc. served on 4/15/2008, answer due 5/5/2008. (Ho'okano, Thomas)
April 9, 2008 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Sandra D. Hookano. Keller Williams Realty served on 4/9/2008. (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 4/11/2008 (Reader, L).
April 9, 2008 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Sandra D. Hookano. Paul Boudier served on 4/9/2008. (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 4/11/2008 (Reader, L).
April 8, 2008 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2008 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms, #2 VDRP Forms) (Marciel, M)
April 8, 2008 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jane Thompson, Washington Mutual Bank, Inc., Keller Williams Realty, Paul Boudier* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Thomas E. Ho'okano* *Law Office of Thomas E. Ho'okano* *2170 Promontory Point Lane* *Gold River, CA 95670*. (Marciel, M)
April 8, 2008 RECEIPT number # CAE200006188 $350.00 fbo plaintiff by Sandra Hookano on 4/8/2008. (Marciel, M)
April 7, 2008 Filing 2 VERIFIED COMPLAINT to Set Aside trustee's sale and cancellation of trustee's deed, Damages for Fraud and Breach of Contract, Equitable Estoppel, Damages for Intentional and Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress, and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief against all defendants by Sandra D. Hookano. (Ho'okano, Thomas) Modified on 4/8/2008 (Marciel, M).
April 7, 2008 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sandra D. Hookano (Ho'okano, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hookano v. Washington Mutual Bank, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra D. Hookano
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Ho'okano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FDIC
Represented By: John Thomas Kennedy, III
Represented By: Lawrence William Stevens
Represented By: Robert Scott McWhorter
Represented By: S. Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Represented By: S. Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Williams Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, Inc.
Represented By: S. Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Boudier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janis Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: S. Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: VDRP
Represented By: Hermann E. Lorenz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?