Kress et al v. PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP
Plaintiff: Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham, Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, Lauren Barry, James Stekelberg, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Ricardo Ochoa and Antoine Powell
Defendant: PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Yury Adamov
Case Number: 2:2008cv00965
Filed: May 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 435 JUDGMENT dated *5/7/2018* in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant pursuant to order signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/7/2018. (Hunt, G)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/7/2018 GRANTING #424 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement: APPROVING award of attorney fees, costs and class representative service awards and DISMISSAL of this action. CASE CLOSED. (Hunt, G)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 433 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/3/2018: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Notice of Completion of Tasks and Request for Final Approval and Fees (ECF No. #432 ) as well as the necessary declarations the Court requested (ECF Nos. #429 & #430 ). Counsel filed the proposed order only last week (ECF No. 43 1). Additionally, Counsel is reminded this District carriers one of the heaviest case loads in the country. Thus, the Court will issue an order in due course and only after taking the time to appropriately review the new submissions. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 432 NOTICE of COMPLETION of Tasks Requested by Court in Connection with Final Approval of Class Setlement and Request for Fees and Costs by Samuel Brandon Kress. (Baird, William) Modified on 5/3/2018 (Benson, A.).
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 431 PROPOSED ORDER re #424 #425 by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Totten, Julie) Modified on 4/27/2018 (Benson, A.).
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 430 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Steven Elster in support of #425 Motion for Attorney Fees Costs, and Enhancement Awards. (Baird, William) Modified on 4/27/2018 (Benson, A.).
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 429 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Edward J. Wynne in support of #425 Motion for Attorney Fees Costs, and Enhancement Awards. (Wynne, Edward) Modified on 4/25/2018 (Benson, A.).
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 428 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Troy L. Nunley: MOTION HEARING held on 4/19/2018. The Court GRANTED Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement (ECF No. #424 ) and PRELIMINARILY GRANTED Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs (ECF No. #425 ). Plaintiffs' counsel shall submit a proposed order. Plaintiffs Counsel William Baird present. Defendants Counsel Julie Totten present. Court Reporter: Kacy Barajas. (Krueger, M)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 427 DECLARATION of Nathalie Hernandez of ILYM Group in SUPPORT of #424 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Baird, William)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 426 DECLARATION of William A Baird in SUPPORT of #424 Motion Final for Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Baird, William)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 425 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES, COST and ENHANCEMENT AWARDS by Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William A. Baird, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Declaration of Samuel Brandon Kress, #8 Declaration of Jesse O'Neil)(Baird, William) Modified on 3/19/2018 (Washington, S).
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 424 MOTION for FINAL APPROVAL of CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathalie Hernandez)(Baird, William) Modified on 3/19/2018 (Washington, S).
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/28/2018 GRANTING Plaintiffs Attorney Monique Myatt Galloway's Withdrawal of Appearance (ECF No. #422 ). (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 422 NOTICE to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY by Monique Galloway for Plaintiffs. (Galloway, Monique) Modified on 2/28/2018 (Krueger, M).
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/4/18 GRANTING Preliminary Approval of Consolidated Action Settlement; Appointment of a Settlement Administrator; Class Representatives; and Class Counsel re #419 . (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 420 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/7/2017: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement (ECF No. #419 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 12/14/2017 is VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MOTION for PRELIMINARY APPROVAL of Settlement, Approval of Proposed Class Notice, and Scheduling a Final Approval Hearing by Samuel Brandon Kress. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Baird, William) Modified on 11/15/2017 (York, M).
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 418 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 06/05/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff James Stekelberg's individual claims in the above action are DISMISSED in their entirety; Stekelberg shall not be advanced as a representative of the IAS putative class or any other putative class in this action; Plaintiffs and Defendant agree that each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. (Benson, A)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 417 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of James Stekelberg's Claims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Totten, Julie)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 416 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Edward Joseph Wynne. (Wynne, Edward)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 415 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/5/17 ORDERING that all Phase I Discovery shall be completed by 11/15/17; Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 12/15/17; the Motion for Class Certification shall be filed by 1/25/18; All other necessary dates and deadlines, will be set by a Supplemental Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued following the Class Certification hearing. (Becknal, R)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 414 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Samuel Brandon Kress. (Muhic, Peter)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 413 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/1/2017 ORDERING the parties to meet and confer within forty-five (45) days and to file an updated Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days of the meeting. All discovery shall be completed by 8/24/2017. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/26/2017. All dispositive motions shall be heard no later than 2/22/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2018 at 02:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties shall file, not later than 5/24/2018, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement. Jury Trial set for 7/30/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Zignago, K.)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 412 JOINT STATUS REPORT by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Totten, Julie)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 411 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/4/2016 ORDERING that the deadline for the parties Amended Joint Status Report is CONTINUED to 1/20/2017. (Zignago, K.)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 410 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of January 6, 2017, Filing Date of Amended Joint Status Report by Samuel Brandon Kress. (Baird, William)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 409 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Virginia Chentis, PHV terminated (Muhic, Peter)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 408 MINUTE ORDER issued by Judicial Assistant, D. Morrison for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/16/2016: In the Parties' Joint Status Report dated 10/07/16 (ECF No. #407 ), Plaintiff requested an additional ninety (90) days to consider the need for discovery before the Court issues a scheduling order. Pursuant to this request, the Court hereby Orders the parties to file an Amended Joint Status Report by January 6, 2017. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Morrison, D)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 407 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Samuel Brandon Kress. (Muhic, Peter)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 406 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/8/2016: This case was closed in error and is hereby REOPENED. The parties are directed to file an updated Joint Status Report within 30 days of this order. Failure to timely file may result in the imposition sanctions. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT AND FLSA SETTLEMENT CLASS signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/1/16. The Court hereby grants the Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Settlement, enters Partial Final Judgment of Dismissal of the Consolidated Action, approves the Settlement Agreement as fair, reasonable, in the best interest of the Participating Class Members, and adequate in all respects to the Participating Class Members pursuant to FLSA and all applicable law, and orders the Settling Parties to consummate the Settlement in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement. The Court approves the payment of the Fee Award and the Expense Award in the amount of $499.950.00 to Class Counsel in attorneys' fees and the amount of $184,251.30 for Class Counsel's actual out-of-pocket expenses incurred in the FLSA Associate Action, which shall be paid from, and not in addition to, the Gross Settlement Payment. The Court approves a Class Representative Service Award of $10,000 to Class Representative Lac Anh Le and Class Representative Service Awards of $5,000 each to Class Representatives Dana Blindbury, Jason Patterson, Lauren Barry San Mateo, and Kelly Jones, which shall be paid from, and not in addition to, the Gross Settlement Payment. The Court approves the payment of reasonable Administrative Costs to the Settlement Administrator ILYM Group, Inc. in an amount of $14,051.21. Plaintiffs' share of the Administrative Costs shall be paid from, and not in addition to, the Gross Settlement Payment. Defendant's share of the Administrative Costs shall be paid for by Defendant in addition to the Gross Settlement Payment only to the extent that the Total Opt Out Funds do not cover such costs. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Troy L. Nunley: MOTION HEARING held on 8/25/2016: The Court GRANTED Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Collective Action Settlement (ECF No. #398 ) and Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees (ECF No. #399 ). A Formal Order to issue. Plaintiffs Counsel William Baird and James Maro present. Defendants Counsel Julie Totten, Jessica James and Michele Maryott present. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Krueger, M)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 403 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Peter A. Muhic re #399 Motion for Class Representative Service Awards and Award of Attorneys' Fees, #398 Motion for Final Approval of Collective Action Settlement and FLSA Settlement Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Muhic, Peter) Modified on 8/23/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 402 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/15/2016 ORDERING the FLSA Plaintiffs to file supplemental papers addressing any objections to the Settlement and attach a list of all Class Members who submitted a valid and timely Exclusion Letter by 8/22/2016. (Michel, G.)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 401 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Supplemental Final Approval Papers by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Kelly C. Jones, Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson. (Muhic, Peter)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 400 DECLARATION of Peter A. Muhic in Support of #398 Motion for Final Approval of Collective Action Settlement and FLSA Settlement Class, #399 Motion for Class Representative Service Awards and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Muhic, Peter) Modified on 8/8/2016 (Becknal, R).
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MOTION for Class Representative Service Awards and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Muhic, Peter) Modified on 8/10/2016 (Becknal, R).
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 398 MOTION for Final Approval of Collective Action Settlement and FLSA Settlement Class by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Muhic, Peter) Modified on 8/10/2016 (Becknal, R).
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/2/16 GRANTING Preliminary Approval of FLSA Associate Action settlement #394 ; Appointment of a settlement Administrator; Class Representatives; and Class Counsel for settlement purposes. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 396 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/22/2016: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Collective Action Settlement, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Final Approval Hearing (ECF No. #394 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 1/28/2016 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 JOINT STATUS REPORT by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Maryott, Michele)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 394 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL of Collective Action Settlement, Appointment of Class Counsel, Proposed Class Notice, and Final Approval Hearing by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Kelly C. Jones, Samuel Brandon Kress, Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson. Motion Hearing SET for 1/28/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Peter A. Muhic, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4) (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 12/23/2015 (Michel, G.).
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 393 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/1/2015: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report as to the current status of this case within 30 days of the Minute Order. Failure to timely file may result in the imposition of sanctions. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 392 MOTION Partial Withdrawal of Appearance by Lac Anh Le. Attorney Elster, Steven S. added. (Elster, Steven)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 391 STIPULATION and ORDER #390 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/31/14 ORDERING that Garden City Group shall serve as the class action administrator for the Senior Associate Class; Plaintiffs shall be responsible for the costs associated with the service of notice to the Senior Associate Class by the Garden City Group, except that Defendant will be responsible for Garden City Group's costs of emailing the notice to the Senior Associate Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Becknal, R)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 390 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Class Action Administrator and Notice to Senior Audit Associate Class Regarding Class Certification by Samuel Brandon Kress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Stipulation)(Baird, William)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 389 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of consent to become party plaintiff for Emily Levy and Matthew Vrable. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 5/9/2014 (Marciel, M)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of Consent for Brian Nerney and Judson Adair to become party plaintiffs by all plaintiffs (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/7/2014 (Marciel, M)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of Consent of Kelly Creeggan to become party plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/7/2014 (Marciel, M)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 386 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff of Kirk Bragdon, William Ching, Cynthia Daily, Daniel Genzer, Zachary Weisbly by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 385 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of #159 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by Joshua D. Osowski. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 3/13/2014 (Michel, G).
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 384 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of consent to become party plaintiff of Tracey K. Miyazaki by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 2/7/2014 (Marciel, M)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 383 RECUSAL ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/4/14 ORDERING All currently scheduled dates in the above-captioned cases are VACATED; The Clerk of the Court reassign these cases to another judge for all further proceedings, making appropriate adjustments in the assignments of civil cases to compensate for such reassignments; and these cases are REASSIGNED to the Honorable Troy L. Nunley, United States District Judge. (Becknal, R)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 382 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff of Jeffrey Hubbard by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 381 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to become party Plaintiff of Zain Sawal, Burke Caldwell-Fidler, Lucas Hales and Lisa Commander by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 380 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff of Pamela Brennan by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 379 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to become party plaintiff of Richard Tang by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 11/19/2013 (Marciel, M)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 378 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/6/13. Added attorney Monique Myatt Galloway for Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell, and James Stekelberg. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 376 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell, James Stekelberg for attorney Monique Myatt Galloway to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Statement Certificate of Good Standing)(Baird, William)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number CAE200056244 for $200.00 Pro Hace Vice Application for Monique Myatt Galloway from William A. Baird. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 11/1/2013 (Kastilahn, A).
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 375 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff of Ryan Juenger by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 9/30/2013. Counsel for Plaintiffs indicated the parties have reached an agreement on the language of the notice and have picked an administrator. They are still in the process of agreeing on a timeline. Defendants Counsel Norman Hile, Julia Totten, Andrea L. Brown, Michele Maryott present. Court Reporter: M. Babbitt. (Rivas, A)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY) by Courtroom Deputy A. Rivas. The parties are hereby notified that the Status Conference set for 09/23/2013 is CONTINUED TO 9/30/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Approved by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on September 17, 2013. (Rivas, A)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 372 STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Thomasch, Daniel) Modified on 9/10/2013 (Marciel, M)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 371 STATUS REPORT by Samuel Brandon Kress. (Baird, William)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 370 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of Consent for Erica Margolius Jacobson to become party plaintiff filed by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 9/10/2013 (Marciel, M)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY) by Courtroom Deputy A. Rivas re #363 . The parties are hereby notified that the Status Conference set for 09/16/2013 is CONTINUED TO 9/23/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file updated status reports not later than 14 days preceding the conference. Approved by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on September 3, 2013. (Rivas, A)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 368 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff of Bryan Dunn by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 367 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff of Sarah Gonzalez by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added Attorneys Stanley D Saltzman, Marcus J. Bradley, and Kiley Lynn Grombacher for Plaintiffs. (Compton, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/8/2013 (Kastilahn, A).
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 365 NOTICE of withdrawal of consent to become party plaintiff of Jonathan Villoslada, Justin Alexander, Amy Obbish by plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 8/8/2013 (Kastilahn, A).
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 364 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of Consent to become party plaintiff of Chrizita Calixto and Jason Guarinello by plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 7/31/2013 (Marciel, M)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 363 STIPULATION and ORDER #362 for continuance signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/10/2013. Status Conference is now RE-SCHEDULED for 9/16/2013 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) with updated Status Reports due 9/3/2013. (Marciel, M)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Plaintiffs' STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER for continuance of 7/22/2013 Conference. (Wynne, Edward) Modified on 7/9/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 361 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/27/2013 RELATING this case to case number 2:13-cv-01322 KJM AC; REASSIGNING the related case to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton for all further proceedings; VACATING any dates currently set in the related case; Directing the Clerk of Court to make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Michel, G)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 360 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 13-cv-01222, 06-cv-02376 by Yury Adamov. Attorney Kershaw, William A. added. (Kershaw, William)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 359 TRANSCRIPT of Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Discovery and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's Motion for Order re: Discovery Proceedings held on 05/29/2013, before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 7/11/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2013 filed by ECRO Jonathan Anderson, Phone number 916-930-4072 E-mail janderson@caed.uscourts.gov. (Anderson, J)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 358 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CONSENT TO SUE, without prejudice, as to Valbona Bushi by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, James Stekelberg. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 6/20/2013 (Michel, G).
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY) by Courtroom Deputy A. Rivas re #353 . The parties are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference is set for 7/22/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. The parties are instructed to file updated status reports 14 days preceding the status conference. Ordered by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on June 14, 2013. (Rivas, A)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 356 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re 352 Discovery Law & Motion hearing before Judge Allison Claire on 5/29/2013 by attorney Julie Totten. (Waggoner, D)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/3/2013 ORDERING that Plaintiff's #308 , #342 motion to compel additional 30(b)(6) deposition testimony is GRANTED IN PART. Defendant shall produce one or more 30(b)(6) witnesses for an additional five hours of deposition testimony. (Zignago, K.)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/30/13 ORDERING that Defendant's MOTION to Compel sufficient responses to Discovery Requests #343 , #307 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/30/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to STAY #324 , #351 is DENIED; and The undersigned hereby reports to the District Judge the opinion that a case Management Conference would be of use in this action. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire: MOTION HEARING held on 5/29/2013 re #342 Notice - Other filed by Ricardo Ochoa, Dana Blindbury, Jeffrey LaBerge, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon, Lauren Barry, James Stekelberg, Jason Patterson, Kelly C. Jones, Willow Markham, Samuel Brandon Kress, Lac Anh Le, #341 Notice - Other filed by Ricardo Ochoa, Dana Blindbury, Jeffrey LaBerge, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon, Lauren Barry, James Stekelberg, Jason Patterson, Kelly C. Jones, Willow Markham, Lac Anh Le, Samuel Brandon Kress, #343 Amended Motion for Order determining Discovery responses to be insufficient and Compelling sufficient responses filed by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP, #308 Ex Parte Application, filed by Ricardo Ochoa, Dana Blindbury, Jeffrey LaBerge, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon, Lauren Barry, James Stekelberg, Jason Patterson, Kelly C. Jones, Willow Markham, Lac Anh Le, Samuel Brandon Kress, #307 Motion for Order determining Discovery responses to be insufficient and Compelling sufficient responses and production of responsive documents filed by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP, #324 MOTION filed by Samuel Brandon Kress. The matters are submitted and the court will issue a written order. Plaintiffs Counsel William Baird and Edward Wynne present. Defendants Counsel Norman Hile, Julie A. Totten, Andrea L. Brown, and Daniel J. Thomasch present. Court Reporter/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Callen, V) Modified on 5/29/2013 (Callen, V).
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 351 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion to Stay Discovery by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, James Stekelberg re #341 Notice. (Baird, William) Modified on 4/16/2013 (Kaminski, H).
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 350 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion to Compel Additional 30(B)(6) Testimony by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, James Stekelberg re #342 Notice. (Baird, William) Modified on 4/16/2013 (Kaminski, H).
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 349 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #343 Amended Motion for Order determining Discovery responses to be insufficient and Compelling sufficient responses : Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Thomasch, Daniel)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 348 JOINT STATEMENT re Discovery Disagreement re PwC's #307 Motion to Compel sufficient responses to Discovery requests by defendant PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Thomasch, #2 Declaration of Michelle Maryott) (Thomasch, Daniel) Modified on 4/12/2013 (Marciel, M)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 347 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Tomasch in OPPOSITION to #346 Joint Statement regarding plaintiffs' #342 Motion To Compel additional 30(B)(6) Testimony. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Thomasch Declaration, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Declaration of David A. Prahl, #5 Exhibit A to Prahl Declaration, #6 Exhibit B) (Thomasch, Daniel) Modified on 4/12/2013 (Marciel, M)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 346 JOINT STATEMENT re #342 Motion to Compel additional 30(B)(6) Testimony filed by defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William A. Baird, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Baird, William) Modified on 4/12/2013 (Marciel, M) Modified on 4/16/2013 (Kaminski, H).
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 345 NOTICE of Ninth Circuit Order by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Thomasch, Daniel)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, James Stekelberg. (Muhic, Peter)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 343 AMENDED NOTICE of MOTION for ORDER (1) determining Discovery responses to be insufficient; and (2) Compelling sufficient responses and production of responsive documents by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Thomasch, Daniel) Modified on 2/8/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Plaintiffs' AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL ADDITIONAL 30(B)(6) TESTIMONY re 332 Minute. (Baird, William) Modified on 2/8/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Plaintiffs' AMENDED MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY re 333 Minute Order. (Baird, William) Modified on 2/8/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Defendant's NOTICE of Submission of Courtesy Copy of Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum and Reply Memorandum in Support of Petition for Permission to Appeal Order Granting Class Certification. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thomasch, Daniel) Modified on 2/5/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Plaintiffs' NOTICE of Submission of Courtesy Copy of Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Petition for Permission to Appeal Order Granting Class Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f). (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 2/5/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) By CRD V. Callen to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire re #335 Motion for Protective Order. The court is in receipt of plaintiffs' January 28, 2013 motion for protective order (ECF No. 335). By way of this motion, plaintiffs ask this court to temporarily stay the January 29, 2013 and January 31, 2013 depositions of opt-in class members noticed by defendants. Plaintiffs seek this temporary stay pending the court's ruling on plaintiffs' January 4, 2013 ex parte application to stay discovery. Good cause appearing, plaintiffs' motion for protective order is granted. The depositions scheduled for January 29, 2013 and January 31, 2013 are temporarily stayed. The hearing on March 27, 2013 is vacated. (Callen, V)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 337 NOTICE by Plaintiffs of Submission of Courtesy Copy of Opposition to Defendant's Petition for Permission to Appeal Order Granting Class Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Muhic, Peter) Modified on 1/31/2013 (Kastilahn, A).
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE of Submission of Courtesy Copy of Petition for Permission to Appeal Order Granting Class Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f) by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thomasch, Daniel)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 335 NOTICE OF HEARING re #334 Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order, by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing RESET for 3/27/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Baird, William) Modified on 1/30/2013 (Kastilahn, A).
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Defendants Discovery DISCOVERY by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Baird, William) Modified on 1/30/2013 (Kastilahn, A).
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only)By CRD to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire re #331 Order. Judge Karlton issued an order 1/28/13 referring the Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Discovery to the Magistrate Judge therefore, the Motion Hearing is now set for 2/13/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Callen, V)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 332 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only)By V. Callen CRD to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire re 315 Minute Order, SET/RESET MOTION HEARING as to 315 Minute Order. The parties failed to file a Joint 251 Stipulation regarding the Discovery Hearing currently scheduled on January 30, 2013. Therefore, the matter is continued to February 13, 2013, however, if the parties fail to file a Joint 251 Stipulation concerning the issues surrounding this discovery motion, the matter will be vacated from calendar entirely. The Joint Statement shall be filed no later than Wednesday, February 6, 2013. The Motion Hearing is set for 2/13/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Callen, V) signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/28/2013. (Callen, V)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/25/13 ORDERING Plaintiff's ex parte application to stay discovery (ECF No. #324 ) is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge assigned to this case; The parties shall attend a discovery conference before the Magistrate Judge assigned to this case, at a place and time designated by the Magistrate Judge; After the motion to stay discovery has been ruled upon and the discovery conference has been completed, the Magistrate Judge will notify this court when the parties are ready for a case management conference in this court; and Plaintiffs' ex parte application to convene a case management conference (ECF No. #324 ) in this court is DENIED without prejudice to its renewal once the Magistrate Judge has notified this court that the parties are ready for the conference. (Becknal, R)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only)By V. Callen CRD to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire re 315 Minute Order, SET/RESET MOTION HEARING as to 315 Minute Order. The parties failed to file a Joint 251 Stipulation regarding the Discovery Hearing currently scheduled on January 30, 2013. Therefore, the matter is continued to February 13, 2013, however, if the parties fail to file a Joint 251 Stipulation concerning the issues surrounding this discovery motion, the matter will be vacated from calendar entirely. The Joint Statement shall be filed no later than Wednesday, February 6, 2013. The Motion Hearing is set for 3/13/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Callen, V)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff [Meghan Costello] by Samuel Brandon Kress. (Muhic, Peter)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 328 OPPOSITION by Defendant PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP to #324 Ex Parte Application,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Thomasch, Daniel)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/10/2013 ORDERING #321 the motion to certify the class of Senior Associates is GRANTED. (Reader, L)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 324 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Samuel Brandon Kress for An Order Temporarily Staying Discovery By Defendant and Granting A Case Management Conference and Memorandum of Points and Authorities. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Chentis, Virginia)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 326 SEALED EVENT (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13, #13 Part 14, #14 Part 15) (Donati, J)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 325 SEALED EVENT (Donati, J)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 323 EXHIBIT 1 by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, James Stekelberg re #264 Reply. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29)(Muhic, Peter)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 322 DECLARATION of Peter A. Muhic in SUPPORT OF #245 Motion for Class Certification. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26)(Muhic, Peter)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, James Stekelberg in SUPPORT of #245 Motion for Class Certification. (Muhic, Peter)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 320 STIPULATION and ORDER #318 for Partial Stay signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/14/2012. This action is temporarily STAYED as to conditionally certified collective actions comprising of current and former unlicensed Associates who, during relevant time period, worked in: (a) the Disputes, Analysis and Investigations group of defendants Advisory line of service; (b) the Threat and Vulnerability Management group of defendants Advisory line of service; and (c) the Tax Projects Delivery Group of defendants Tax line of service; and as to plaintiffs state law claims and discovery associated with Rule 23 Tax Motion, pending a ruling from Court on plaintiffs Rule 23 Attest Senior Associate Motion. The conditionally certified collective action comprising of current and former unlicensed Associates, who, during relevant time period, worked in Attest division of defendants Assurance line of service shall NOT BE STAYED and discovery related shall continue. The will expire 10 business days after Court rules on plaintiffs Rule 23 Attest Senior Associate Motion, at which time parties will contact Court to schedule a hearing date with respect to discovery-related Motions (to extent they have not been resolved by parties). (Marciel, M)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/14/2012 GRANTING #269 Request to Seal Document(s). Within 7 court days of date of Order: 1. plaintiffs shall file in the public file for case, in full and un-redacted, the following documents, for which no Request to Seal was timely filed: (a) plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of #245 Motion for Class Certification pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 23(a) and (b)(3), lodged under seal on 11/1/2011; (b) the Declaration of Peter A. Muhic in support of #245 Motion for Class Certification, together with Exhibits 1 - 26, lodged under seal on 11/1/2011; (c) Exhibits 1, 13, 18, 28 and 29 to Declaration of Peter A. Muhic in support of Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of #245 Motion for Class Certification, lodged under seal on 2/13/2012; 2. Plaintiffs shall file UNDER SEAL: Exhibits 3, 4, 17 and 27 to Declaration of Peter A. Muhic in support of Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of #245 Motion for Class Certification, lodged under seal on 2/13/2012. 3. Defendant shall file UNDER SEAL: Exhibits S1 to S14 to Declaration of Michele L. Maryott in support of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLPs Opposition to #245 Motion for Class Certification, lodged under seal on 1/13/2012. (Marciel, M)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 318 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for partial stay pending ruling on #245 Motion for Class Certification by plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 12/14/2012 (Marciel, M)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 317 NOTICE of New Authority by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP re #257 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thomasch, Daniel)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 316 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to become party plaintiff for John VanGavree filed by plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 11/30/2012 (Marciel, M)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MINUTE ORDER: re #307 Motion for Discovery, #313 Stipulation and Order, Set/Reset Motion Hearing. Due to the reassignment of this case to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire, the hearing currently scheduled before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on Thursday, December 6, 2012 is hereby continued to Wednesday, January 30, 2013 @ 10:00 a.m. (Callen, V)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge *Allison Claire* to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is reassigned from *Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows* for all further proceedings. (Waggoner, D) (Waggoner, D).
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 313 STIPULATION and ORDER #312 signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/30/12 ORDERING that the hearing on the motion for discovery #307 is RESET for 12/6/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Kastilahn, A)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 312 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER continuing Hearing date on #307 #308 Discovery Motions by plaintiffs. (Baird, William) Modified on 10/26/2012 (Marciel, M)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/23/2012 ORDERING #306 Plaintiffs' Rule 23 Tax Motion filing deadline of 10/26/2012 is VACATED #245 , as well as PwC's opposition brief deadline of 12/21/2012, and Plaintiffs' reply brief deadline of 2/8/2013; Upon resolution of the 30(b)(6) deposition dispute referenced in Plaintiff's ex parte motion, and Defendant's response thereto, the parties shall immediately negotiate and submit a certification schedule for Plaintiff's Rule 23 tax motion. If the parties cannot agree on a schedule, they shall so notify the court. (Reader, L)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 310 RESPONSE by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP to #306 Ex Parte Application. (Thomasch, Daniel) Modified on 10/15/2012 (Meuleman, A).
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/12/12 re #308 Ex Parte Application ORDERING a joint statement addressing the matters raised in plaintiffs' ex parte application to set additional dates for 30(b)(6) deposition, shall be filed by October 25, 2012. This matter will be heard on 11/1/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Matson, R)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MOTION by Plaintiffs to Set Additional Dates For 30(B)(6) Deposition. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William A. Baird, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Baird, William) Modified on 10/15/2012 (Zignago, K.).
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MOTION for ORDER determining Discovery responses to be insufficient; and Compelling sufficient responses and production of responsive documents by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Prahl, David) Modified on 4/12/2013 (Marciel, M)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 306 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Plaintiffs to Reset Deadlines For Plaintiffs Rule 23 Motion For Class Certification Regarding Defendants Tax Line Of Service Until Defendants 30(B)(6) Deposition Can Be Completed. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William A. Baird, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Baird, William) Modified on 10/15/2012 (Zignago, K.).
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 305 STIPULATION and ORDER #275 signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/3/12 ORDERING Plaintiff Antoine Powells individual claims in the above action shall be, and hereby are, dismissed in their entirety; Antoine Powell shall not be advanced as a class representative in this action; The July 20, 2009 Powell Declaration and the October 31, 2011 Powell Declaration are hereby withdrawn; Nothing in this stipulation shall preclude Antoine Powell from asserting that he is entitled to become a member of any certified class of Senior Associates in PwC's Assurance line of service in California in this action; Nothing in this stipulation shall preclude PwC from arguing that Antoine Powell refused to participate in the litigation and, as such, should be barred from becoming a member of any such certified class; and Plaintiffs and Defendant agree that each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs.(Matson, R)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Plaintiffs' NOTICE of New Authority Re Ellis v. Costco Wholesale Corp. in Support of Motion for Class Certification #245 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Muhic, Peter) Modified on 10/4/2012 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/25/12 GRANTING IN PART #292 MOTION FOR LEAVE to Take Additional Depositions filed by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. PwC is permitted to take 25 opt-in class member or other person depositions, related to the class decertification issues. The logistics for such depositions was not at issue in the motion. The parties shall use their best efforts to minimize the expense of these ordered depositions. (Meuleman, A)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 302 STIPULATION and ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/13/12 ORDERING that in order for the parties to explore the legal and factual issues of this case, PwC shall, at a mutually agreed-upon time, produce the Tax Work Paper Files identified by client name in the attached Exhibit A, as well as any budgets and/or engagement letters contained therein, in their native formats or their equivalents; In order to adequately protect from disclosure any confidential tax information of PwC's clients, the CDs, DVDs and other files containing the Tax Work Paper Files identified by client name in the attached Exhibit A and any engagement letters and budgets contained therein produced by PwC as specified in item 1, above, shall all be marked by PwC and treated by the parties as "Highly Confidential" pursuant to the terms of the Protective Order governing this action; Nothing in this Stipulation shall preclude PwC from producing, or Plaintiffs from requesting, additional discoverable documents in this litigation, subject to any legal limitations including, but not limited to, the statutory provisions specified above. (Becknal, R)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 301 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Regarding Production of Documents by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Totten, Julie)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 300 TRANSCRIPT of Defendant's Motion for Discovery Proceedings held on 08/16/2012, before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 9/28/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/6/2012 filed by ECRO Jonathan Anderson, Phone number 916-930-4072 E-mail janderson@caed.uscourts.gov. (Anderson, J)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows: MOTION HEARING held on 8/16/2012 re #296 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion for Leave to Take Additional Depositions filed by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. The matter is under submission and the court will issue a written order. Plaintiffs Counsel Peter Muhic and Steven Elster present. Defendants Counsel David Prahl, Julie A. Totten,Norman C. Hile and Daniel J. Thomasch present. Court Reporter/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Callen, V)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 JOINT STATEMENT Re Discovery Disagreement by Defendant PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP re #292 Motion for leave to Take Additional Depositions. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel J. Thomasch, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Declaration of Virginia A. Chentis-Stevens)(Thomasch, Daniel) Modified on 8/10/2012 (Reader, L).
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 297 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/30/12 ORDERING as follows: Plaintiffs' Rule 23 Tax Motion shall be due on or before 10/26/12, PwC's opposition brief shall be due on or before 12/21/12, and Plaintiffs' reply brief shall be due on or before 2/8/13. Within 14 days of the filing of Plaintiffs' Rule 23 Tax Motion, the parties will meet and confer and propose a hearing date for approximately one month after the reply date; The page limits applicable to the parties' briefs on Plaintiffs' Rule 23 Tax Motion shall be extended such that the parties' opening and opposition briefs shall be no more than 50 pages in length, and Plaintiffs' reply brief shall be no more than 25 pages in length. (Becknal, R)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 296 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION #292 for Leave to Take Additional Depositions by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Totten, Julie) Modified on 8/10/2012 (Reader, L).
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 295 NOTICE of New Authority Re Harris v. Superior Court in Support Of Plaintiffs' #245 Motion for Class Certification. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baird, William) Modified on 7/25/2012 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 294 PRO HAC VICE ORDER #291 signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/25/12 granting admission for Virginia A. Chentis, PHV for all plaintiffs. (Matson, R)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 293 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER re Class Certification Motion by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell, James Stekelberg. (Baird, William)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MOTION FOR LEAVE to Take Additional Depositions by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Totten, Julie) Modified on 8/10/2012 (Reader, L).
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number CAE200046041 for $200.00 for Virginia Agnes Chentis from Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP. (Michel, G)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 291 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Plaintiffs for attorney Virginia Agnes Chentis to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Baird, William) Modified on 7/18/2012 (Becknal, R).
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 290 TRANSCRIPT of Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Proceedings held on 05/23/2012, before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 7/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2012 filed by ECRO Jonathan Anderson, Phone number 916-930-4072 E-mail janderson@caed.uscourts.gov. (Anderson, J)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 289 NOTICE that the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeal has Granted Review of a District Court Opinion Relied Upon by Defendant in Support of its Opposition to #245 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by All Plaintiffs re #276 Notice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baird, William) Modified on 6/15/2012 (Meuleman, A). Modified on 6/15/2012 (Meuleman, A).
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/4/12 ORDERING that PwC's motion for protective order, filed May 16, 2012 in the form of a joint statement, (dkt. #282), is denied in part and granted in part. PwC shall produce documents as ordered herein, within 21 days of this order. Plaintiffs may proceed with subpoenas on third parties which are tailored as provided in this order. Nothing in this protective order precludes a subpoenaed company from making burden or other objections in its district where subpoenaed. (Kastilahn, A)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #288 Order served on Michelle A. Coccagna PHV. (Kastilahn, A)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows: MOTION HEARING held on 5/23/2012 re #279 Order, Set/Reset Motion Hearing. The Motion for Protective Order is taken under submission and the court will issue a written order. Plaintiffs Counsel Steven Elster, Peter Muhic and William Baird present. Defendants Counsel David Prahl, Julie Totten, Norman Hile and Daniel Toasch present. Court Reporter/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Callen, V)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 286 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE of Defendant's Authority Being Superseded by Grant of Review, by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, James Stekelberg re #271 Notice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Muhic, Peter) Modified on 5/24/2012 (Kastilahn, A).
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 285 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Thomasch re #282 Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Thomasch, Daniel)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by Samuel Brandon Kress, Lac Anh Le: Exhibits B and C to the Declaration of Peter A. Muhic. (Muhic, Peter)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 283 DECLARATION of Peter A. Muhic re #282 Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F)(Muhic, Peter)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 282 STATEMENT of Joint Statement Re Discovery Disagreement Related To Plaintiffs' Rule 45 Non-Party Subpoenas by Plaintiffs Samuel Brandon Kress, Lac Anh Le. (Muhic, Peter)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 281 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 27, 2012, before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton, filed by Court Reporter Diane Shepard, Phone number 916-554-7460 E-mail diane.shepard@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 5/24/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2012. (Shepard, D)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: MOTION HEARING held on 4/27/2012 #245 Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs. After oral argument, the Motion STANDS SUBMITTED. The Court will issue a written order. Plaintiffs Counsel William Baird and Steven Elster present. Defendants Counsel Daniel Thomasch, Norman Hile, David Prahl, Julian Poon and Alex Mircheff present. Court Reporter: Diane Shepard. (Krueger, M)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/19/2012 SETTING a Motion Hearing as to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order for 5/23/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows, Defendant's portion of the Joint Statement to be submitted to the Plaintiff by 5/8/2012, Plaintiffs to file the Joint Statement by 5/16/2012; STAYING the seven subpoenas issued to PWCs clients as set forth, including depositions and document production, as well as any other PWC client depositions, et al., until further order of this court. (Michel, G)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #279 Order served on Michelle A. Coccagna PHV. (Michel, G)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 278 RESPONSE by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP to #277 Request to Strike. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Thomasch, Daniel)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 REQUEST TO STRIKE improper filings, or in the alternative, request to file written response by Samuel Brandon Kress. (Baird, William) Modified on 4/11/2012 (Benson, A.).
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE of New Authority by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP re #257 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Thomasch, Daniel)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 275 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Antoine Powell's Claims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and Withdrawal of Declarations by Antoine Powell. (Muhic, Peter)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/15/2012: Due to a conflict with calendaring, the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification #245 set for April 13, 2012 is VACATED and RESET for April 27, 2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Krueger, M)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/12/2012: On the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification #245 set for March 26, 2012 is VACATED and RESET for April 13, 2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 272 RESPONSE by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP to #266 Objections. (Prahl, David)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE of New Authority in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Prahl, David)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 270 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE for #269 Request to seal evidence by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Totten, Julie) Modified on 3/7/2012 (Marciel, M).
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE of REQUEST to seal evidence submitted in support of plaintiff's #245 Motion for Class Certification pursuant to L.R. 141 by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Totten, Julie) Modified on 3/7/2012 (Marciel, M).
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 268 STIPULATION of Withdrawal of Declaration of Melissa Tucker by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Hile, Norman)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 267 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Samuel Brandon Kress re #265 Notice of Filing / Lodging Document in Paper. (Muhic, Peter)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 266 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Samuel Brandon Kress to #258 Declaration. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 2/14/2012 (Kaminski, H).
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER UNDER SEAL by Samuel Brandon Kress: Exhibits 1, 3, 4, 13, 17, 18, 27-29 to Declaration of Peter A. Muhic in Support of Reply Memo re Motion for Class Certification. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 2/14/2012 (Kaminski, H). [Document's Listed rcv'd on 2/15/2012] (Reader, L).
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 264 REPLY by Samuel Brandon Kress re #257 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter A. Muhic, #2 Exhibit 2, 5-12, 14-16, #3 Exhibit 19-26)(Muhic, Peter)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 263 TRANSCRIPT of Defendant's Motion to Compel Proceedings held on 10/27/11, before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 2/27/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2012 filed by ECRO Jonathan Anderson, Phone number 916-930-4072 E-mail janderson@caed.uscourts.gov. (Anderson, J)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 262 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/20/12. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 261 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Class Certification Motion by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Totten, Julie)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 260 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP re #259 Declaration, #257 Opposition to Motion, #258 Declaration,,,. (Thomasch, Daniel)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 DECLARATION of Janet Scott re #257 Opposition to Motion,. (Thomasch, Daniel)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 DECLARATION of Julian W. Poon re #257 Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37 (part 1), #38 Exhibit 37 (part 1), #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44)(Thomasch, Daniel)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 257 OPPOSITION by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP to #245 Motion for Class Certification. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Request to Seal, #2 Notice of Lodging Documents Under Seal)(Thomasch, Daniel)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/10/12 GRANTING #253 Ex Parte Application to extend the page limit. The page limit for defendant's opposition to plaintiff's #245 Motion for Class Certification is EXTENDED to 50 pages. The page limit for plaintiffs' reply brief is EXTENDED to 25 pages. (Donati, J)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 255 RESPONSE to #253 Ex Parte Application, #254 Declaration by Lauren Barry, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell, James Stekelberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter A. Muhic) (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 12/23/2011 (Michel, G).
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 254 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Thomasch re #253 Ex Parte Application. (Thomasch, Daniel)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 253 EX PARTE APPLICATION for an Order Extending the Page Limit for its Opposition to #245 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Thomasch, Daniel) Modified on 12/22/2011 (Michel, G).
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY) by CRD re #251 Ex Parte Application. Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, ECF No. #245 SHALL be filed no later than January 13, 2012. Plaintiffs' reply SHALL be filed no later than February 13, 2012. A hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification is SET for March 26, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. Ordered by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on December 9, 2011. (Rivas, A)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 251 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Class Certification Briefing Schedule by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Julie A. Totten)(Hile, Norman)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 RESPONSE by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP to #249 Notice regarding Scheduling of Oral Argument. (Thomasch, Daniel) Modified on 11/28/2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Scheduling of Oral Argument by Dana Blindbury, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell, James Stekelberg re #245 Motion for Class Certification. (Muhic, Peter)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Alexander Kosta Mircheff on behalf of PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. Attorney Mircheff, Alexander Kosta added. (Mircheff, Alexander)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Julian Wing-Kai Poon on behalf of PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. Attorney Poon, Julian Wing-Kai added. (Poon, Julian)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michele Leigh Maryott on behalf of PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. Attorney Maryott, Michele Leigh added. (Maryott, Michele)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION for CLASS CERTIFICATION pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(a) and (b)(3). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Edward J. Wynne, #3 Declaration of Jeffrey K. Compton, #4 Appendix of Authorities, #5 Notice of Lodging Under Seal Memorandum of Pts. & Authorities and Decl. of Peter A. Muhic and Exhibits 1-26 in Support of Motion (sealed docs routed to chamber for review 11/03/11), #6 Certificate of Service) (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 11/3/2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L). Modified on 11/3/2011 (Benson, A.)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/1/2011 GRANTING #237 Motion to Compel further deposition testimony. Plaintiffs Kenny and Kress shall appear for further deposition on 11/8/2011 and 11/10/2011 respectively, for 5 more hours of deposition per deponent. Deposition questions shall be limited to the position of Senior Associate. (Michel, G)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows: MOTION HEARING held on 10/27/2011 re #240 MOTION for DISCOVERY (Joint Statement re Discovery Disagreement re Additional Deposition Testimony) MOTION for DISCOVERY (Joint Statement re Discovery Disagreement re Additional Deposition Testimony) filed by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. The Court grants the defendants five additional hours to take the depositions and will follow this decision up with a written order. Plaintiffs Counsel Edward Wynne present. Defendants Counsel Norman Hile, David Prahl and Julie Totten present. Court Reporter/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Callen, V)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 242 DECLARATION of Edward Wynne in OPPOSITION TO #237 Motion to Compel further deposition testimony from names plaintiffs. (Hile, Norman)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 241 DECLARATION of David A. Prahl in SUPPORT OF #237 Motion to Compel further deposition testimony from names plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hile, Norman)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MOTION for DISCOVERY; JOINT STATEMENT re Discovery Disagreement re Additional Deposition Testimony by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. Motion Hearing SET for 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hile, Norman) Modified on 10/21/2011 (Michel, G).
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 STIPULATION and ORDER #238 for continuance signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/17/2011. Plaintiff's #237 Motion to Compel Hearing is RE-SET for 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH). (Marciel, M)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 238 JOINT STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to continue hearing date on defendant's #237 Motion to Compel further deposition testimony by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Hile, Norman) Modified on 10/18/2011 (Marciel, M).
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MOTION to COMPEL further deposition testimony from named plaintiffs by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Hile, Norman) Modified on 10/18/2011 (Marciel, M).
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 236 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 09/19/11 GRANTING #228 Pro Hac Vice Application for attorney Lauren J. Elliot, PHV for PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Benson, A.)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 235 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 09/19/11 GRANTING #227 Pro Hac Vice Order for Daniel J. Thomasch, PHV fordft PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate)(Benson, A.)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 234 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 09/19/11 GRANTING #231 Pro Hac Vice Application for attorney Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV for plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate)(Benson, A.)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 233 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 09/19/11 GRANTING #232 Pro Hac Vice Application for attorney James Maro, PHV for plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate)(Benson, A.)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200038615 $180.00 fbo Michelle a. Coccagna by Kessler Topaz Meltzer Check on 9/15/2011 re #231 . (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200038614 $180.00 fbo James A. Maro by Kessler Topaz Meltzer Check on 9/15/2011 re #232 . (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 232 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by plfs for attorney James A. Maro to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Baird, William)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 231 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by plfs for attorney Michelle A. Coccagna to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Baird, William)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200038453 $180.00 fbo Lauren J. Elliot by Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP on 9/9/2011. (Michel, G)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200038452 $180.00 fbo Daniel J. Thomasch by Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP on 9/9/2011. (Michel, G)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 230 STATEMENT of Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re Pretrial and Trial Scheduling Proposal by Defendant PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Hile, Norman)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 STATEMENT of Plaintiffs Re Proposed Pretrial and Trial Schedule by Plaintiff James Stekelberg. (Wynne, Edward)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP for attorney Lauren J. Elliot to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Hile, Norman)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP for attorney Daniel J. Thomasch to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Hile, Norman)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 226 TRANSCRIPT of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Proceedings held on 07/21/11, before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 9/22/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/3/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2011 filed by ECRO Jonathan Anderson, Phone number 916-930-4072 E-mail janderson@caed.uscourts.gov. (Anderson, J)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/8/2011 ORDERING that Plaintiff's #219 motion to compel further response to interrogatory number 1, filed June 29, 2011, is GRANTED in part, subject to the limitations set forth in this order. Defendant shall produce all discovery as ordered herein within twenty-eight days of this order. (Duong, D)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 224 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on Nov. 23rd. 2009, before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton, filed by Court Reporter Cathie Bodene, Phone number 916-446-6360 E-mail cbodene@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter Cathie Bodene or PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 8/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2011. (Bodene, C)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 223 STIPULATION and ORDER RE Class Certification Motions and Trial Schedule signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/21/11. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows: MOTION HEARING held on 7/21/2011 re #219 Motion to Compel filed by Ricardo Ochoa, Dana Blindbury, Jeffrey LaBerge, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon, Lauren Barry, James Stekelberg, Jason Patterson, Kelly C. Jones, Antoine Powell, Willow Markham, Samuel Brandon Kress, Lac Anh Le. The Motion is submitted and the court will issue an order. Plaintiffs Counsel William Baird present. Defendants Counsel Norman Hile and Julie Totten present. Court Reporter/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Callen, V)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Re Class Certification Motions and Trial Schedule by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell. (Muhic, Peter)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 220 JOINT STATEMENT Re DISCOVERY DISAGREEMENT by Plaintiff Samuel Brandon Kress. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter A. Muhic in Support of plfs' #219 Motion to Compel #2 Declaration of David A. Prahl)(Baird, William) Modified on 7/15/2011 (Benson, A.).
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MOTION to COMPEL A Further Response to Interrogatory No. 1 from Plaintiff Jones's Interrogatories, Set One by plfs. Motion Hearing set for 07/21/11 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Muhic, Peter)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell, James Stekelberg. (Muhic, Peter)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 WITHDRAWAL of #199 MOTION to COMPEL by Dana Blindbury, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell, James Stekelberg. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/11/2011 (Benson, A.).
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 216 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/4/11 re: Class Certification Motions and Trial Schedule. (Donati, J)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 215 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Class Certification Motions and Trial Schedule by plaintiffs and defendants. (Baird, William) Modified on 4/1/2011 (Marciel, M).
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS/COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP by plaintiffs.(Baird, William) Modified on 3/24/2011 (Duong, D).
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/10/11 ORDERING the #199 Motion to Compel Hearing is RESET for 4/21/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows.(Donati, J)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for [Amended] Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing Date on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Response to Interrogatory No. 1 From Plaintiff Jones's Interrogatories, Set One re #211 Stipulation and Proposed Order by Samuel Brandon Kress. (Muhic, Peter)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re #200 Order by Samuel Brandon Kress. (Muhic, Peter)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STANDING 251 STIPULATED ORDER signed by Judge Gregory G. Hollows.(Matson, R)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION to COMPEL a Further Response to Interrogatory No. 1 From Plainitff Jones's Interrogatories, Set One, Pursuant to Local rule 251(D) by Samuel Brandon Kress. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Muhic, Peter)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS/COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL NAMED PLAINTIFFS AND PROPOSED CLASS REPRESENTATIVES signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/15/11. Defendant's Answer to Plaintiffss Consolidated Class/Collective Action Complaint in this action, filed on 10/06/08 #32 shall serve as Defendant's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class/Collective Action Complaint.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Plaintiffs to File Second Amended Consolidated Class/Collective Action Complaint to Add Additional Names Plaintiffs and Proposed Class Representatives by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell, James Stekelberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baird, William)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION and ORDER Re Class Certification Motions and Trial Schedule #195 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/19/11. (Matson, R)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re Class Certification Motions and Trial Schedule by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Totten, Julie) Modified on 1/12/2011 (Reader, L).
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell, James Stekelberg. (Muhic, Peter)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff of Jason Alves by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION and ORDER Re Class Certification Motions and Trial Schedule #183 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/27/2010. (Matson, R)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 SEALED EVENT (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4) (Waggoner, D)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 209 SEALED EVENT (Waggoner, D)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 208 SEALED EVENT (Waggoner, D)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 207 SEALED EVENT (Waggoner, D)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 206 SEALED EVENT (Waggoner, D)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 205 SEALED EVENT (Waggoner, D)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 SEALED EVENT (Waggoner, D)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 203 SEALED EVENT (Waggoner, D)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 SEALED EVENT (Waggoner, D)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 SEALED EVENT (Waggoner, D)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/23/10 ORDERING that Defendant's MOTION TO SEAL certain documents filed in support of its opposition to the motion for certification #75 is GRANTED. Defendant's MOTION TO SEAL certain documents filed by Plaintiff in her reply brief #88 is TENTATIVELY GRANTED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Class Certification Motions and Trial Schedule by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Totten, Julie)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell, James Stekelberg. (Muhic, Peter)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 STIPULATION and ORDER #170 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/29/2010 ORDERING Opt-in Plaintiff Rivera's individual claims in the above action be, and hereby are, dismissed in their entirety without prejudice; and Opt-in Plaintiff Rivera's Consent is hereby withdrawn; This Stipulation and Order will not affect Opt-in Plaintiff Rivera's status as an absent class member in connection with her claims under California's wage and hour laws; Opt-in Plaintiff Rivera and Defendant further stipulate and agree that each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs.(Matson, R)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION and ORDER #171 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/29/2010 ORDERING Opt-in Plaintiff Xu's individual claims in the above action be, and hereby are, dismissed in their entirety without prejudice; and Opt-in Plaintiff Xu's Consent is hereby withdrawn; This Stipulation and Order will not affect Opt-in Plaintiff Xu's status as an absent class member in connection with his claims under California's wage and hour laws; Opt-In Plaintiff Xu and Defendant further stipulate and agree that each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs.(Matson, R) (Main Document 172 replaced on 7/29/2010) (Matson, R). Modified on 7/29/2010 (Matson, R).
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL and [Proposed] Order of Opt-In plf Frank Xiao Xu's Claims by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell, James Stekelberg. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 7/29/2010 (Benson, A.).
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL and [Proposed] Order of Opt-In plf Marie Tere Rivera's Claims by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell, James Stekelberg. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 7/29/2010 (Benson, A.).
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION and ORDER #165 re Class Certification Motion and Trial schedule signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/21/2010. Motion for Class Certification under FRCP 23 shall be filed between 9/1/2010 and 11/1/2010. Opposition shall be filed 45 days from filing date and plaintiff's Reply shall be filed 30 days thereafter. All other dated in Court's 4/22/2009 Modified Scheduling Order shall remain the same. (Marciel, M)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/21/2010 APPROVING parties' #149 Notice to Stipulated Tax Advisory Groups and Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff forms. (Marciel, M)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Class Certification Motions and Trial Schedule by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Totten, Julie)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 PROPOSED ORDER re Jointly proposed Notice and Consent to Become Party Plaintiff forms re #149 Notice - Other by Lauren Barry, Dana Blindbury, Samuel Brandon, Kelly C. Jones, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Lac Anh Le, Willow Markham, Ricardo Ochoa, Jason Patterson, Antoine Powell, James Stekelberg. (Muhic, Peter)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by All Plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE of jointly agreed upon form of Class Notice and Consent to become a party plaintiff. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 6/18/2010 (Marciel, M).
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Consent to become party plaintiff. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 6/18/2010 (Marciel, M).
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Consent to become party plaintiff. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 6/15/2010 (Marciel, M).
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Consent to become party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 6/14/2010 (Marciel, M).
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION and ORDER re CONDITIONAL COLLECTIVE CERTIFICATION signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/2/10. (Kaminski, H)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Conditional Collective Certification by Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, Lauren Barry, James Stekelberg, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Ricardo Ochoa, Antoine Powell, PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham. (Baird, William)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: STATUS CONFERENCE re #135 STIPULATION held on 5/27/2010. After discussing the Court's concerns re the stipulation, the parties will submit an amended stipulation. Plaintiffs Counsel Peter Muhic, Tony Baird present. Defendants Counsel Julie Totten, David Prahl present. (Rivas, A)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Re Conditional Collective Certification by Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, Lauren Barry, James Stekelberg, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Ricardo Ochoa, Antoine Powell, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham. (Muhic, Peter)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 05/06/10 ORDERING Plaintiffs' second Motion for Conditional Certification filed by 05/28/10; PWC's opposition due within 45 days; Plaintiffs' reply brief due within 30 days thereafter. All other dates set forth in the 04/22/09 order shall remain in effect. (Williams, D)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Second Motion for Conditional Certification by Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, Lauren Barry, James Stekelberg, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Ricardo Ochoa, Antoine Powell, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham. Attorney Wynne, Edward Joseph added. (Wynne, Edward)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 AMENDED Notice of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff #114 by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 5/6/2010 (Reader, L).
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/26/2010 (Reader, L).
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/26/2010 (Reader, L).
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/22/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/22/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/22/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/22/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/21/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/21/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/21/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/20/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/20/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/20/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter) Modified on 4/20/2010 (Marciel, M).
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Consent Filing by all plaintiffs. (Muhic, Peter)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/14/2010 ORDERING the court APPROVES the parties' notice to the class and consent to become a party plaintiff forms, Document #94 . (Reader, L)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE Jointly Agreed Upon Form of Class Notice and Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by all plaintiffs re #92 Order on Motion to Certify Class,,,. (Muhic, Peter)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by Lac Anh Le. (Wynne, Edward)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/25/09 ORDERING pltfs ' #57 Motion for Conditional Certification is GRANTED; The court conditionally certifies a collective action under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) consisting of persons who are or were employed by dft PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as an Associate in the Attest Division of the Assurance line of business anywhere in the United States at any time from 12/11/05 to the present and who were not licensed as a Certified Public Accountant (collectively, Attest Associates), for purposes of FLSA claims brought by these pltfs; the parties are GRANTED 45 days from the date of this order to submit a joint proposal for notice to the class, or separate statements as to why no such joint proposal could be reached.. (Carlos, K)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by Lac Anh Le. (Plutzik, Alan) Modified on 12/4/2009 (Engbretson, K.).
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: MOTION HEARING held on 11/23/2009 re #52 MOTION for COLLECTIVE CERTIFICATION filed by Ricardo Ochoa, Dana Blindbury, Jeffrey LaBerge, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon, Lauren Barry, James Stekelberg, Jason Patterson, Kelly C. Jones, Antoine Powell, Willow Markham, Samuel Brandon Kress, Lac Anh Le. MATTER SUBMITTED. Court order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Peter Muhic, Edward Wynne, Steven Elster present. Defendants Counsel Norman Hile, Julie Totten, David Prahl present. Court Reporter/CD Number: C. Bodene. (Narcisse, M)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 DECLARATION of Janet Scott in Support of #88 MOTION to SEAL Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff Lac Anh Le's Motion for Conditional Collective Certification and Facilitated Notice. (Hile, Norman)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to SEAL Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff Lac Anh Le's Motion for Conditional Collective Certification and Facilitated Notice by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Norman C. Hile, #3 Declaration of Janet Scott, #4 Proposed Order)(Hile, Norman)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/26/09 ORDERING that Plaintiffs have filed a motion for collective certification in this Fair Labor Standards Act action. The court set a special briefing schedule for this motion. #53 . Briefing on the matter is now completed. The court hereby SETS hearing on this motion for 11/23/09 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 4.(Becknal, R)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Antoine Powell, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham re #82 Notice of Filing / Lodging Document in Paper,. (Wells, Gerald)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 RESPONSE by Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Antoine Powell, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham to #74 Notice of Filing / Lodging Document in Paper,. (Wells, Gerald)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Antoine Powell, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham. (Wells, Gerald)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 APPENDIX by Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Antoine Powell, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham re #82 Notice of Filing / Lodging Document in Paper, filed by Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon, Jason Patterson, Kelly C. Jones, Willow Markham, Antoine Powell, Samuel Brandon Kress, Lac Anh Le. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-19, #3 Exhibit 20-23)(Wells, Gerald)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE OF FILING / LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Antoine Powell, Samuel Brandon Kress, Willow Markham: Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Collective Certification & Facilitated Notice and Declaration of Gerald D. Wells, III and Exhibits Thereto In Further Support Thereof Lodged. (Wells, Gerald)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE Regarding Scheduling of Oral Argument by all plaintiffs. (Wells, Gerald)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ERRATA re: OPPOSITION to Plaintiff Lac Anh Le's MOTION for Conditional Collective Certification and facilitated notice by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Hile, Norman)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 APPENDIX of Unpublished and supplemental authorities in support of its opposition by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 2)(Hile, Norman) Modified on 9/15/2009 (Reader, L).
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Hile, Norman)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP in re #76 Declaration. (Hile, Norman)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 DECLARATION of David A. Prahl in Opposition to #57 plf's Motion for Conditional Collective Certification. (Hile, Norman)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION to SEAL PwC's Opposition to Lac Anh Le's Motion for Conditional Collective Certification and Facilitated Notice by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Hile, Norman)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE OF FILING / LODGING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP: Notice of Lodging with court pursuant to Local Rule. (Documents received 9/3/09 and routed to chambers) (Hile, Norman) Modified on 9/4/2009 (Benson, A.). Modified on 9/4/2009 (Engbretson, K.).
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/24/09 re #71 . Added attorney Peter A. Muhic, PHV for plts.(Duong, D)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Samuel Brandon Kress for attorney Peter A. Muhic to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Plutzik, Alan)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number CAE200019398 for $180.00 for Peter A. Muhic to Appear Pro Hac Vice from Robert M. Bramson. (Reader, L)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PRO HAC VICE ORDER as to Atty David M. Fine, signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/18/09. Added attorney David M. Fine, PHV for dft PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Kastilahn, A)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/17/09: Added attorney William Anthony Baird for James Stekelberg, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge and Willow Markham, attorney Wayne Scott Kreger terminated. (Engbretson, K.)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200019232 $180.00 fbo David Fine by David Fine on 8/17/2009. (Streeter, J)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by James Stekelberg. (Baird, William)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP for attorney David M. Fine to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Totten, Julie)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PROPOSED ORDER re #61 MOTION to SEAL. (Hile, Norman) Modified on 8/12/2009 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DECLARATION of Janet Scott in Support of #61 MOTION to SEAL. (Hile, Norman) Modified on 8/12/2009 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DECLARATION of Norman C. Hile in Support of #61 MOTION to SEAL. (Hile, Norman) Modified on 8/12/2009 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP in SUPPORT of #61 MOTION to SEAL (Hile, Norman) Modified on 8/12/2009 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to SEAL Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Collective Certification and Declaration of Gerald D. Wells, III by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. Attorney Hile, Norman C added. (Hile, Norman) Modified on 8/12/2009 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re #57 MOTION by plaintiffs. (Wells- PRO HAC VICE, Gerald) Modified on 7/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PROPOSED ORDER by plaintiffs re #57 MOTION. (Wells- PRO HAC VICE, Gerald) Modified on 7/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE OF Lodging Documents Under Seal by Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, James Stekelberg, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Antoine Powell, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham. Attorney Wells- PRO HAC VICE, Gerald D added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wells- PRO HAC VICE, Gerald) Modified on 7/21/2009 (Streeter, J). [DOCUMENTS RECEIVED AND ROUTED TO VOULT and copy to LKK] Modified on 7/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Conditional Collective Certification and Facilitated Notice by plaintiffs. Attorney Wells PRO HAC VICE, Gerald D added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wells- PRO HAC VICE, Gerald) Modified on 7/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY and PROPOSED ORDER, submitted by Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, Lauren Barry, James Stekelberg, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Ricardo Ochoa, Antoine Powell, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baird, William) Modified on 7/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by all plaintiffs. (Baird, William)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Conditional Certification and Facilitated Notice by Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, Lauren Barry, James Stekelberg, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Ricardo Ochoa, Antoine Powell, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham re #52 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS. (Baird, William)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/22/09 ORDERING that Non-Expert disclosures shall be completed by 4/1/2011; Motion to Compel discovery must be noticed on the Magistrate Judge's calendar and such Motions will be heard not later than 6/1/11. All Expert Witnesses shall be disclosed by 6/1/2011; All Expert Witnesses shall be disclosed by 6/1/11. All Discovery shall be completed by 7/1/2011. Law and Motion shall be completed by 9/1/2011. The Final Pretrial Conference shall occur on 12/5/2011 at 01:30 PM. Jury Trial shall begin on 3/13/2012. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Plaintiffs' MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS Conditional Certification and Facilitated Notice. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Collective Class Certification, #2 Declaration of Gerald D. Wells, #3 Proposed Order)(Baird, William) Modified on 4/21/2009 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for re Class Certification Motions and Trial Schedule by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Totten, Julie)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Lac Anh Le. (Wells- PRO HAC VICE, Gerald)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/19/09 ORDERING that the #46 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan, filed January 12, 2009, is adopted in full. (Duong, D)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/26/09 ORDERING this Stipulation Order APPROVED and entered by the Court, and that pltfs' initial collective certification motion as to a putative class A of Associates in the Attest division of PwC's Assurance line of service in the United States shall be filed on 4/20/09. The time periods for the filing of opposition andreply briefs, and all other dates regarding the prosecution of this action, shall remain the same as set forth in the Court's 12/16/08 Status Conference Order.(Carlos, K)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time for Plaintiffs to File Collective Certification Motion by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Totten, Julie)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STATEMENT of Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by Defendant PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Totten, Julie)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants by Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, Lauren Barry, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Ricardo Ochoa, Antoine Powell, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham.(Wells- PRO HAC VICE, Gerald) Modified on 12/31/2008 (Manzer, C).
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STATUS(PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/16/08: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/1/2010. Discovery due by 7/11/2010. Dispositive Motion due by 10/11/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Jury Trial set for 5/17/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton.(Streeter, J)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 12/15/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. 30 day Jury Trial set for 5/17/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Court order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Gerald D. Wells, III, Edward J. Wynne present. Defendants Counsel Norman Hile, Julie Totten, David Prahl present. (Rivas, A)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REQUEST for to Submit Modified Schedule by Lac Anh Le. (Wynne, Edward)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STATEMENT of Joint Status Conference Statement by Defendant PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. and Plaintiffs (Totten, Julie)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by Lac Anh Le. (Wynne, Edward)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) by CRD re #36 Order. The parties are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference is now set for 12/15/2008 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Rivas, A)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Edward Joseph Wynne on behalf of Lac Anh Le. Attorney Wynne, Edward Joseph added. (Wynne, Edward)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Samuel Brandon Kress by all plaintiffs. Attorney Baird, William Anthony added. (Baird, William)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/7/08: The parties may conduct non-expert discovery until August 14, 2009. Motions to compel discovery are to be noticed to be heard as more specifically described in this order. The parties shall disclose experts, as set forth herein. Expert discovery shall close on December 18, 2009. (Kaminski, H)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Consent Filing of Lauren San Mateo by all plaintiffs. (Gray, Robert)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Lac Anh Le. (Gray, Robert) Modified on 10/21/2008 (Kaminski, H).
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Consent Filings of Jason Patterson, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Antoine Powell by all plaintiffs. Attorney Gray, Robert J. added. (Gray, Robert)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #29 COMPLAINT by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP.(Totten, Julie) Modified on 10/7/2008 (Kaminski, H).
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DISCOVERY STATEMENT and Proposed Discovery Schedule by all plaintiffs. (Plutzik, Alan) Modified on 10/6/2008 (Kaminski, H).
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DISCOVERY STATEMENT of Proposed Discovery Schedule by Defendant PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. (Totten, Julie) Modified on 10/6/2008 (Becknal, R).
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 COMPLAINT Consolidated Class/Collective Action Complaint against PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP by Lac Anh Le, Jason Patterson, Lauren Barry, James Stekelberg, Samuel Brandon, Dana Blindbury, Jesse Kenne, Kelly C. Jones, Ricardo Ochoa, Antoine Powell, Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham. Attorney Plutzik, Alan R added.(Plutzik, Alan)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/8/08 ORDERING that Plaintiffs must file a consolidated complaint in the above-entitled action no later than 9/18/08 and that the parties' joint discovery statement must be filed within 10 days of the filing of the consolidated complaint. (Becknal, R)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baird, William)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the court's consolidation order, the parties are directed to file all future pleadings, motions and other filings regarding Kress and the now-administratively closed Le case ONLY in case no. Civ. S-08-965 LKK/GGH. Approved by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/19/2008. (Hoover, S)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/18/08: The protective order governing the Campbell action shall govern the Kress and Le actions, both for present purposes and after the actions are consolidated. (Kaminski, H)
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/14/2008 CONSOLIDATING CASES, The motion #6 to consolidate Campbell and Kress/Le is DENIED; however, the clerks' office is directed to consolidate Kress and Le, 2:08cv965 LKK GGH and 2:08cv997 LKK EFB. The consolidated case shall remain related to Campbell 2:06cv2376 LKK GGH. The motion to strike #9 and/or dismiss in both Kress and Le are GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. Pursuant to the conference held before Judge Hollows on 8/11/2008, the plaintiffs in the consolidated Le/Kress action are to file an amended complaint within 21 days and the parties are to submit statements regarding a proposed discovery schedule 10 days thereafter.(Reader, L)
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order Re: Protective Order by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. Attorney Totten, Julie A. added. (Totten, Julie)
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/12/08 ORDERING that the parties to file a joint statement outlining matters addressed at the discovery plan conference w/in 10 days after the consolidated cmplt is filed and served.(Yin, K)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/11/2008. After discussion, the parties were instructed to meet with Magistrate Judge Hollows. Plaintiffs Counsel Lyle Cook, William Kershaw, Stuart Talley, William Baird, Steven Elster, Gerald Wells, III, Edward J. Wynne present. Defendants Counsel David Prahl, Julie Totten, Norman Hile, Lynne Hermle present.(Rivas, A)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton: MOTION HEARING held on 8/11/2008 re #6 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES filed by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP, #9 MOTION to STRIKE filed by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. The motion to consolidate is GRANTED. Court order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel William Baird, Steven Elster present. Defendants Counsel David Prahl, Julie Totten, Norman Hile, Lynne Hermle present. Court Reporter: C. Bodene. (Rivas, A)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER re #4 . The parties are hereby notified that the Initial Scheduling Conference is now RESET to start at 10:00 AM on 8/11/2008 in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Ordered by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on August 8, 2008. (Text Only)(Rivas, A)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP to RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to STRIKE. (Prahl, David)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP to RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES. (Prahl, David)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Samuel Brandon Kress, Jeffrey LaBerge, Willow Markham. (Baird, William)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM/RESPONSE in OPPOSITION re #6 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES. (Baird, William)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM/RESPONSE in OPPOSITION re #9 MOTION to STRIKE. (Baird, William)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Julie A. Totten in SUPPORT OF re #6 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES. (Prahl, David)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISREGARD - DUPLICATE [DECLARATION of Julie A. Totten in SUPPORT OF re #9 MOTION to STRIKE]. (Prahl, David) Modified on 7/16/2008 (Duong, D).
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER Granting #9 MOTION to STRIKE. (Prahl, David) Modified on 7/15/2008 (Duong, D).
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Julie A. Totten in SUPPORT OF re #9 MOTION to STRIKE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C, part 1 #4 Exhibit C, part 2)(Prahl, David) Modified on 7/15/2008 (Duong, D).
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to STRIKE by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Prahl, David)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER Granting #6 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES. (Prahl, David) Modified on 7/15/2008 (Duong, D).
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EXHIBITS to #13 DECLARATION of Julie A. Totten in SUPPORT OF re #6 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES (Attachments: #1 Duplicate - Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C, part 1 #4 Exhibit C, part 2 #5 Exhibit D #6 Exhibit E #7 Exhibit F #8 Exhibit G #9 Exhibit H #10 Exhibit I #11 Exhibit J #12 Exhibit K #13 Exhibit L #14 Exhibit M #15 Exhibit N #16 Exhibit O). (Prahl, David) Modified on 7/15/2008 (Duong, D). Modified on 7/16/2008 (Duong, D).
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES 06-cv-02376 LKK GGH, 2:08-cv-00997 LKK EFB and 2:08 cv-00965 LKK GGH by PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. Attorney Prahl, David A. added. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Prahl, David) Modified on 7/15/2008 (Duong, D).
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Andrea Lee Brown on behalf of PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP. Attorney Brown, Andrea Lee added. (Brown, Andrea)
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2008 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms, #2 VDRP Forms) (Duong, D)
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/8/08 ORDERING that case 2: 06cv2376 LKK GGH is related with member of case 2:08-cv-0965 JAM DAD. Case 2:08-cv-0965 JAM DAD is reassigned to Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings. Judge John A. Mendez, Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd no longer assigned to case. The Clerk to make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment.(Duong, D)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms, #2 VDRP Forms) (Manzer, C)
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Central District of California; Case Number 2:08-cv-1234-SVW(CWx). Original file with documents numbered 1-22, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.(Manzer, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kress et al v. PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Brandon Kress
Represented By: Steven S. Elster
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: Gerald D Wells, PHV
Represented By: James Maro, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Kiley Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Monique Myatt Galloway, PHV
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic, PHV
Represented By: Robert J. Gray, PHV
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Virginia Chentis, PHV
Represented By: Wayne Scott Kreger
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey LaBerge
Represented By: Steven S. Elster
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: Gerald D Wells, PHV
Represented By: James Maro, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Kiley Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Monique Myatt Galloway, PHV
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic, PHV
Represented By: Robert J. Gray, PHV
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Virginia Chentis, PHV
Represented By: Wayne Scott Kreger
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willow Markham
Represented By: Steven S. Elster
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: Gerald D Wells, PHV
Represented By: James Maro, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Kiley Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Monique Myatt Galloway, PHV
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic, PHV
Represented By: Robert J. Gray, PHV
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Virginia Chentis, PHV
Represented By: Wayne Scott Kreger
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lac Anh Le
Represented By: Steven S. Elster
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Virginia Chentis, PHV
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: Gerald D Wells, PHV
Represented By: James Maro, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Kiley Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Monique Myatt Galloway, PHV
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic, PHV
Represented By: Robert W. Biela, PHV
Represented By: Robert J. Gray, PHV
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Patterson
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: Gerald D Wells, PHV
Represented By: James Maro, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Kiley Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Monique Myatt Galloway, PHV
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic, PHV
Represented By: Robert J. Gray, PHV
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Virginia Chentis, PHV
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Barry
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: James Maro, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Kiley Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Monique Myatt Galloway, PHV
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic, PHV
Represented By: Robert J. Gray, PHV
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Virginia Chentis, PHV
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Stekelberg
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: Gerald D Wells, PHV
Represented By: James Maro, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Kiley Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Monique Myatt Galloway, PHV
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic, PHV
Represented By: Robert J. Gray, PHV
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Virginia Chentis, PHV
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Brandon
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: Gerald D Wells, PHV
Represented By: James Maro, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Kiley Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Monique Myatt Galloway, PHV
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic, PHV
Represented By: Robert J. Gray, PHV
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Virginia Chentis, PHV
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Blindbury
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: Gerald D Wells, PHV
Represented By: James Maro, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Kiley Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Monique Myatt Galloway, PHV
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic, PHV
Represented By: Robert J. Gray, PHV
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Virginia Chentis, PHV
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Kenne
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: Gerald D Wells, PHV
Represented By: James Maro, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Kiley Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Represented By: Monique Myatt Galloway, PHV
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic, PHV
Represented By: Robert J. Gray, PHV
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Virginia Chentis, PHV
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly C. Jones
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: Gerald D Wells, PHV
Represented By: James Maro, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Kiley Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Monique Myatt Galloway, PHV
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic, PHV
Represented By: Robert J. Gray, PHV
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Virginia Chentis, PHV
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Ochoa
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: James Maro, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Kiley Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Monique Myatt Galloway, PHV
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic, PHV
Represented By: Robert J. Gray, PHV
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Virginia Chentis, PHV
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Powell
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Daria Dub Carlson
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Represented By: Gerald D Wells, PHV
Represented By: James Maro, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Compton
Represented By: Kiley Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Represented By: Michelle A. Coccagna, PHV
Represented By: Monique Myatt Galloway, PHV
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic, PHV
Represented By: Robert J. Gray, PHV
Represented By: Stanley D. Saltzman
Represented By: Virginia Chentis, PHV
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PriceWaterhouse Coopers, LLP
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Joseph C Liburt
Represented By: Julian Wing-Kai Poon
Represented By: Julie A. Totten
Represented By: Norman C. Hile
Represented By: Andrea Lee Brown
Represented By: Lynne C Hermle
Represented By: Michele Leigh Maryott
Represented By: Daniel J. Thomasch, PHV
Represented By: David M. Fine, PHV
Represented By: David A. Prahl
Represented By: Lauren J. Elliot, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Yury Adamov
Represented By: William A. Kershaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?