February 25, 2010 |
Filing
79
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/25/2010 ORDERING that the 69 Findings and Recommendations are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Pltf's 71 motion for terminating sanctions be granted. Pltf be awarded $856,980.00 in damages. The Clerk be directed to close this case. Motion referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Engbretson, K.)
|
January 29, 2010 |
Filing
73
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/29/2010 ORDERING the hearing date of 2/3/2010 on plaintiff's motion for sanctions is continued to 2/24/2010 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 24 before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Plai ntiff shall file, on or before 2/10/2010, a proposed order and default judgment against all defendants, including defendant AA&M Electric, Inc., and any necessary supporting documentation. On or before 2/17/2010, defendants may file a response, if any, to plaintiff's filing. (Matson, R)
|
December 31, 2009 |
Filing
72
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/31/2009 ORDERING that the hearing date on Pltf's motion for sanctions is CONTINUED to 2/3/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Dfts shall SHOW CAUSE in writing, no later than 1/20/2010, why Pltf's motion should not be granted. Dft's shall file an opposition to Pltf's motion by 1/20/2010. (Engbretson, K.)
|
November 24, 2009 |
Filing
70
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/24/09 ORDERING pltf's Motion to Compel 62 is GRANTED; dfts are ordered to appear for deposition at pltf's counsels Sacramento offices within 14 days of the date this order is filed and to coordinate precise dates and times for those depositions with pltfs counsel; and dfts shall pay $1716.63 to pltf's counsel no later than 30 days from the date this order is filed, and shall file with the Clerk an affidavit within 14 days thereafter which states that they have paid the sum. (Carlos, K)
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing
69
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/13/09 RECOMMENDING that Pltf's 35 motion for default judgment be granted. The Clerk be directed to enter default judgment against AA&M Electric, Inc. Pltf be award ed $285,660.00 actual damages. Such award be made without prejudice to a further motion for default judgment, or amended default judgment, based upon newly acquired evidence demonstrating further fraudulent conduct by dft AA & M Electric, Inc. Such award be made without prejudice to an award of punitive damages against dft AA & M Electric, Inc., pursuant to resolution of this case in its entirety. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 10 days. (Engbretson, K.)
|
October 30, 2009 |
Filing
68
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/30/09 ORDERING that the hearing date of 11/4/09 on plaintiff's motion to compel is continued to 12/2/09, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 25; Defendants shall show cause, in w riting, no later than 11/12/09, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file a response to plaintiff's motion; Defendants shall file an opposition to the motion, or a statement of non-opposition thereto, no later than 11/12/09; Failure of defendants to file an opposition will be deemed a statement of non-opposition to the pending motion, and may result in the granting of plaintiff's motion and/or the imposition of sanctions, as requested by plaintiff; Plaintiff may file a reply in support of the motion on or before 11/18/09. (Becknal, R)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing
59
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/2/09 ORDERING that the 16 November 13, 2008 scheduling order is MODIFIED as follows: Discovery ddl 1/15/2010; Dispositive Motions ddl 2/24/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial set for 6/14/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Duong, D)
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing
57
ORDER granting Motion to Compel and submitting Motion for Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/1/09. (Kaminski, H)
|
July 22, 2009 |
Filing
37
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/22/09 ORDERING that the pending motions are rescheduled to be heard together on 9/2/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Gaydosh, J)
|
January 14, 2009 |
Filing
21
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 01/14/09 ORDERING that the 01/21/09 hearing is VACATED; the answer filed 07/22/08 is STRICKEN as to dft AA&M Electric, Inc.; the Clerk shall enter default against dft AA&M Electric, Inc.; pltf's motion for default judgment shall be filed within 30 days. (Manzer, C)
|